Theresa Brooke v. RMDS Hospitality Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Theresa Brooke
Defendant: RMDS Hospitality Group, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv03751
Filed: May 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Christina A Snyder
2 Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Upon Stipulation and good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED dismissing the above action with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
December 8, 2016 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41 filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strojnik, Peter)
November 14, 2016 Filing 13 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Christina A. Snyder. Effective November 21, 2016, Judge Snyder will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 8D on the 8th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 8D of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 8, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #11 . The following error(s) was found: There is an Answer on file. Also, lacking the citation/rule on the document for dismissal. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lom)
November 4, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Strojnik, Peter)
September 6, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:16-cv-03751 CAS(AGRx). (rn)
September 3, 2016 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke, upon Defendant RMDS Hospitality Group, Inc. served on 6/8/2016, answer due 6/29/2016. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Strojnik, Peter)
June 28, 2016 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant RMDS Hospitality Group, Inc..(Attorney Frank A Weiser added to party RMDS Hospitality Group, Inc. (pty:dft))(Weiser, Frank)
June 24, 2016 Filing 7 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (im)
June 1, 2016 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant RMDS Hospitality Group, Inc. (jp)
June 1, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 CV-11 Statement of Consent to Proceed Before Assigned united States Magistrate Judge) (jp)
May 28, 2016 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter)
May 28, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke, (Strojnik, Peter)
May 28, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Strojnik, Peter)
May 28, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17905828 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Theresa Brooke. (Attorney Peter Kristofer Strojnik added to party Theresa Brooke(pty:pla))(Strojnik, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Theresa Brooke v. RMDS Hospitality Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMDS Hospitality Group, Inc.
Represented By: Frank A Weiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Brooke
Represented By: Peter Kristofer Strojnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?