Metal Jeans, Inc. v. Ano Veli Samuel Turtianinen, et al
Plaintiff: Metal Jeans, Inc.
Defendant: Does and Ano Veli Samuel Turtiainen
Case Number: 2:2015cv08987
Filed: November 18, 2015
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A. Oliver
Presiding Judge: Dean D. Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 245 MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than February 4, 2022 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court wil l consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiff's filing of a NOTICED MOTION for entry of default judgment. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more information (shb) Modified on 1/4/2022 (shb).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 205 JUDGMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, in favor of METAL SPORT, INC. against Metal Jeans, Inc. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: That judgment is entered in favor of Defendant Metal Sport, Inc. on all of Plaintiff Metal Jeans, Inc.s claims, and that Defendant shall recover its costs. (shb)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver re Stipulation for Protective Order 83 . (see order for details) (hr)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing no later than July 3, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (pg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metal Jeans, Inc. v. Ano Veli Samuel Turtianinen, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ano Veli Samuel Turtiainen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metal Jeans, Inc.
Represented By: John G Jahrmarkt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?