R and S Worldwide, Inc. v. Rue 21, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: R and S Worldwide, Inc.
Defendant: Does, MJCK Corporation and Rue 21, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv09303
Filed: December 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David T. Bristow
Presiding Judge: S. James Otero
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 112 (IN CHAMBERS) AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before January 3, 2017, why this action should not b e dismissed for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plaintiff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the scheduled pretrial conference and trial dates in this matter, currently set for February 27, 2017 and March 21, 2017, respectively. (iv)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff(s) to show cause, in writing, on or before January 3, 2017, why this action should not be dismis sed for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of Plainti ff(s) response. Failure to respond to this Order to Show Cause will be deemed consent to the dismissal of the action. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the scheduled pretrial conference and trial dates in this matter, currently set for January 9, 2017 and January 24, 2017, respectively. (iv)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OSC by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 12/1/2016. Plaintiff was ordered to pay $1000 in connection with this action, within 10 days of the October 26, 2016 Order. (Id.) The deadline has since passed a nd no payment has been received by the Clerk of Court, to date. Accordingly, the Court orders Plaintiff to show cause, within five court days of this Order, why the Court should not hold Plaintiff in contempt for failure to comply with a Court Order. To discharge the instant Order, Plaintiff must make the payment forthwith. (rh)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson re Stipulation for Protective Order 36 (See Order for details) (rh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R and S Worldwide, Inc. v. Rue 21, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJCK Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rue 21, Inc.
Represented By: David Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R and S Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: K Tom Kohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?