Nathaniel J. Friedman v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Nathaniel J Friedman
Defendant: Aztec Foreclosure Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Does, Nationstar Mortgage, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association and Veriprise Processing Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02265
Filed: April 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F. Mumm
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - DEFENDANT VERIPRISE PROCESSING SOLUTIONS, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court GRANTS Veriprise's motion to dismiss 106 and DISMISSES plaintiffs claims with prejudice. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - Defendant Veriprise Processing Solutions, LLC's Motion to Set Aside Default 102 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court GRANTS Veriprise's motion to set aside the default entered against it and DENIES plaintiff's request for sanctions. The Court directs Veriprise to file its motion to dismiss forthwith. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC, AND U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS 89 ; DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS 90 Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder. In accordance with the foregoing, the Court GRANTS with prejudice defendants U.S. Bank and Nationstar's motion to dismiss plaintiffs complaint in its entirety. The Court also GRANTS with prejudice defendant BANA's motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (lom)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.'S MOTION TO DISMISS 26 ; DEFENDANT NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC AND U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS 31 ; PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER A ND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 53 Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder. In accordance with the foregoing, the Court GRANTS without prejudice defendants U.S. Bank and Nationstar's motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint in its enti rety. The Court also GRANTS without prejudice defendant BANA's motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint. Plaintiff is granted fourteen (14) days to file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies identified herein. Failure to do so may result in dismissal with prejudice. In light of the court's dismissal with leave to amend, defendants and their agents, employees, representatives, successors, assigns, attorneys, and all others acting in concert or in participation w ith them are hereby ENJOINED for thirty (30) days from proceeding with the non-judicial foreclosure sale of the Property located at 1423 Schuyler Road, Beverly Hills, California 90210. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (lom) Modified on 6/7/2016 (lom).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nathaniel J. Friedman v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aztec Foreclosure Corporation
Represented By: Darlene Palaganas Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Laura E Coombe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Parisa Jassim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Parisa Jassim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veriprise Processing Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel J Friedman
Represented By: Charles E Ruben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?