Gimme The Cargo, Ltd. v. SNA Transportation Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gimme The Cargo, Ltd. and Gimme the Cargo Ltd
Defendant: SNA Transportation Inc, SNA Transportation, Inc. and Yon Kwang Kim
Case Number: 2:2016cv02209
Filed: March 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin that the above-captioned action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 45 days from the filing date of this Order, to re-open the action if settlement is not consummated. The court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
May 19, 2016 Filing 31 NOTICE of Settlement filed by defendant SNA Transportation, Inc.. (Dipolito, Frank)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 6/2/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (jloz)
April 21, 2016 Filing 29 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant SNA Transportation, Inc., (Landau, Ross)
April 21, 2016 Filing 28 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #5 filed by Defendant SNA Transportation, Inc..(Attorney Ross Ian Landau added to party SNA Transportation, Inc.(pty:dft))(Landau, Ross)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin GRANTING Request for Approval of Substitution of attorney Frank X Dipolito of Swain and Dipolito LLP for defendant SNA Transportation, inc., in place and stead of Beata Shapiro of Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker #26 . (jp)
April 14, 2016 Filing 26 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Frank X. Dipolito in place of attorney Beata Shapiro filed by DEFENDANT SNA Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney) (Attorney Frank Xavier Dipolito added to party SNA Transportation, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Dipolito, Frank)
April 12, 2016 Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All pleadings filed in this matter should contain the case number and the assigned judges' initials to ensure proper routing of documents. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 31, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Beata Shapiro for Defendants Yon Kwang Kim, SNA Transportation, Inc.. re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et)
March 31, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to attorney Allyn James Crawford for Plaintiff Gimme the Cargo Ltd. re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 . Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. (et)
March 31, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et)
March 31, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:15-cv-04936-CBA-MDG, from USDC Eastern District of New York (Brooklyn). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:16-cv-02209-FMO (MRWx). (et)
March 31, 2016 Filing 20 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from New York Eastern
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TRANSFER to Central District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent electronically. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 3/30/2016. (Fernandez, Erica) (Fernandez, Erica). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
March 30, 2016 Filing 18 STIPULATION To Transfer by SNA Transportation, Inc. (Shapiro, Beata) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
March 23, 2016 Minute Entry for status conference held by telephone before Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on March 23, 2016. Appearances: For plaintiff - Allyn Crawford. For defendant - Beata Shapiro. The parties stated on the record that they have agreed that the case shall be transferred to the Central District of California. The parties shall file a stipulation to that effect. (Court Reporter Sherry Bryant.) (Chabot, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
March 9, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gimme The Cargo, Ltd. as to defendant Kim only (Crawford, Allyn) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
March 9, 2016 Filing 16 Letter Motion to Appear by Telephone for pre-motion conference today at 4:30 p.m. by Gimme The Cargo, Ltd.. (Crawford, Allyn) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #16 Letter Motion to Appear by Telephone. Application Granted. Today's 4:30 p.m. pre-motion conference will be a telephone conference. Defendants' counsel is directed to coordinate the call to chambers at (718) 613-2410. So Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on March 9, 2016. (Chabot, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
March 9, 2016 Minute Entry for pre-motion conference held by telephone before Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on March 9, 2016. Appearances: For plaintiff - Allyn Crawford. For defendant - Beata Shapiro. As stated on the record, a telephone status conference will be held before Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on March 23, 2016, at 1:00 p.m. Defendant's counsel is directed to coordinate the call to chambers at (718) 613-2410. (Court Reporter Linda Marino.) (Chabot, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
February 24, 2016 Filing 15 Letter advising as to consent to change of venue by Gimme The Cargo, Ltd. (Crawford, Allyn) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
February 18, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Beata Shapiro on behalf of Yon Kwang Kim, SNA Transportation, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Shapiro, Beata) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
February 18, 2016 Filing 13 Letter Requesting Adjournment by Yon Kwang Kim, SNA Transportation, Inc. (Shapiro, Beata) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #13 Letter Requesting Adjournment. Application granted. The pre-motion conference is rescheduled to March 9, 2016, at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 10D South before Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon. Defendants' counsel may appear by telephone. So Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on February 18, 2016. (Chabot, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER re: #12 Letter Requesting Adjournment. Application denied without prejudice. Defendants are instructed to submit a request for adjournment that complies with the Court's Individual Rule 2(D), which requires, inter alia, that such requests propose a revised conference date and state whether the adversary consents to or opposes the request. So Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on February 12, 2016. (Chabot, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
February 11, 2016 Minute Entry for Initial Conference held on 2/11/2016 before Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go: Appearances by A. Crawford for plaintiff; B. Shapiro for defendants. Plaintiff's counsel stated that his client does not seek discovery relating to defendants' contemplated motion to transfer and defendant Kim's motion to dismiss. Initial disclosures must be served by plaintiff by 2/26/2016 and by defendants by 2/4/2016. A further schedule will be set after briefing or determination of the defendants' contemplated motion to transfer. Plaintiff must advise by 2/19/2016 whether it consents to transfer of this action to the District Court for the Central District of California.FTR/C: 12:00 - 12:08 p.m. (Hugh, Lewis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
February 11, 2016 Filing 12 Letter Requesting Adjournment by Yon Kwang Kim, SNA Transportation, Inc. (Shapiro, Beata) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER: a telephone conference will be held on 2/12/2016 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go to discuss whether any discovery is necessary in advance of defendants' contemplated motion to transfer or dismiss. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 2/8/2016. (Proujansky, Josh) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING ORDER re: #11 Letter Request for Pre-Motion Conference by Yon Kwang Kim and SNA Transportation, Inc. A pre-motion conference on defendants' proposed motion to dismiss and motion to transfer will be held on February 26, 2016, at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 10D South before Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon. (Chabot, Ryan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
January 27, 2016 Filing 11 Letter Requesting a Pre-Motion Conference by Yon Kwang Kim, SNA Transportation, Inc. (Shapiro, Beata) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: The time for SNA Transportation, Inc. to answer is extended to 1/31/2016 as stipulated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 1/4/2016. (Hugh, Lewis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
December 31, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by SNA Transportation, Inc.. (Shapiro, Beata) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
December 29, 2015 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gimme The Cargo, Ltd.. SNA Transportation, Inc. served on 12/14/2015, answer due 1/4/2016. (Crawford, Allyn) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
December 23, 2015 NOTICE: plaintiff should note that the filing of an amended complaint does not restart the 120 day period for service under Rule 4(m) as to defendants who were named in the original complaint. See Siks for Justice v. Nath, 893 F. Supp. 2d 598, 607 (S.D.N.Y. 2012). (Proujansky, Josh) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Plaintiff is advised that the one-hundred twenty day (120)period for service of the complaint specified in Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) has elapsed. If plaintiff has not effectuated service, plaintiff's time to do so is extended to January 12, 2016. Plaintiff must electronically file the return of service no later than January 26, 2016. Plaintiff is reminded that this Court may sua sponte dismiss an action without prejudice for failure to effectuate timely service. If service has been completed and the time to answer has expired, plaintiff must move for entry of default judgment by February 9, 2016 and, if appropriate, for default judgment. All motion papers must be filed electronically and the original submission sent to the Clerk of the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 12/22/2015. (Hugh, Lewis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
December 7, 2015 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Yon Kwang Kim, SNA Transportation, Inc.. (Fernandez, Erica) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
December 4, 2015 Filing 6 Proposed Summons. Re #5 Amended Complaint by Gimme The Cargo, Ltd. (Crawford, Allyn) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
December 4, 2015 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gimme The Cargo, Ltd.. (Crawford, Allyn) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Even though this action was commenced on August 21, 2015, no return of service has been filed and no defendant has filed an answer or sought to move to dismiss. The plaintiff is reminded that Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure requires that service be completed within 120 days after commencement of an action and that the time to serve expires December 20, 2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 10/22/2015. (Hugh, Lewis) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
August 24, 2015 Filing 3 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
August 24, 2015 Filing 2 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
August 24, 2015 Case Assigned to Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our ##website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]
August 21, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-7971069 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Gimme The Cargo, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Crawford, Allyn) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/31/2016.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gimme The Cargo, Ltd. v. SNA Transportation Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gimme The Cargo, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gimme the Cargo Ltd
Represented By: Allyn J Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNA Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SNA Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Xavier Dipolito
Represented By: Beata Shapiro
Represented By: Ross Ian Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yon Kwang Kim
Represented By: Beata Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?