Jose A. Barrios v. Warren L. Montgomery
Petitioner: Jose A. Barrios
Respondent: Warren L. Montgomery
Case Number: 2:2015cv07868
Filed: October 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Beverly Reid O'Connell
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 JUDGMENT by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. Pursuant to the Order Accepting Findings, Conclusions and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge 53 , IT IS ADJUDGED that the Petition is denied and dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (afe)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Petitioner is HEREBY ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed as a mixed petition, pursuant to Rose v. Lundy, 455 U.S. 509, 522 (1982). Petitioner must file a response to this Order withing twenty (20) days (by no later than September 29, 2016). (See Order for complete details) (afe)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. Petitioner is HEREBY ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed as a mixed petition, pursuant to Rose v. Lundy, 455 U.S. 509, 522 (1982). Petitioner may file a response to this Order by filing - no later than July 20, 2016. (See Order for complete details) (afe)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jose A. Barrios v. Warren L. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose A. Barrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warren L. Montgomery
Represented By: Daniel Chi-Sum Chang
Represented By: Paul M Roadarmel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?