Brett Lauter v. Michael Rosenblatt et al
Plaintiff: Brett Lauter
Defendant: Echo Bridge Home Entertainment, BHC Interim Funding Management, L.L.C., Platinum Disc, LLC, Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Michael Rosenblatt, Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC and BHC Interim Funding II, L.P.
Petitioner: Merchant Financial Corporation
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Gary Urwin
Case Number: 2:2015cv08481
Filed: October 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: On the courts own motion, the Pretrial Conference set for February 10, 2020, is continued to June 15, 2020 at 11:00 AM. The Jury Trial set for February 25, 2020, is continued to June 23, 2020 at 9:00 AM. The Ex Parte Application filed January 29, 2020, is deemed moot #360 . (shb)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 360 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Modification of Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lauter, Brett)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 359 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: On the Court's own motion, the matters [311, 315, 316 and 358] set for hearing January 27, 2020, are hereby taken off calendar, the hearing dates are vacated and will be decided without oral argument. No appearances necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES UNDER LOCAL RULES 16-2 THROUGH 16-7 by #357 Judge Dean D. Pregerson. The Court ORDERS that: The deadlines for the parties compliance with the requirements of Local Rules 16-2 through 16-7 and for submission of the proposed pre-trial order are extended until a date which is ten (10) days after the parties receive notice of the Court's rulings on: a)Lauter's Motion for Review; or in the Alternative Reconsideration; or in the Alternative Relief from Magistrate Judge Stevenson's Orders [ECF No.353]; b)Lauter's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment against EBAC [ECF Nos.275, 347]; c)Lauter's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading [ECF No. 311]; d)EBAC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings against Lauter [ECF No.316]; e)EBAC's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Answer [ECF No. 315]; andf)Lauter's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings against EBAC [ECF No. 269]. (lom)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 357 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Documents Required Under Local Rules 16-2 Through 16-7 and Proposed Pre-Trial Order filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lauter, Brett)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 356 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The matters set for hearing December 16, 2019 [311, 315, 316 and 353] are CONTINUED to January 27, 2020 at 10:00 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 355 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEVENSONS ORDERS OF NOVEMBER 1, 2019 AND JULY 1, 2019 [ECF Nos. 352 and 308] #353 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEVENSONS ORDERS OF NOVEMBER 1, 2019 AND JULY 1, 2019 [ECF Nos. 352 and 308] #353 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Counter Claimants Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Hewitt, Andrew)
November 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 353 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Review of MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEVENSONS ORDERS OF NOVEMBER 1, 2019 AND JULY 1, 2019 [ECF Nos. 352 and 308] filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 12/16/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MOTION FOR REVIEW [L.R. 72-2.1]; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE RECONSIDERATION [L.R. 7-18]; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE RELIEF FROM MAGISTRATE JUDGE STEVENSONS ORDERS OF NOVEMBER 1, 2019 AND JULY 1, 2019 [Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 60(b)(1) & (6)], #2 Proposed Order) (Lauter, Brett)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 352 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES settling #351 Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Defendant must respond to RFA No. 405 within five (5) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff's request for an order compelling Defendant to provide responses to Set Three RFA Nos. 1-88 is DENIED. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR 11/01//2019. (hr)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 351 MOTION RE: Informal Discovery Dispute (gr)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT EBACS JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF OCTOBER 21, 2019 CUT-OFF TO RESOLVE THEIR DISCOVERY DISPUTE, #349 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Ex Parte Application is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order is hereby modified so as to permit Plaintiff and Defendant EBAC to submit their discovery dispute pertaining to Plaintiffs RFAs 1-88 and 405 to Magistrate Judge Karen Stevenson subject to her availability on or after October 28, 2019, and further to permit the parties to fully resolve their dispute pursuant to any orders that Judge Stevenson may deem appropriate. (shb)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 349 Joint EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for EXTENSION OF OCTOBER 21, 2019 CUT-OFF TO RESOLVE PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lauter, Brett)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 348 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBACs amended counterclaim, its five remaining affirmative defenses and Plaintiffs cause of action against EBAC for violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. #275 Supplemental filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Counter Claimants Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Declaration, #2 Supplemental Statement of Genuine Disputes of Fact)(Leichter, Kevin)
October 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 347 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBACs amended counterclaim, its five remaining affirmative defenses and Plaintiffs cause of action against EBAC for violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. #275 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LAUTERS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT [PROPOSED])(Lauter, Brett)
October 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 346 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBACs amended counterclaim, its five remaining affirmative defenses and Plaintiffs cause of action against EBAC for violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. #275 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AUCTION SALE TRANSCRIPT OF SECURED PARTY SALE BY BHC INTERIM FUNDING II, L.P. ON OCTOBER 27, 2015)(Lauter, Brett)
October 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 345 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBACs amended counterclaim, its five remaining affirmative defenses and Plaintiffs cause of action against EBAC for violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. #275 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION OF GARY EISENBERG ON AUGUST 13, 2019)(Lauter, Brett)
October 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 344 DECLARATION of Brett Lauter in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBACs amended counterclaim, its five remaining affirmative defenses and Plaintiffs cause of action against EBAC for violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. #275 Second Supplemental Declaration filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 343 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: On the Courts own motion, the Pretrial Conference is continued from October 28, 2019 to February 10, 2020 at 11:00 AM. Accordingly, the Jury Trial is continued from November 5, 2019 to February 25, 2020 at 9:00 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: On the Court's own motion, the matters [311, 315 and 316] set for hearing October 7, 2019, are hereby continued to December 16, 2019 at 10:00 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application (Dkt. 331) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. The application is denied with respect to Plaintiff's request regarding the deposition transcript. Good cause being shown, however, the discovery cutoff is extended to October 21, 2019, for the sole purpose of resolving disputes related to Plaintiff's Requests for Admission 1-88 and 405. r (yl)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 340 PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT EBACS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT EBACS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS; REQUEST TO BE HEARD ON OBJECTIONS [Fed. R. Evid. 201(e)] in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint #316 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
September 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 339 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to REQUEST for Order for Extension of Time to Conduct Local Rule 16-2 Meeting #338 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 338 REQUEST for Order for Extension of Time to Conduct Local Rule 16-2 Meeting filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Hewitt, Andrew)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 337 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: On the Court's own motion, the matters[311, 315 and 316] set for hearing September 23, 2019, are hereby continued to October 7, 2019 at 10:00 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 336 REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for REQUIRING LODGING OF ORIGINAL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT [L.R. 32-1]; MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER #331 Reply to Defendant EBAC's Opposition filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 335 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for REQUIRING LODGING OF ORIGINAL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT [L.R. 32-1]; MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER #331 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Counter Claimants Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Hewitt, Andrew)
September 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 334 REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for REQUIRING LODGING OF ORIGINAL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT [L.R. 32-1]; MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER #331 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 333 LIMITED OPPOSITION OF NON-PARTY MERCHANT FINANCIAL CORPORATION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF BRET LAUTER FOR ORDER REQUIRING LODGING OF ORIGINAL DEPOSITIONTRANSCRIPT AND MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER, with POS in opposition re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for REQUIRING LODGING OF ORIGINAL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT [L.R. 32-1]; MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER #331 filed by Movant Merchant Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of David Krol in Support)(Attorney David Krol added to party Merchant Financial Corporation(pty:mov))(Krol, David)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 332 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: On the Courts own motion, Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to file Supplemental Pleading #311 , Defendants Motion for Leave to file EBACs Supplemental Answer to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint #315 , and Defendant and Counterclaimant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. Motion for Judgment #316 are continued from 9/9/2019 to 9/23/2019 at 10:00 AM. No appearance necessary 9/9/2019.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 331 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for REQUIRING LODGING OF ORIGINAL DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT [L.R. 32-1]; MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lauter, Brett)
August 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 330 DECLARATION of Brett Lauter in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Supplemental Pleading [Rule 15(d)] #311 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
August 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 329 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Supplemental Pleading [Rule 15(d)] #311 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING)(Lauter, Brett)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 328 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: On the Court's own motion, the Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Answer #315 , and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff Brett Lauters Third Amended Complaint, and All Purported Causes of Action Therein #316 set for hearing August 26, 2019, are continued to September 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 327 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Supplement PLEADING #312 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Supplemental Pleading [Rule 15(d)] #311 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Counter Claimants Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Leichter, Kevin)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 326 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint #316 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Counter Claimants Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Leichter, Kevin)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 325 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file EBAC's [Proposed] Supplemental Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint #315 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Counter Claimants Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Leichter, Kevin)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 324 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint #316 Supplement to Memorandum filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 323 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file EBAC's [Proposed] Supplemental Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint #315 Supplement to Memorandum filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 322 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint #316 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
August 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint #316 in Opposition to EBAC's Motion filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
August 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 320 Objections to EBAC's Request for Judicial Notice; Request to Be Heard on Objections in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint #316 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
August 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 319 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file EBAC's [Proposed] Supplemental Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint #315 in Opposition to EBAC's Motion filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
August 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Evidentiary Objections to Kevin Leichter Declaration in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file EBAC's [Proposed] Supplemental Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint #315 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
August 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 317 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file EBAC's [Proposed] Supplemental Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint #315 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 316 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice ISO EBAC's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) (Leichter, Kevin)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 315 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file EBAC's [Proposed] Supplemental Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Supplemental Answer, #2 Proposed Order re Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Answer) (Leichter, Kevin)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Defendant EBAC's Ex Parte Application for leave to take two non-party depositions after the discovery date is GRANTED, in part. Leave to take the additional depositions is granted on theconditions that Plaintiff be permitted to participate remotely and receive sufficient advance notice to enable him to do so fully. The dispositive motion cutoff is hereby continued to October 7, 2019. The court notes, however, that Plaintiff has already filed a motion for summary judgment (Dkt. 275.) To theextent Plaintiff wishes to supplement his motion as a result of the two additional depositions, he may file a supplement, not to exceed five pages, on or before October 7, 2019. Should Plaintiff file a supplement, Defendant EBAC may file a supplemental opposition, not to exceed five pages, no later than October 15, 2019 (shb)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE OF MOTION re MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING #312 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (shb)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 312 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed supplemental pleading) (shb)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file Supplemental Pleading [Rule 15(d)] filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 9/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING [FED. R. CIV. P. 15(d)], #2 SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING [PROPOSED], #3 Proposed Order) (Lauter, Brett)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to take two Non-Party Depositions After the Discovery Cut-Off Date #309 Request for Protective Order and Order Extending Last Date to File Motions filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 309 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to take two Non-Party Depositions After the Discovery Cut-Off Date filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Hewitt, Andrew)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLC'S RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION AND THAT THE GENUINENESS OF DOCUMENTS BE DEEMED ADMITTED #300 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: (1) the Motion is GRANTED with respect to Set Three RFA Nos. 280-281, 282-285, 288-289, 302-305, 404, 440-449, and as to RFA Set Four in its entirety. (2) The Motion is DENIED in all other respects. (see document for further details) (hr)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 307 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES settling #306 Motion re: Informal Discovery Dispute held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Court ORDERS Defendant EBAC to reimburse Plaintiff the amount of $538.50 as reasonable expenses incurred in anticipation of the Shiftan deposition. If the parties wish to take depositions after the current July 2, 2019 deadline for fact discovery, they must seek authorization from District Judge Dean D. Pregerson to extend the discovery cut-off date. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR- 06/27/2019. (hr)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 306 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE (hr)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLCS RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND THAT REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BE DEEMED ADMITTED #300 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 304 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Court is now in receipt of the Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp LLC's Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Admissions filed on June 12, 2019 in the Joint Stipulation format pursuant to Local Rule 37-2. (Dkt. No. 300.) Accordingly, the Court finds that the June 5, 2019 Order is DISCHARGED #298 . (SEE ORDER RE FURTHER INFORMATION) (gr)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 303 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE VACATING HEARING RE: MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLCS RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (Dkt. No. 300) by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. On the Court's own motion, the hearing on Plaintiffs Motion to Compel (Dkt No. 300) #300 scheduled for Tuesday, June 18, 2019, at 1 p.m., is VACATED. The motion is taken under submission. An order will issue. (SEE ORDER RE FURTHER INFORMATION) (gr)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 302 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauterto Order to Show Cause, #298 (Lauter, Brett)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLCS RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND THAT THE GENUINENESS OF DOCUMENTS BE DEEMED ADMITTED re MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLCS RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND THAT REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BE DEEMED ADMITTED #300 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLCS RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND THAT REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BE DEEMED ADMITTED filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 JOINT STIPULATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 37-2 RE PLAINTIFF LAUTERS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLCS RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND THAT REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS BE DEEMED ADMITTED)(Lauter, Brett)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 299 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. On the Court's motion, the Court takes off calendar and under submission the Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings Against Defendant Echo Bridge #269 and the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBBAC's Amended Counterclaim, its Five Remaining Affirmative Defenses and Plaintiff's Cause of Action #275 , both previously scheduled for 6/10/2019 at 10:00 AM. No appearance is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 298 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson.Plaintiff and EBAC are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE no later than June 12, 2019, why Plaintiff and Defendant EBAC should not each be sanctioned for failure to comply with the Court's prior Order. (see document for further details) (hr)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 297 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS ORDER) RE MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLCS RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS #292 , AND DOCKET NOS. #293 #294 #295 #296 . The Motion to compel (Dkt No. 292), and (Dkt Nos. 293, 294, 295. 296) are stricken from the docket sheet for failure to follow the Courts procedures. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 296 [STRICKEN] DECLARATION of Brett Lauter in support of MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLCS RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS #292 Supplemental Declaration filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett) Modified on 6/5/2019 (gr).
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 [STRICKEN] MEMORANDUM in Support of MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLCS RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS #292 Supplemental Memorandum filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett) Modified on 6/5/2019 (gr).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 [STRICKEN] MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLCS RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS #292 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Counter Claimants Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Hewitt, Andrew) Modified on 6/5/2019 (gr).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 [STRICKEN] DECLARATION of Brett Lauter in support of MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLCS RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS #292 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett) Modified on 6/5/2019 (gr).
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 292 [STRICKEN] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLCS RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 6/18/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum PLAINTIFF LAUTERS PORTION OF JOINT STIPULATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 37-2 RE PLAINTIFF LAUTERS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLCS RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS, #2 Proposed Order)(Lauter, Brett) Modified on 6/5/2019 (gr).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 291 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment #269 set for June 3, 2019, is continued to June 10, 2019 at 10:00 a.m.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 290 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, re Reply (Motion related),, #289 Reply Brief served on May 26, 2019. (Lauter, Brett)
May 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 289 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBACs amended counterclaim, its five remaining affirmative defenses and Plaintiffs cause of action against EBAC for violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. #275 filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter, Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LAUTERS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT)(Lauter, Brett)
May 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 DECLARATION of Brett Lauter in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBACs amended counterclaim, its five remaining affirmative defenses and Plaintiffs cause of action against EBAC for violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. #275 Supplemental Declaration filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter, Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT EBACS STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS AND KEVIN LEICHTER DECLARATION in support of re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBACs amended counterclaim, its five remaining affirmative defenses and Plaintiffs cause of action against EBAC for violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. #275 filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter, Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBACs amended counterclaim, its five remaining affirmative defenses and Plaintiffs cause of action against EBAC for violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. #275 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Counter Claimants Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attachments: #1 EBAC's Statement of Genuine Disputes of Fact ISO EBAC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Declaration of Kevin J. Leichter ISO EBAC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #3 EBAC's Objections to the Declaration of Plaintiff Brett Lauter ISO Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Leichter, Kevin)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp., LLC's Amended Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses and Plaintiff's Sixth Cause of Action for Violations of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code Section 17 #269 filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter, Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp., LLC's Amended Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses and Plaintiff's Sixth Cause of Action for Violations of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code Section 17 #269 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Counter Claimants Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Objections to the Declaration of Plaintiff in support of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings)(Leichter, Kevin)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 283 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Statement (Motion related), #280 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - select - Otehr Filings - select - Notices - select - Notice of Lodging and Attach the Statement of Uncontroverted Facts. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Request for Judicial Notice, #278 , Request for Judicial Notice, #279 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - select - Motions and Related Documents - select - Exhibits. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
May 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 281 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter, Plaintiff Brett Lauter. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp., LLC's Amended Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses and Plaintiff's Sixth Cause of Action for Violations of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code Section 17 #269 (Lauter, Brett)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 280 STATEMENT of UNCONTROVERTED FACTS AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF LAUTER'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBACs amended counterclaim, its five remaining affirmative defenses and Plaintiffs cause of action against EBAC for violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. #275 [Proposed] filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter, Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 279 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBACs amended counterclaim, its five remaining affirmative defenses and Plaintiffs cause of action against EBAC for violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. #275 [part 3, Exs. H - K] filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter, Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBACs amended counterclaim, its five remaining affirmative defenses and Plaintiffs cause of action against EBAC for violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. #275 [part 2, Exs. F - G] filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter, Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 277 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBACs amended counterclaim, its five remaining affirmative defenses and Plaintiffs cause of action against EBAC for violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. #275 [part 1, Exs. A - E] filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter, Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 276 DECLARATION of Brett Lauter in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBACs amended counterclaim, its five remaining affirmative defenses and Plaintiffs cause of action against EBAC for violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. #275 filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter, Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 275 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to EBACs amended counterclaim, its five remaining affirmative defenses and Plaintiffs cause of action against EBAC for violation of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code 17200, et seq. filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 6/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP., LLC [FED. R. CIV. P. 56], #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Judgment) (Lauter, Brett)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. On May 1, 2019, the presiding District Judge granted the Parties' Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Order By 49 Days, which extends fact discovery until July 2, 2019. (Docket No. 273) #273 . Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Stipulation for Plaintiff's Motion to Compel ("Motion") is now due on May 30, 2019. The parties may file any supplements to the Joint Stipulation no later than June 4, 2019. A hearing on the Motion is scheduled for June 18, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 580 of the Roybal Federal Court House. (gr)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER RE PARTIES STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING ORDER BY 49 DAYS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. FOR GOOD CAUSE SHOWN, the Court hereby modifies it scheduling order to continue all dates by Forty-Nine (49) Days and ORDERS as follows: The Final Pretrial Conference shall take place on October 28, 2019 at11:00 a.m. Jury Trial is set for November 5, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS) (yl)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 272 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Order by 49 Days filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Order by 49 Days)(Leichter, Kevin)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 271 DECLARATION of Brett Lauter in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp., LLC's Amended Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses and Plaintiff's Sixth Cause of Action for Violations of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code Section 17 #269 filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter, Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp., LLC's Amended Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses and Plaintiff's Sixth Cause of Action for Violations of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code Section 17 #269 filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter, Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lauter, Brett)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp., LLC's Amended Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses and Plaintiff's Sixth Cause of Action for Violations of Cal. Bus. & Prof. Code Section 17200 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 6/3/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings Against Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp., LLC, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Judgment) (Lauter, Brett)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 268 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE RE: settling #267 Motion re Informal discovery dispute held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Court hears argument from Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp, LLC ("EBAC") regarding alleged deficiencies in Defendant's responses to the following discovery requests: (1) Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents ("RFPs"), Set 2, Request Nos. 2, 3, 4, 9, 10, 11, and 12; (2) Plaintiff's RFP Set 3 Requests Nos. 8-10, 16, 18, 19, 20 22-24, 26, 33-35, 41, 43-51, 53-59, 61, 62,66, 67, 68, and 72; (3) Plaintiff's Revised First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 1, 10-25; and (4) Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions, Sets 2, 3, and 4. Given the impending May 14, 2019, discovery cut-off, the Motion to Compel must be filed on or before Monday, May 6, 2019. The parties may file any supplemental statements as permitted by Rule 37-2 on or before Thursday, May 9, 2019. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION) Court Recorder: XTR-04/26/2019. (gr)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE (hr)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 STATUS REPORT RE JOINT REPORT TO COURT ON STATUS OF DISCOVERY DISPUTES BY PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER AND DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLC filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MINUTES OF MINUTES OF DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: The parties must provide the Court with a brief joint statement by 12:00 p.m. on Monday, April 8, 2019 indicating whether all issues have been resolved or what, if any, discovery disputes remain for the Court to address. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE MINUTES FOR FURTHER DETAILS) Court Reporter: CS 4/5/19. (yl)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 264 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER RE: SCHEDULING (IN PERSON) DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. The Court has scheduled a Discovery Status Conference for Friday, April 5, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 580 of the Roybal Federal Building and Court House, 255 E. Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. (see document for further details) (hr)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Having reviewed Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC, Platinum Disc, LLC, and Echo Bridge Home Entertainment (collectively, "EBE"),and having received no opposition from any party, the court sees no just reason for delay in the entry of judgment against EBE. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). Accordingly, Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Dkt. 226) is GRANTED. (shb)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, re Stipulation to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date and Last Day to File Motions #261 . good cause appearing therefore, ORDERS that: 1.The existing fact and expert discovery cut-off dates and last date to file motions deadline shall be vacated; 2.The new fact and expert discovery cut-off dates and last date to file motions deadline shall be as follows;FACT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF: 05-14-19. EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF: 06-14-19. LAST DAY TO FILE MOTIONS: 06-24-19. (shb)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Cut-Off Date to 6/14/2019 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lauter, Brett)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC HEARING RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson settling #259 Motion re: Informal Discovery Dispute. The Court rules as follows: (1) Defendants shall provide supplemental responses to Interrogatories Nos. 1 and 2, no later than Friday, January 25, 2019. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR-01/15/2019. (hr)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE. (et)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 258 MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC HEARING RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, settling #257 Motion re: Informal Discovery Dispute. After discussion with the parties, the Court directs Defendants to provide Plaintiff with verifications and supplemental responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories Nos. 1-16 by Monday, December 10, 2018. (see document for further details) Court Recorder: XTR-12/04/2018. (hr)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 257 MOTION RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY DISPUTE (hr)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Gary Urwin: Mediation held on November 9, 2018. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: #MediationParticipantSurvey(Killefer, Gail)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Gary Urwin has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 254 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b), the Court issues the following Order and sets the dates: LAST DAY TO JOIN OTHER PARTIES AND TO AMEND THE PLEADINGS: 12-17-18. FACT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF: 03-25-19. EXPERT DISCOVERY CUT-OFF: 05-13-19. LAST DAY TO FILE MOTIONS: 06-03-19. FINAL PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE: 09-09-19 at 11:00 a.m.5 - 7 DAYS FOR JURY TRIAL: 09-17-19 at 9:00 a.m. See order for further details. (shb)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 253 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that GARY URWIN may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 11/9/2018 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter(Lauter, Brett)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 TEXT ONLY ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. The Scheduling Conference, set for 10/22/2018, at 1:30 PM, is hereby taken OFF-CALENDAR. The matter is suitable for decision without oral argument and stands submitted. No appearance necessary on 10/22/2018. The Court's scheduling order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. (shb)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: RE #210 MOTION to Strike AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 1-10 FROM DEFENDANT EBACS ANSWER TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; #243 JOINT REQUEST BY PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER AND DEFENDANT EBAC FOR DECISION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 83-9.4 re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 1-10 FROM DEFENDANT EBACS ANSWER TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. EBAC's First, Second, Third, Sixth, and Tenth affirmative defenses are STRICKEN, with leave to amend. Any amended affirmative defenses shall be filed within fourteen days of the date of this Order. (shb)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 249 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 2 filed. Parties request to appear before a neutral selected from the court's Mediation Panel for mediation. Filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ADR ORDER)(Lauter, Brett)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER GRANTING by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, re Stipulation to Dismiss Parties #242 . Defendants BHC Interim Funding II, L.P. and BHC Interim Funding Management, LLC are hereby dismissed with prejudice from Plaintiff Brett Lauters Third Amended Complaint, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees, pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.BHC Interim Funding II, L.P. and BHC Interim Funding Management, L.L.C. terminated. (shb)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, re GRANTING Stipulation to Dismiss Party #244 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Defendant Michael Rosenblatt is hereby dismissed with prejudice from Plaintiff Brett Lauters Third Amended Complaint, with each party to bear his own costs and attorneys fees, pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Michael Rosenblatt terminated. (shb)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 246 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean Pregerson. On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference set for September 17, 2018 is hereby continued to October 22, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Order #243 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Michael Rosenblatt filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT MICHAEL ROSENBLATT)(Lauter, Brett)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 JOINT REQUEST BY PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER AND DEFENDANT EBAC FOR DECISION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 83-9.4 re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 1-10 FROM DEFENDANT EBACS ANSWER TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT Answer to Complaint #198 #210 (Lauter, Brett) Modified on 9/13/2018 (shb).
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 242 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants BHC Interim Funding Management, L.L.C., BHC Interim Funding II, L.P. filed by Defendants BHC Interim Funding Management, L.L.C., BHC Interim Funding II, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gold, Oliver)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 241 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Amended ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter.. (Lauter, Brett)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Request for Ruling re Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint #235 is moot pursuant to the court order filed 08/10/18 #238 . (bm)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson denying #161 MOTION for Default Judgment: Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment (Dkt. 161) is DENIED. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b). (bm)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER RE: DEFENDANT MICHAEL ROSENBLATT'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT [Dkt 191] by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: For the reasons stated above, Rosenblatt's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Rosenblatt's motion is granted with respect to Plaintiff's first four causes of action for (1) Breach of Contract, (2) Equitable Accounting, (3) Rescission of Contract, and (4) Relief from Transfer under the Uniform Voidable Transaction Act. Those claims against Rosenblatt are DISMISSED. Rosenblatt's motion is also granted with respect to Plaintiff's Sixth Cause of Action. PLaintiff's Sixth Cause of Action against Rosenblatt for unfair competition is DISMISSED. Rosenblatt's motion is DENIED with respect to Plaintiff's Fifth Cause of Action. No further amendment of the Third Amended Complaint shall be permitted, absent leave of the court. (see document for further details) (bm)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 236 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First REQUEST for Ruling Defendant Michael Rosenblatt's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint #235 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 235 First REQUEST for Ruling Defendant Michael Rosenblatt's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Osher, Jeremy)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MINUTES OF #234 Motion for Order; Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: The Court directs Defendant EBAC, within five (5) days of the date of this Order, to provide a supplemental written response to Plaintiffs request for production. Court Recorder: XTR. (rh)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Motion Re: Informal Discovery Dispute (hr)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 233 JOINT REQUEST BY PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER AND DEFENDANT EBAC FOR DECISION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 83-9.2 re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 1-10 FROM DEFENDANT EBACS ANSWER TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT Answer to Complaint #198 #210 (Lauter, Brett)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Change of address by Jeremy J Osher attorney for Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. Changing attorneys address to 222 North Pacific Coast Highway, Suite 2222. Filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Osher, Jeremy)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion the Motion for Default Judgment [226 ] set for July 16, 2018 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby taken off calendar, the hearing date vacated and will be decided without oral argument. The Scheduling Conference set for July 16, 2018 is continued to September 17, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (ab)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, re Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference and Hearing on Motion for Default Judgment, #229 . The Scheduling Conference and the hearing date on Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment set for 6/11/2018 at 10 a.m. are hereby vacated. The Scheduling Conference and the hearing date on Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment are re-scheduled to 7/16/2018 at 10 a.m. All relevant deadlines pursuant to FRCP 26 and the briefing schedule deadlines on the Motion for Default Judgment shall be re-set based on the new Scheduling Conference and hearing date of 7/16/2018. (shb)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 STIPULATION to Continue 6/11/2018 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT from 6/11/2018 at 10:00 a.m. to 7/16/2018 at 10:00 a.m. Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC; Platinum Disc, LLC; Echo Bridge Home Entertainment #226 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Stipulation)(Lauter, Brett)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, on the Court's own motion, the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE is hereby continued from May 21, 2018 to June 11, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (shb)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 227 DECLARATION of Brett Lauter in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC; Platinum Disc, LLC; Echo Bridge Home Entertainment #226 Supplemental Declaration filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC; Platinum Disc, LLC; Echo Bridge Home Entertainment filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 6/11/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re: Default Judgment) (Lauter, Brett)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to ECHO BRIDGE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, PLATINUM DISC, LLC, ECHO BRIDGE HOME ENTERTAINMENT (shb)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Renewed REQUEST for Entry of Default against Defendants Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC, Echo Bridge Home Entertainment, Platinum Disc, LLC on Third Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, authorized agent for service of process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. Service of Third Amended Complaint on Defendant Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC (Lauter, Brett)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 222 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, authorized agent for service of process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. Service of Third Amended Complaint on Defendant Platinum Disc, LLC (Lauter, Brett)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, authorized agent for service of process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. Service of Third Amended Complaint on Defendant Echo Bridge Home Entertainment (Lauter, Brett)
April 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Entry of Default against Defendants Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC, Echo Bridge Home Entertainment, and Platinum Disc, LLC on Third Amended Complaint #219 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: The incorrect event was used for the proof of service of summons and complaint. Please use Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints>>Service of Summons and Complaint returned executed. (yl)
April 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 219 REQUEST for Entry of Default against Defendants Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC, Echo Bridge Home Entertainment, Platinum Disc, LLC on Third Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson re Stipulation for Protective Order #217 . (see order for details) (hr)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter.(Lauter, Brett)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion the MOTION to Strike AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES set for 4/16/18 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby taken off calendar, the hearing date vacated and will be decided without oral argument #210 . The Scheduling Conference is continued. ( Scheduling Conference continued to 5/21/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson.) (twdb)
April 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, re Amended Complaint/Petition #188 served on Echo Bridge Home Entertainment; Third Amended Complaint served on 4/3/2018. (Lauter, Brett)
April 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 214 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, re Amended Complaint/Petition #188 served on Platinum Disc, LLC; Third Amended Complaint served on 4/3/2018. (Lauter, Brett)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, re Amended Complaint/Petition #188 served on Echo Bridge Entertainment LLC, Third Amended Complaint served on 4/2/2018. (Lauter, Brett)
March 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 1-10 FROM DEFENDANT EBACS ANSWER TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT Answer to Complaint #198 #210 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 1-10 FROM DEFENDANT EBACS ANSWER TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT Answer to Complaint #198 #210 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Counter Claimants Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Leichter, Kevin)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 1-10 FROM DEFENDANT EBACS ANSWER TO THE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT Answer to Complaint #198 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 4/16/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lauter, Brett)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, GRANTING Stipulation for Extension of Time to Amend its Answer to Plaintiff Brett Lauer's Third Amended Complaint, #208 . The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC shall amend its answer to Plaintiff Brett Lauters Third Amended Complaint on or before March 13, 2018. 2. Plaintiff Brett Lauter shall file his motion to strike EBACs affirmative defenses in EBACs answer to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint on or before March 15, 2018. (shb)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Answer to Complaint #198 , Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC's Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Stipulation to Extend Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC's Time to Amend Answer and Plaintiff's Time to Move to Strike EBAC's Affirmative Defenses)(Leichter, Kevin)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, GRANTING Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Answer to Complaint 198, Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion to Strike EBAC's Affirmative Defenses from EBAC's Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amend ed Complaint, #206 . The Court ORDERS: Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC shall amend its answer to Plaintiff Brett Lauters Third Amended Complaint on or before March 6, 2018. Plaintiff Brett Lauter shall file his motion to strike EBACs affirmative defenses in EBACs answer to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint on or before March 8, 2018. (shb)
February 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend Answer to Complaint #198 , Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Motion to Strike EBAC's Affirmative Defenses from EBAC's Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Stipulation to Extend Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC's Time to Amend Answer and Plaintiff's Time to Move to Strike EBAC's Affirmative Defenses)(Leichter, Kevin)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Court GRANTS the STIPULATION #204 extending Plaintiff's deadline to file Motion to Strike EBAC's Affirmative Defenses due by February 20, 2018. (pg)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike EBAC's Affirmative Defenses Pursuant to FRCP 12(f) filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lauter, Brett)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion the Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint of Brett Lauter Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant #191 set for February 12, 2018 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby taken off calendar, the hearing date vacated and will be decided without oral argument. (lom)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson:the Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint of Brett Lauter Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant #191 set for February 12, 2018 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby taken off calendar, the hearing date vacated and will be decided without oral argument. (pg)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson:The Scheduling Conference is hereby continued from February 5, 2018 to April 16, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (pg)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 200 REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint of Brett Lauter Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #191 filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Osher, Jeremy)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 199 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter.. (Lauter, Brett)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #188 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC.(Leichter, Kevin)
January 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 197 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint of Brett Lauter Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #191 in Support of Opposition filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
January 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint of Brett Lauter Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #191 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) #194 , by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff Brett Lauters Third Amended Complaint on or before January 23, 2018. (shb)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC answer now due 1/23/2018, filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leichter, Kevin)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Court GRANTS the Stipulation to Extend Defendant Time To Answer Complaint or Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint by January 19, 2018. (pg)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC answer now due 1/19/2018, filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Stipulation to Extend Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint)(Attorney Kevin J Leichter added to party Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC(pty:cc), Attorney Kevin J Leichter added to party Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC(pty:cc))(Leichter, Kevin)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint of Brett Lauter Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. Motion set for hearing on 2/12/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Osher, Jeremy)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants BHC Interim Funding II, L.P., BHC Interim Funding Management, L.L.C., (Gold, Oliver)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #188 filed by Defendants BHC Interim Funding II, L.P., BHC Interim Funding Management, L.L.C..(Gold, Oliver)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition #104 , filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter(Lauter, Brett)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, GRANTING Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Third Amended Complaint #186 . IT IS ORDERED that the filing deadline for Plaintiff Lauters Third Amended Complaint is extended up to, and including, December 26, 2017; and the filing deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Third Amended Complaint (TAC) is extended up to, and including, January 9, 2018. (shb)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File AND RESPOND TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lauter, Brett)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: The Minute Order In Chambers docket number #184 filed 12/08/17 was filed in error, under the wrong case number, and does not pertain to this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson:the Scheduling Conference set for December 11, 2017 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby taken off calendar. (pg)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: EBAC's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. EBAC's motion is denied withrespect to Plaintiff's copyright claim and claims predicated upon EBAC's successor liability. Plaintiff's UVTA claim and intentional interference claims are DISMISSED, with leave to amend. Plaintiff's Lanham Act claim is DISMISSED, with prejudice. Defendant Rosenblatt's Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claimsagainst Rosenblatt are DISMISSED, with leave to amend. Any amended complaint shall be filed within fourteen days of the date of this Order. See order for details. (shb)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: GRANTING #181 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is re-scheduled to February 5, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 9C, located at 350 West 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All relevant deadlines pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure are hereby re-set based on the new Scheduling Conference date of February 5, 2018. (shb)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE from DECEMBER 11, 2017 filed by DEFENDANT Michael Rosenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF Aaron M. Gladstein, #2 Proposed Order) (Osher, Jeremy)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 180 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: REQUEST for Order for RE: REQUEST FOR DECISION ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 83-9.4 #179 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 REQUEST for Order for RE: REQUEST FOR DECISION ON MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 83-9.4 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE)(AO 121) #177 . The Report on the Determination of An Action Regarding Copyright was docketed in this case erroneously. This document should have been docketed in case 17cv03959-CBM. (shb)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 177 REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (Attachments: #1 ORDER) (shb)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: GRANTING #174 Request to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Kevin J Leichter for Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. Attorney Michael B Garfinkel and Oliver M Gold terminated (shb)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson:the Motion for Default Judgment #161 set for October 23, 2017 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby taken off calendar, the hearing date vacated and will be decided without oral argument. (pg)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 174 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Kevin J. Leichter in place of attorney Michael B. Garfinkel , et al. filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Garfinkel, Michael)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE Joint Request for Decision on Motion #171 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. The document is accepted as filed. (smo)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #171 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - select - Motions and Related Filings - select - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests - select - Request - select - order. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Joint Request for Decision on Motions to Dismiss Pursuant to Local Rule 83-9.2 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter (Lauter, Brett)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson:the Motion for Default Judgment #161 is hereby continued from October 2, 2017 to October 23, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (pg)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER ON STIPULATION RE: CONTINUANCE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES #167 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Scheduling Conference is re-scheduled to December 11, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. All relevant deadlines pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure are hereby re-set based on the new Scheduling Conference date of December 11, 2017 (lc)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY JEREMY J OSHER IN PLACE AND INSTEAD OF VINCE L RAVINE FOR DEFENDANT MICHAEL ROSENBLATT #59 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson (lc)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 STIPULATION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE from October 23, 2017 to December 11, 2017 filed by DEFENDANT Michael Rosenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Osher, Jeremy)
September 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC; Platinum Disc, LLC; Echo Bridge Home Entertainment #161 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marlena McMurchie Moore counsel for Defendants BHC Interim Funding II, L.P., BHC Interim Funding Management, L.L.C., Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. Marlena M. Moore is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, BHC Interim Funding II LLC, BHC Interim Funding Management, LLC. (Attorney Marlena McMurchie Moore added to party BHC Interim Funding II, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Marlena McMurchie Moore added to party BHC Interim Funding Management, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Moore, Marlena)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC; Platinum Disc, LLC; Echo Bridge Home Entertainment #161 NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER TO OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLC, BHC INTERIM FUNDING II, LLC AND BHC INTERIM FUNDING MANAGEMENT, LLC filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Osher, Jeremy)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 163 OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS ECHO BRIDGE ACQUISITION CORP. LLC, BHC INTERIM FUNDING II, LLC AND BHC INTERIM FUNDING MANAGEMENT, LLC re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC; Platinum Disc, LLC; Echo Bridge Home Entertainment #161 filed by Defendants BHC Interim Funding II, L.P., BHC Interim Funding Management, L.L.C., Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attorney Oliver M Gold added to party BHC Interim Funding II, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Oliver M Gold added to party BHC Interim Funding Management, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Gold, Oliver)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 162 DECLARATION of Brett Lauter in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC; Platinum Disc, LLC; Echo Bridge Home Entertainment #161 Supplemental Declaration filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC; Platinum Disc, LLC; Echo Bridge Home Entertainment filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 10/2/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Default Judgment) (Lauter, Brett)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, re Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines #158 . The Court, having reviewed and considered the jointly-filed Stipulation Re: Continuance of Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines, hereby orders as follows: The Scheduling Conference is re-scheduled to October 23, 2017 at1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 9C, located at 350 West 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All relevant deadlines pursuant to Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure are hereby re-set based on the new Scheduling Conference date of October 23, 2017. (shb)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than August 30, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiff's filing of a NOTICED MOTION for entry of default judgment. See order for further details. (shb)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES from 9/11/2017 at 1:30 PM to 10/23/2017 at 1:30 PM filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Stipulation)(Lauter, Brett)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC, Echo Bridge Home Entertainment, Platinum Disc, LLC (shb)
July 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 REQUEST for Entry of Default against Defendants Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC, Echo Bridge Home Entertainment, Platinum Disc, LLC on Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: GRANTING #154 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Scheduling Conference set for August 14, 2017 to September 11, 2017 at 1:30 PM. (pg)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE from AUGUST 14, 2017 filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron M. Gladstein, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order) (Osher, Jeremy)
July 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, re Amended Complaint/Petition #104 Service of Second Amended Complaint on Defendant Echo Bridge Home Entertainment served on 5/11/2017. (Lauter, Brett)
July 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, re Amended Complaint/Petition #104 Service of Second Amended Complaint on Defendant Platinum Disc, LLC served on 5/11/2017. (Lauter, Brett)
July 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, re Amended Complaint/Petition #104 Service of Second Amended Complaint on Defendant Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC served on 5/12/2017. (Lauter, Brett)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Notice Update: Judge Stevenson will conduct all Court appearances in Courtroom 580, 5th floor located at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 E. Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. Please update your records to reflect this change. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Motion's to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Dkt. Nos. 121 and 126) set for hearing June 19, 2017 are hereby taken off calendar and will be decided without oral argument. Plaintiff's Request to Waive Oral Argument is deemed moot (Dkt. No. 147). (pg)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 DECLARATION of MICHAEL B. GARFINKEL re REQUEST to Waive ORAL ARGUMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO BE EXCUSED FROM APPEARANCE AT HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [LOCAL RULES 7-14, 7-15] #147 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Garfinkel, Michael)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 REQUEST to Waive ORAL ARGUMENT, OR ALTERNATIVELY, TO BE EXCUSED FROM APPEARANCE AT HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT [LOCAL RULES 7-14, 7-15] filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lauter, Brett)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other), #145 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Errata. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 NOTICE filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. of Errata re: Table of Contents and Table of Authorities for Defendant Michael Rosenblatt's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Brett Lauter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Osher, Jeremy)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Second Amended Complaint #121 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attorney Michael B Garfinkel added to party Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC(pty:dft))(Garfinkel, Michael)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 SCHEDULING NOTICE TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. On the Court's own motion, the Court denies as moot the MOTION to Strike AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 1,2,3,4, 7,9 & 10 FROM DEFENDANT EBACS Amended Answer to Complaint 81 AND PARAGRAPHS 23-25 FROM AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM, filed on March 6, 2017 #84 and the MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted, filed on March 6, 2017 #85 , previously scheduled for 6/19/2017 at 10:00 a.m. Both motions were filed prior to the Second Amended Complaint, which was filed on April 25, 2017. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Effective June 8, 2017, Judge Stevenson will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, Suite 8100, on the 8th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 570 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER/ MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #126 filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron M. Gladstein, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Aaron M. Gladstein, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Aaron M. Gladstein, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Aaron M. Gladstein)(Osher, Jeremy)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Defendant's Ex Parte Application #133 is DENIED. The document Defendant seeks to file in camera does not appear to be relevant at the pleading stage. (smo)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave for In Camera Review #133 filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Osher, Jeremy)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave for In Camera Review #133 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DEFENDANTS BHC INTERIM FUNDING II, LLC AND BHC INTERIM FUNDING MANAGEMENT, LLC by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer #132 . The Court HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: The BHC Entities shall have an extension to file a responsive pleading until after the Court rules on Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLCs motion to dismiss the SAC #121 . See document for details. (smo)
May 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Second Amended Complaint #121 in Support of Opposition filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 DECLARATION of Brett Lauter in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Second Amended Complaint #121 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Second Amended Complaint #121 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave for In Camera Review filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron M. Gladstein, #2 Exhibit A to the Decl. of Aaron M. Gladstein, #3 Exhibit B to the Decl. of Aaron M. Gladstein, #4 Exhibit C to the Decl. of Aaron M. Gladstein, #5 Declaration of Michael Rosenblatt, #6 Proposed Order)(Osher, Jeremy)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 3, 2017 filed by Defendants BHC Interim Funding II, L.P., BHC Interim Funding Management, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Michael B Garfinkel added to party BHC Interim Funding II, L.P.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael B Garfinkel added to party BHC Interim Funding Management, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Garfinkel, Michael)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER/ MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #126 in Support of Opposition filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF AARON GLADSTEIN IN OPPOSITION TO re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER/ MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #126 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER/ MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #126 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Scheduling Conference set for June 26, 2017 is continued to August 14, 2017 1:30 PM. (pg)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: denying #100 MOTION for Issuance; denying #103 APPLICATION for Issuance. The Court heard oral argument on the Motion and took the matter under submission. Plaintiff has not met his burden to establish that the total amount if his claim is a fixed or readily ascertainable amount. Plaintiff also fails to demonstrate that he is entitled to relief under section 492.030. (See Order for further details). (rh)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER/ MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by DEFENDANT Michael Rosenblatt. Motion set for hearing on 6/19/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities ISO of Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike SAC, #2 Declaration of Aaron M. Gladstein ISO Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike SAC, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Aaron M. Gladstein, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Aaron M. Gladstein, #5 Proposed Order Re: Defendant Rosenblatt's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike SAC) (Osher, Jeremy)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER/ MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #122 by Clerk of Court. The document is STRICKEN.F.R.Civ.P. 6. COMPUTING AND EXTENDING TIME; TIME FOR MOTION PAPERSL.R. 6-1 Notice and Service of Motion. (lc)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Michael Rosenblatt First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER/ MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT #122 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry : Pdf is ONLY the memorandum in support. Missing formal LR 6.1 formal Notice of Motion text re hearing date, time, Judge and courtroom, information. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Motion to Strike AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES #84 ,and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #85 set to be heard May 15, 2017 are continued to June 19, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. (pg)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER/ MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by DEFENDANT Michael Rosenblatt. Motion set for hearing on 6/12/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron M. Gladstein, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Aaron M. Gladstein, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Aaron M. Gladstein, #4 Proposed Order) (Osher, Jeremy) Modified on 5/15/2017 (lc). (STRICKEN PER 5/15/17 COURTS G112B RESPONSE).
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/19/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 3 to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 4 to Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Proposed Order) (Gold, Oliver)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 DECLARATION of Brett Lauter in support of APPLICATION for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Right to Attach Order #103 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Right to Attach Order #100 (Supplemental Declaration) filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF GARY EISENBERG re: APPLICATION for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Right to Attach Order #103 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Right to Attach Order #100 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re APPLICATION for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Right to Attach Order #103 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Right to Attach Order #100 (Supplemental Request) filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 REPLY in Support of APPLICATION for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Right to Attach Order #103 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Right to Attach Order #100 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 21 DAY Summons Issued re Second Amended Complaint/Petition #104 as to defendant BHC Interim Funding Management, L.L.C. (lc)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 21 DAY Summons Issued re Second Amended Complaint/Petition #104 as to defendant BHC Interim Funding II, L.P. (lc)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MICHAEL ROSENBLATTS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO JUNE 26, 2017 2:00 PM AND RELATED DEADLINES #106 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson (lc)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #104 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #104 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #110 , Summons Request #109 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. 1) No et als on caption permitted and must match the SECOND Amended Complaint verbatim. 2) Please indicate on the form near the summons title "ON THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #104 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #104 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE OF LODGING filed PROPOSED ORDER re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing the Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #106 , Declaration (Motion related), #107 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Defendant Michael Rosenblatt's Ex Parte Application for an Order Continuing the Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines)(Osher, Jeremy)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 DECLARATION of Aaron M. Gladstein In Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing the Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #106 filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Osher, Jeremy)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Continuing the Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Osher, Jeremy)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 OPPOSITION to APPLICATION for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Right to Attach Order #103 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Right to Attach Order #100 and Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Brett Lauter filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Counter Claimant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Supplement)(Gold, Oliver)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition #44 JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter(Lauter, Brett)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 APPLICATION for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Right to Attach Order filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. Application set for hearing on 5/16/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF BRETT LAUTER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AND ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF ATTACHMENT) (Lauter, Brett)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Defendants Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #63 is hereby vacated pursuant the Courts order granting Plaintiffs Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint. (lc)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Right to Attach Order #100 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Issuance of Writ of Attachment and Right to Attach Order filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 5/16/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Right to Attach Order and Issuance of Writ of Attachment) (Lauter, Brett)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Leave to Amend First Amended Complaint #93 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint by April 28, 2017. (lc)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Amend First Amended Complaint #93 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Amend First Amended Complaint #93 and REQUEST TO FREEZE ASSETS OF EBAC PURSUANT TO COURTS INHERENT EQUITY POWERS & CAL. CIV. CODE 3439.07(a)(3)(C) filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Amend First Amended Complaint #93 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Counter Claimants Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of O. M. Gold ISO Response to Ex Parte Application, #2 Declaration of M. Garfinkel ISO Response to Ex Parte Application, #3 Exhibit 1 to M. Garfinkel Declaration ISO Response to Ex Parte Application)(Gold, Oliver)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 DEFENDANT MICHAEL ROSENBLATTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IN OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Amend First Amended Complaint #93 filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Osher, Jeremy)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 DECLARATION of Brett Lauter in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Amend First Amended Complaint #93 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Amend First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Second Amended Complaint [Proposed]) (Lauter, Brett)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS EBAC'S COUNTERCLAIM AND TO STRIKE EBACS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND CERTAIN PARAGRAPHS OF ITS COUNTERCLAIM; AND PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE #91 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. The Court HEREBY ORDERS AS FOLLOWS: 1. The hearing date for Plaintiffs Motions shall be continued from April 17, 2017 to May 15, 2017; and 2. The briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motions shall be as follows: EBAC's oppositions to Plaintiff's Motions: April 19, 2017; Plaintiff's replies in support of his Motions: May 1, 2017; Hearing on Motions #84 #85 : May 15, 2017 at 10:00 am. (lom)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION for Hearing re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 1,2,3,4, 7,9 & 10 FROM DEFENDANT EBACS Amended Answer to Complaint #81 AND PARAGRAPHS 23-25 FROM AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM #84 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted #85 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing Hearing and Proposed Briefing Schedule)(Attorney Oliver M Gold added to party Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC(pty:cc))(Gold, Oliver)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS EBAC'S COUNTERCLAIM AND TO STRIKE EBAC'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND CERTAIN PARAGRAPHS OF ITS COUNTERCLAIM #89 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The hearing date for Plaintiff's Motions shall be continued from April 3, 2017 to April 17, 2017. The briefing schedule for Plaintiff's Motions shall be as follows:EBAC's oppositions to Plaintiff's Motions: March 22, 2017. Plaintiff's replies in support of his Motions: April 3, 2017. Hearing on Motions: April 17, 2017 at 10:00 am. (jy)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss and Strike from April 3, 2017 to April 17, 2017 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 1,2,3,4, 7,9 & 10 FROM DEFENDANT EBACS Amended Answer to Complaint #81 AND PARAGRAPHS 23-25 FROM AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM #84 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted #85 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motions to Dismiss and to Strike)(Gold, Oliver)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Jeremy J Osher counsel for Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. Changing Telephone Number to 310-322-2021. Filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Osher, Jeremy)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted #85 filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter, Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 DECLARATION of Brett Lauter in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted #85 filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter, Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted filed by Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 4/3/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Lauter, Brett)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 1,2,3,4, 7,9 & 10 FROM DEFENDANT EBACS Amended Answer to Complaint #81 AND PARAGRAPHS 23-25 FROM AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM filed by Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 4/3/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Lauter, Brett)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED based on the filing of the Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim #81 the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [73) and Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses #76 set for March 6, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. are hereby VACATED. (lc)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 5/22/2017 2:00 PM; compliance with FRCP 26(f) and filing of Rule 26(f) Report by Judge Dean D. Pregerson (lc)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order COUNTERCLAIM against counter defendant Brett Lauter; Jury Demand, filed by counterclaimant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (FILED AS ONE DOCUMENT SEE DOCKET NO. 81, AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) (Attorney Marlena McMurchie Moore added to party Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC(pty:cc)) (lc)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 AMENDED ANSWER and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIM to Amended Complaint/Petition #44 filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gold, Oliver)
February 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted #73 filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter, Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re [Proposed] Order re Notice of Intent to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaim to First Amended Complaint, Request for Stay of Hearing, and Request for Denial of Motions as Moot upon Filing of Amended Answer re Notice (Other) #77 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gold, Oliver)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #77 re intent to amend pleading..includes request to stay motion hearing. The following error(s) was found: Missing Proposed order which was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Intent to File Amended Pleading and Request to Stay Motion Hearing Dates filed by Defendant and Counterclaimant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Gold, Oliver)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES 1-12 FROM DEFENDANT EBACS ANSWER AND PARAGRAPHS 22-24 OF COUNTERCLAIM Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim #65 filed by Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 3/6/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Lauter, Brett)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DECLARATION of Brett Lauter in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted #73 filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted #73 filed by Counter Defendant Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief May Be Granted filed by Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 3/6/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Lauter, Brett)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion the Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #63 set for January 9, 2017 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby taken off calendar, the hearing date vacated and will be decided without oral argument. (lc)
December 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT ROSENBLATTS TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT AND ALTER EGO ARGUMENTS IN THE REPLY BRIEF TO OPPOSITION re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(f)(2) #63 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY in support of a motion First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(f)(2) #63 filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Osher, Jeremy)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT ECHO BRIDGEACQUISITION CORP. LLCS COUNTERCLAIM #68 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson:Brett Lauter to file and serve a response to DefendantEcho Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLCs Counterclaim is extended up to and including February 4, 2017. (lc)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Counterclaim #65 filed by Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Brett Lauter.(Lauter, Brett)
December 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(f)(2) #63 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC, (Gold, Oliver)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #44 with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against Brett Lauter filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gold, Oliver)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(f)(2)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(f)(2) filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. Motion set for hearing on 1/9/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MICHAEL ROSENBLATTS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(f)(2), #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF AARON M. GLADSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT MICHAEL ROSENBLATTS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(f)(2), #3 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: DEFENDANT MICHAEL ROSENBLATTS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF BRETT LAUTER PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(f)(2)) (Osher, Jeremy)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER re Stipulation to Set Aside Default #61 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: The Default entered against Defendant Michael Rosenblatt on October 26,2016 is hereby set aside.Defendant Michael Rosenblatt shall file and serve a response to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint within 14 court days after entry of this Order. (lc)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 First STIPULATION to Set Aside Default as to Defendant Michael Rosenblatt filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Osher, Jeremy)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Jeremy J. Osher in place of attorney Vince Ravine #59 . The following error(s) was found: Erroneous 11/7/16 10:00 AM Hearing set on Judge's calendar...the hearing does not appear on the pdf document, nor does the G-01 format require a hearing. NOTE: The Clerk has TERMED ONLY THE ERRONEOUS HEARING. Request remains pending the Judge's ruling. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 First REQUEST to Substitute attorney Jeremy J. Osher in place of attorney Vince Ravine filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. Request set for hearing on 11/7/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PROPOSED) ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY) (Attorney Jeremy J Osher added to party Michael Rosenblatt(pty:dft)) (Osher, Jeremy)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC answer now due 12/14/2016, re Amended Complaint/Petition #44 filed by Defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC.(Attorney Oliver M Gold added to party Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC(pty:dft))(Gold, Oliver)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Effective November 7, 2016, Judge Pregerson will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 9C on the 9th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Defendant Michael Rosenblatt, on the first amended complaint (lc)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Amended REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Michael Rosenblatt filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Michael Rosenblatt #52 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: No proof of service/waiver of service on file. There is no order deeming the first amended complaint as being served on defendant. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (lc)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #49 , Summons Request #46 , Summons Request #50 , Summons Request #47 , Summons Request #48 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. summons request no. 47 was issued 10/19/16 by Civil Intake (see docket no. 51). The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc) (Late Docketing due to Clerks Office Error) Modified on 10/25/2016 (lc).
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Michael Rosenblatt filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #44 as to defendant Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC. (lc)
October 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #44 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
October 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #44 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
October 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #44 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
October 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #44 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
October 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #44 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Lauter, Brett)
October 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, re Amended Complaint/Petition #44 served on 10/08/2016. (Lauter, Brett)
October 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC, Echo Bridge Home Entertainment, Platinum Disc, LLC, Michael Rosenblatt amending Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter(Lauter, Brett)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT [Dkts #27 , #34 ] by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file the Amended Complaint within ten days of the date of this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for details. (jy)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: granting #20 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (lom)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED that on the Court's own motion the Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Defendant #27 , and Motion to Amend Complaint filed by plaintiff #34 set for July 25, 2016 at 10:00 a.m., are hereby taken off calendar, the hearing dates vacated and will be decided without oral argument. (lc)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT #34 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (lc)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by specially appearing Defendant Michael Rosenblatt re Objection/Opposition (Motion related) #38 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ravine, Vincent)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Opposition to Motion to Amend re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to amend complaint #34 filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Ravine, Vincent)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #33 . The following error(s) was found: Title page and its required LR 11-3.8 information is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: COUNSEL ARE NOTIFIED, on the Court's own motion, the MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT FILED BY DEFENDANT MICHAEL ROSENBLATT #27 is hereby continued from June 13, 2016 to July 25, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. (lc)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to amend complaint #34 , the incomplete pdf image was replaced with complete pdf image and proposed order and proposed amended complaint (lc)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by specially appearing Defendant Michael Rosenblatt, re Notice (Other) #32 served on Notice of Intent to File Opposition to Plaintiff Motion to File Amended Complaint. (Ravine, Vincent)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE Of Intent to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to File Amended Complaint filed by specially appearing Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Vince Ravine)(Ravine, Vincent)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to amend complaint ; memorandum of points and authorities in support filed by plaintiff Brett Lauter. Motion set for hearing on 7/25/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (lc) (Main Document 34 replaced on 6/10/2016) (lc). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2016: #1 proposed order, #2 proposed FAC) (lc).
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY in support of motion to set aside entry of default First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #22 . #27 filed by Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Michael Rosenblatt in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration Kyle Rambeau in Support of Motion)(Ravine, Vincent)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Brett Lauter. (lc)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT MICHAEL ROSENBLAIT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ; DECLARATION OF BRETT AUTER IN SUPPORT #27 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (lc)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by specially appearing Defendant Michael Rosenblatt re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #22 . #27 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Setting Aside Entry of Default)(Ravine, Vincent)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #22 . filed by specially appearing Defendant Michael Rosenblatt. Motion set for hearing on 6/13/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authority in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration Michael Rosenblatt in Support of Motion, #3 Declaration Vince Ravine in Support of Motion) (Attorney Vincent L Ravine added to party Michael Rosenblatt(pty:dft)) (Ravine, Vincent)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #23 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter (lc)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; DECLARATION OF BRETT LAUTER IN SUPPORT THEREOF #23 filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (lc)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REQUEST for Protective order filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (rh)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than April 18, 2016 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiff's filing of a NOTICED MOTION for entry of default judgment. In accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, no oral argument on this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lom)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Michael Rosenblatt, Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC, Platinum Disc, LLC, Echo Bridge Home Entertainment (lc)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendants Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC, Echo Bridge Home Entertainment, Platinum Disc, LLC, Michael Rosenblatt; declaration of Brett Lauter in support filed by plaintiff Brett Lauter. (lc)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (lom)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED as to defendant Platinum Disc, LLC filed by plaintiff. (vv)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED as to defendant Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC filed by plaintiff. (vv)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED as to defendant Michael Rosenblatt filed by plaintiff. (vv)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORIGINAL SUMMONS RETURNED as to defendant Echo Bridge Home Entertainment filed by Plaintiff. (vv)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEALregarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Brett Lauter. (vv)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Brett Lauter. (vv)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, upon Defendant Michael Rosenblatt served on 11/5/2015, answer due 11/27/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Rosenblatt in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by mail and acknowledgment of receipt of service. Original Summons NOT returned. (es)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, upon Defendant Echo Bridge Home Entertainment served on 11/6/2015, answer due 11/27/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Beagle, Executive Vice President in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by mail and acknowledgment of receipt of service. Original Summons NOT returned. (es)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, upon Defendant Platinum Disc, LLC served on 11/4/2015, answer due 11/25/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, signature illegible, Authorized Agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure, by mail and acknowledgment of receipt of service. Original Summons NOT returned. (es)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, upon Defendant Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC served on 11/6/2015, answer due 11/27/2015. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, Authorized Agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by mail and acknowledgment of receipt of service. Original Summons NOT returned. (es)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson:should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Complete and return forms AO 120 and/or AO AO 121. No oral argumenton this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will standsubmitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D Pregerson. Counsel are referred to the courts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INSTRUCTIONS) (lc)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS CHANGE IN MAGISTRATE JUDGE INITIALS by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Please be advised that the initials used to identify the Honorable Karen L. Stevenson, United States Magistrate Judge have been changed from (KLSx) to (KSx). (rrp)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (rn)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendants Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC, Echo Bridge Home Entertainment, Platinum Disc, LLC, Michael Rosenblatt. (rn)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rn)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (rn)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter, (rn)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC, Echo Bridge Home Entertainment, Platinum Disc, LLC, Michael Rosenblatt.Case assigned to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson.(Filing fee $ 400 PAID) Jury Demand., filed by Plaintiff Brett Lauter. (rn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brett Lauter v. Michael Rosenblatt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echo Bridge Home Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHC Interim Funding Management, L.L.C.
Represented By: Michael B Garfinkel
Represented By: Oliver M Gold
Represented By: Marlena McMurchie Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platinum Disc, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echo Bridge Acquisition Corp. LLC
Represented By: Kevin J Leichter
Represented By: Michael B Garfinkel
Represented By: Oliver M Gold
Represented By: Marlena McMurchie Moore
Represented By: Andrew Ethan Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Rosenblatt
Represented By: Jeremy J Osher
Represented By: Aaron Michael Gladstein
Represented By: Steven Frederick Kuehl
Represented By: Vincent L Ravine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Echo Bridge Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHC Interim Funding II, L.P.
Represented By: Michael B Garfinkel
Represented By: Oliver M Gold
Represented By: Marlena McMurchie Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Lauter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Merchant Financial Corporation
Represented By: David Krol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Gary Urwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?