Starbucks Corporation v. Hitman Glass et al
Plaintiff: Starbucks Corporation
Defendant: Does, Hitman Glass and James Landgraf
Case Number: 2:2016cv03937
Filed: June 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Walsh
Presiding Judge: Otis D. Wright
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT HITMAN GLAS (SEE DOCUMENT RE SPECIFICS) 51 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (lc)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DEFAULT JUDGMENT 34 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Defendant James Landgraf is liable for Plaintiffs claims of trademark dilution, copyright infringement, trademark infringement, and false designation of origin. Plaintiff shall recover from Defendant James Landgraf the sum of $410,580.00 in damages.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.). (lc) Modified on 10/21/2016. (lc).
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT 34 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II : The Court GRANTS Starbucks Motion for Default Judgment against Landgraf. The Court DENIES Starbucks request for permanent injunctions under both the Lanham and Copyright Acts, but GRANTS Starbucks request for $410,580 in damages and attorneys fees. Upon entry of judgment, the Clerk of the Court shall close the case against Landgraf. (lc). Modified on 10/20/2016 (lc).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starbucks Corporation v. Hitman Glass et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitman Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Landgraf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Seth A Gold
Represented By: Rebecca Liu
Represented By: Aaron E Millstein
Represented By: Pallavi M Wahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?