John Piccarreto v. Presstek, LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Piccarreto
Defendant: Presstek, LLC, Presstek Holdings, Inc. and DOES 1 to 50, inclusive
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Rebecca Callahan
Case Number: 2:2016cv01862
Filed: March 18, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES #75 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of the foregoing, the Court GRANTS in part Plaintiff's motion and awards his counsel $66,392.50 in attorneys' fees. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See order for details.) (kti)
January 18, 2018 Filing 81 BILL OF COSTS. Costs taxed in amount of $ 3,206.75 in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant re: #76 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendant. (wr)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Plaintiff's Motion for Plaintiff's Attorneys' Fees #75 presently scheduled for hearing on October 27, 2017, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 13, 2017 Filing 79 REPLY reply NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #75 filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
October 6, 2017 Filing 78 OPPOSITION Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #75 filed by Defendant Presstek, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas G. Mackey)(Gilinsky, Alexandra)
September 15, 2017 Filing 77 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #75 Supplemental Declaration filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto. (Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
September 7, 2017 Filing 76 APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Defendants John Piccarreto filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto. (Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
September 7, 2017 Filing 75 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto. Motion set for hearing on 10/27/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
August 24, 2017 Filing 74 JUDGMENT by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (See order for details.) (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (kti)
August 24, 2017 Filing 73 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW signed by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (See order for details.) (kti)
August 3, 2017 Filing 72 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit (non-trial), #70 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl)
August 1, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE OF LODGING filed by Defendant regarding Defendant's Trial Brief's Referenced Exhibits Pursuant to re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #69 , Trial Brief #66 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Final PreTrial Conference Order, #2 Exhibit 2 Redacted Verdict Form, #3 Exhibit 3 Joint Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 4 Joint Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 5 Joint Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 6 Joint Exhibit 28, #7 Exhibit 7 Joint Exhibit 36, #8 Exhibit 8 Day 2 Trial Transcript Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 9 Plaintiff's Closing Brief)(Mackey, Thomas)
August 1, 2017 Filing 70 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto. Exhibits in response to Doc#69 RE: Doc # 65, 66 and 67 as to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, #69 , Trial Brief #65 , Trial Brief #67 , Trial Brief #66 . (Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)- ORDER RE EXHIBITS CITED IN TRIAL BRIEFS by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The parties' trial briefs reference various exhibits #65 , #66 , #67 . None of these referenced exhibits, however, have been filed on the docket as attachments to the briefs nor have they been lodged with the Court. The Court therefore orders the parties to lodge all exhibits referenced in their trial briefs by Tuesday, August 1, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
April 20, 2017 Filing 68 NOTICE OF LODGING filed EXCERPTS FROM REPORTERS TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS DAY TWO, AFTERNOON SESSION IN SUPPORT OF Defendant's re Trial Brief #66 (Mackey, Thomas)
April 14, 2017 Filing 67 TRIAL BRIEF in Reply to Defendant's Closing Brief filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto.. (Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
March 31, 2017 Filing 66 TRIAL BRIEF filed by defendants Presstek Holdings, Inc., Presstek, LLC.. (Mackey, Thomas)
March 17, 2017 Filing 65 TRIAL BRIEF for Second Phase Closing filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto.. (Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER APPROVING THE PARTIES STIPULATION AS TO PHASE TWO BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND EMPLOYEES COVERED BY PAGA by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Having reviewed the parties' Stipulation #63 , the Court hereby sets the following schedule: (1) Plaintiff will file and exchange a closing brief regarding the second phase of the trial on or before 3/17/2017; (2) Defendant will file and exchange a closing brief regarding the second phase of the trial on or before 3/31/2017; and (3) Plaintiff will file and serve a rebuttal brief regarding the second phase of the trial on or before 4/14/2017; Thereafter, the matter shall stand submitted. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
March 1, 2017 Filing 63 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Closing Briefs filed by plaintiff John Piccarreto.(Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
February 24, 2017 Filing 62 RECEIPT FOR RELEASE OF EXHIBITS to Counsel Upon Verdict/Judgment at Trial; Pursuant to stipulation of counsel and/or by Order of the Court, all exhibits listed on the joint exhibits list are returned to counsel for respective party(ies). (gk)
February 24, 2017 Filing 61 VERDICT FORM (Blank). (gk)
February 24, 2017 Filing 60 UNREDACTED Jury Note Number 2 filed re: Redacted Jury Note #59 . (gk)
February 24, 2017 Filing 59 REDACTED Jury Note Number 2 filed. (gk)
February 24, 2017 Filing 58 UNREDACTED Jury Note Number 1 filed re: Redacted Jury Note #57 . (gk)
February 24, 2017 Filing 57 REDACTED Jury Note Number 1 filed. (gk)
February 24, 2017 Filing 56 LIST OF EXHIBITS AND WITNESSES at trial. (gk)
February 24, 2017 Filing 55 JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Given) by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (gk)
February 24, 2017 Filing 54 PRELIMINARY INSTRUCTIONS (Given) by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (gk)
February 24, 2017 Filing 53 UNREDACTED VERDICT FORM re: Redacted Verdict Form #52 . (gk)
February 24, 2017 Filing 52 REDACTED VERDICT FORM. (gk)
February 24, 2017 Filing 51 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 4th Day held and completed before Judge Dolly M. Gee: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Defendant(s) rest. Closing arguments made. Bailiff(s) sworn. Jury retires to deliberate. Jury Verdict in favor of plaintiff(s) is read and filed. Jury polled. Filed Witness & Exhibit Lists. Filed jury notes. Filed jury instructions. The Court receives jury note nos. 1-2, and meets and confers with counsel as to each. The parties are ordered to meet and confer and submit a joint status report re briefing schedule by 3/1/2016. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos/Anne Kielwasser. (gk)
February 23, 2017 Filing 50 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 3rd Day held before Judge Dolly M. Gee: Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Defendant orally moves under Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(a) for judgment as a matter of law as to all claims. The Court hears argument. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court rules as follows: (1) GRANTED as to intentional infliction of emotional distress claim; (2) GRANTED as to wrongful termination in violation of public policy claim to the extent it is based on a complaint of false advertising; (3) DEFERRED as to wrongful termination in violation of public policy to the extent it is based on a complaint that Defendant did not have a Material Data Safety Sheet; and (4) DENIED as to Labor Code Section 970 and intentional misrepresentation claims. Jury Trial continued to 2/24/2017 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos/Anne Kielwasser. (gk)
February 23, 2017 Filing 47 TRIAL BRIEF regarding Wrongful Termination in Violation of Public Policy Claims filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto.. (Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
February 23, 2017 Filing 46 TRIAL BRIEF RE PLAINTIFFS CLAIM OF WRONGFUL TERMINATION IN VIOLATION OF PUBLIC POLICY filed by defendants Presstek Holdings, Inc., Presstek, LLC.. (Mackey, Thomas)
February 22, 2017 Filing 49 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 2nd Day held before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. Plaintiff(s) rest. Case continued to February 23, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. for further trial. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos, Anne Kielwasser. (lom)
February 22, 2017 Filing 45 DECLARATION of Ron Donovan in Support of Defendants' Request to Permit Live Testimony Via Contemporaneous Transmission Pursuant to FRCP Rule 43(a) filed by Defendants Presstek Holdings, Inc., Presstek, LLC. (Mackey, Thomas)
February 21, 2017 Filing 48 MINUTES OF Jury Trial - 1st Day held before Judge Dolly M. Gee: Jury impaneled and sworn. Opening statements made. Witnesses called, sworn and testified. Exhibits identified and admitted. The Court approves the parties' oral stipulation to dismiss Defendant Presstek Holdings, Inc. but that Defendant Presstek Holdings, Inc. shall be jointly liable with Defendant Presstek, LLC if any verdict against the remaining Defendant is rendered. Jury Trial continued to 2/22/2017 08:45 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (gk)
February 21, 2017 Filing 44 Joint Stipulation as to Zahara's Worldwide Sales Numbers filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto (Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
February 17, 2017 Filing 43 MINUTES OF Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: The Court held a settlement conference with Plaintiffs and Defendants counsel, along with Plaintiff John Piccarreto and Defendants representative, Cathy Cavana. The settlement conference was conducted off the record. All parties participated in good faith. The matter did not result in a settlement. Court Recorder: CS2/17/2017. (sbu)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson,, Set deadlines and hearings( Confidential Settlement Statement due by 2/15/2017, Settlement Conference set for 2/17/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson.) (rh)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Pursuant to the parties request, the parties shall contact forthwith the clerk to the Honorable Karen Stevenson, United States Magistrate Judge, to schedule a settlement conference to take place on February 17, 2017. The parties shall file a joint status report immediately after the conclusion of their settlement conference. (kti)
January 31, 2017 Filing 40 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto.. (Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
January 31, 2017 Filing 39 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by defendants Presstek Holdings, Inc., Presstek, LLC.. (Mackey, Thomas)
January 27, 2017 Filing 38 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alexandra Gilinsky counsel for Defendants Presstek Holdings, Inc., Presstek, LLC. Adding Alexandra C. Gilinsky as counsel of record for Defendants Presstek, LLC and Presstek Holdings, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Presstek, LLC and Presstek Holdings, Inc.. (Attorney Alexandra Gilinsky added to party Presstek Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Gilinsky added to party Presstek, LLC(pty:dft))(Gilinsky, Alexandra)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (gk)
January 23, 2017 Filing 36 MINUTES OF Final Pretrial Conference held before Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court and counsel confer regarding the logistics of trial. The Jury Trial shall commence on 2/21/2017 at 8:30 AM and will conclude within four days. Each side shall be allotted up to 30 minutes to present its opening statements, and seven hours for their respective case-in-chief (including cross-examination). Counsel are instructed to familiarize themselves with the Court's audio-visual equipment prior to the first day of trial, as well as the Case Management Order ("CMO") #12 with regard to general decorum and courtroom procedures. The Court extends the deadline for the parties to file the disputed jury instructions in conformance with the Court's CMO by 1/31/2017. The Court apprises counsel of its current trial calendar and the possibility of trailing a low numbered civil case currently scheduled to commence on 2/21/2017 or rescheduling the trial date. Counsel are instructed to contact the courtroom deputy clerk by 1/31/2017 to advise the Court if the parties can stipulate to a Magistrate Judge to preside over the trial. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (gk)
January 20, 2017 Filing 35 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto.. (Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
January 20, 2017 Filing 34 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Amended set) filed by defendant Presstek Holdings, Inc., Presstek, LLC.. (Mackey, Thomas)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADVANCING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE #31 #32 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Final Pretrial Conference is advanced to January 23, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. All other dates and deadlines remain unchanged. (lom)
January 19, 2017 Filing 32 STIPULATION for Order [Proposed] Order for: Advancing the Final Pretrial Conference; or in the alternative, to Allow Second Chair for Plaintiff to Attend; or in the alternative, to Continue Trial and the Final Pretrial Conference filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto.(Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
January 17, 2017 Filing 31 STIPULATION for Order Advancing the Final Pretrial Conference; or in the alternative, to Allow Second Chair for Plaintiff to Attend; or in the alternative, to Continue Trial and the Final Pretrial Conference filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto.(Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
January 9, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Defendants' Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law filed 1/3/2017 #25 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 11-8 Memorandum/brief exceeding 10 pages shall contain table of contents. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
January 4, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE OF LODGING Proposed Pretrial Conference Order Plaintiff John Piccarreto. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Final Pretrial Order)(Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
January 3, 2017 Filing 28 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto.. (Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
January 3, 2017 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto. (Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
January 3, 2017 Filing 26 Joint PRETRIAL STIPULATION regarding Exhibits . (Mackey, Thomas)
January 3, 2017 Filing 25 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM of CONTENTIONS of FACT and LAW filed by defendants Presstek, LLC. (Mackey, Thomas)
January 3, 2017 Filing 24 Witness List filed by defendants Presstek, LLC.. (Mackey, Thomas)
January 3, 2017 Filing 23 PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS (Annotated set) filed by defendants Presstek, LLC.. (Mackey, Thomas)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE DISCOVERY CUT-OFF AND DISPOSITIVE MOTION CUTOFF by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The parties waited until the day before the discovery cut-off to file their Stipulation to extend the deadline #20 . Notwithstanding the absence of a sufficient showing of due diligence and compliance with the Court's orders, the Court will sua sponte extend the discovery cut-off to 12/13/2016 and the dispositive motion cut-off to no later than 11/25/2016. Because the parties have not demonstrated due diligence or good cause for their failure to comply with the Court's orders, their request for a continuance of the discovery and motion cut-off dates is otherwise DENIED. (gk)
October 25, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Dolly M Gee. Effective October 31, 2016, Judge Gee will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 8C on the 8th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 8C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 17, 2016 Filing 20 First STIPULATION to Continue discovery and motion cut-off from 10/18/16 and 10/28/16 to 1/6/17 and 1/13/17 filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
August 5, 2016 Filing 19 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto: Mediation held on July 25, 2016. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.(Amezcua-Moll, Rosemary)
July 26, 2016 Filing 18 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Rebecca Callahan: Mediation held on July 25, 2016. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time.(Callahan, Rebecca)
July 5, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Rebecca Callahan has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING PARTIES JOINT REQUEST TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order #15 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order is modified so that the Parties may complete their mediation on 7/25/2016, and submit a Joint Report re Results of Early Mediation no later than 8/5/2016. (gk)
June 27, 2016 Filing 15 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Rebecca Callahan, Esq. may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Defendants Presstek Holdings, Inc., Presstek, LLC(Mackey, Thomas)
June 27, 2016 Filing 14 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Early Mediation Deadline from June 17, 2016 to August 5, 2016 Re: Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only,, #12 filed by defendants Presstek Holdings, Inc., Presstek, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mackey, Thomas)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 6/17/16 (early mediation); 12/20/16. Joint report re results of early mediation due by 6/24/16; joint status report re settlement due by 12/27/16; no appearance necessary. (iv)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Amended Pleadings due by 8/5/2016. Discovery cut-off 10/18/2016. Exhibit List due by 1/3/2017. Motions in Limine to be filed by 12/27/2016. Motions due by 10/28/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/3/2017. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 12/20/2016. Status Report due by 12/27/2016. Witness List due by 1/3/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/24/2017 at 2:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 2/21/2017 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL & TRIAL DATES) (iv)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Scheduling Conference, currently scheduled for hearing on May 6, 2016, is hereby VACATED and no appearances are necessary. The Court will issue a Scheduling and Case Management Order based upon a review of the parties Joint Rule 26(f) Report. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 28, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting filed 4/22/2016 #9 . The following error(s) was found: Document is unsigned by plaintiff's counsel. The signature of Attorney Rosemary Amezcua-Moll is represented on the document with an "/s/." The filer does not indicate that the other signatory listed concurs in the filing's content and has authorized the filing, Local Rule 5-4.3.4(a)(2)(i). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
April 22, 2016 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan and Schedule of Proposed Dates ; estimated length of trial 7-10 days, filed by Defendants Presstek Holdings, Inc., Presstek, LLC.. (Mackey, Thomas)
March 22, 2016 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendants Presstek Holdings, Inc., Presstek, LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on March 18, 2016. (Mackey, Thomas)
March 21, 2016 Filing 7 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26 (f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee is set for hearing 5/6/2016 at 11:00 AM. (iv)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (iv)
March 21, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
March 21, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil)
March 18, 2016 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff John Piccarreto in Los Angeles Superior Court on 12/29/2015, and attached to Notice of Removal #1 as Exhibit A. (jtil)
March 18, 2016 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Presstek Holdings, Inc., Presstek, LLC in Los Angeles Superior Court on 3/16/2016, and attached to Notice of Removal #1 as Exhibit C.(jtil)
March 18, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, identifying Presstek Holdings, Inc.. (Mackey, Thomas)
March 18, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants PRESSTEK HOLDING, INC., PRESSTEK,LLC. (Mackey, Thomas)
March 18, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, case number BC605658 Receipt No: 0973-17487028 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants PRESSTEK HOLDING, INC., PRESSTEK,LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint and Related Documents, #2 Exhibit B Notices and Acknowledgement of Receipt - Civil, #3 Exhibit C Defendants' Answer) (Attorney Thomas G Mackey added to party PRESSTEK HOLDING, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas G Mackey added to party PRESSTEK,LLC(pty:dft))(Mackey, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Piccarreto v. Presstek, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presstek, LLC
Represented By: Alexandra Gilinsky
Represented By: Thomas G Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presstek Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Gilinsky
Represented By: Thomas G Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Piccarreto
Represented By: Rosemary Amezcua-Moll
Represented By: Sarah J Nowels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Rebecca Callahan
Represented By: Rebecca Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?