Lawana Smith et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lawana Smith, Brenda Hankins, Alice Parks, Verna Lea Nash, Mary Lyles, Virgile Lyles, Mary Ann Maxwell, Herbert Myers, Bonnie Paul, Carl B. Paul, Johnathan Hankins, Barbara Talbert, Clinton Jay Boggs, Kenneth Russell, Lola Miller, Henry Smith, Patricia Ann Moore, Glenford Talbert, Robert Parks, Evelyn Thomas, Luther Daniel, Shirley Farthing, Yurris McClendon, Patricia Russell, Karen Boggs, Miriam M. Myers and Norma Daniel
Defendant: Pfizer Inc, McKesson Corporation, Kaiser Permanente Downey Pharmacy, Kaiser Permanente International, Pfizer Inc. and Does 1-50
Case Number: 2:2016cv05560
Filed: July 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2017 Filing 28 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles. (rrp)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Since less than 100 plaintiffs have proposed that their cases be tried jointly, the Court does not have jurisdiction under CAFA's mass action provision and all Lipitor cases presently before this Court must be remanded to state court. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' motion to remand is GRANTED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (rrp)
March 7, 2017 Filing 26 Effective March 13, 2017, Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building, COURTROOM 680 on the 6th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 680 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 1st floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Regarding Consolidated Proceedings by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Pursuant to the Courts directives in the February 1, 2017, hearing, the parties in this case and related cases are directed to file their consolidated motions regarding jurisdiction under the following case number: SAMC 17-00005 CJC(JPRx). Going forward, the parties should file papers pertaining to common issues between the various cases under the consolidated case number. However, filings particular to one case, such as pro hoc vice applications, should continue to be filed under that cases number. The Court directs attorney Bill Robins to timely serve any counsel for actions remanded from the JPML court subsequent to this order with (1) a copy of this minute order and (2) the minute order memorializing the February 1, 2017, status conference. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-01800-CJC-JPR et al. (See attached list)(lwag)
February 1, 2017 Filing 24 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Status Conference by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Status conference held. The Court and counsel confer regarding matters as stated on the record. The Clerks Office shall open a new action that will serve as the master case in which all future documents shall be filed (with the exception of administrative filings such as Conditional Remand Orders from the JPML, Pro Hac Vice Applications, Notices of Appearance/Withdrawal, etc.) Counsel shall file a proposed stipulation and case management order in the new action once it is opened on the docket. The Court directs attorney Bill Robins to timely serve any counsel for actions remanded from the JPML court subsequent to this Order with (1) a copy of this minute order and (2) the minute order regarding consolidated proceedings. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-01800-CJC-JPR et al. (See attached list)(lwag)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Non-Resident Attorney Mark S. Cheffo's APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (See attached list for more case numbers) Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-01800-CJC-JPR et al. (See attached list) Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-01800-CJC-JPR et al. (See attached list)(lwag)
January 23, 2017 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark S. Cheffo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Pfizer Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19232508) filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sear cy, Marshall)
January 20, 2017 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marshall M Searcy, III counsel for Defendant Pfizer Inc.. Michael Tucker Cole is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc.. (Searcy, Marshall)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS AND NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court set a status conference on February 1, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. In an effort to manage these cases more efficiently, the Court orders that all Pro Hac Vice Applications be filed no later than January 23, 2017, in each case where the non-resident attorney is counsel of record. The fee shall be paid at the time the Application is filed. See document for further details. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-01800-CJC-JPR et al (See attached).(lwag)
January 6, 2017 Filing 19 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Cormac J. Carney ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO ADVISE THE COURT REGARDING CASE REPRESENTATIONS. In light of the remand of these actions from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the Court hereby sets a status conference for Wednesday, February 1, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. to discuss a briefing and hearing schedule on plaintiffs motions for remand. Counsel for plaintiffs are ordered to email the Courts Courtroom Deputy, Melissa Kunig, (melissa_kunig@cacd.uscourts.gov) no later than January 18, 2017, an itemized list identifying every case he or she is counsel of record. Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-01800-CJC-JPR et al. (See attachment). (rrp)
December 30, 2016 Filing 18 STATUS REPORT and Request for Conference Concerning California Lipitor Actions filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Searcy, Marshall)
December 29, 2016 Filing 17 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2502, that the actions listed on the attached schedule be remanded to their respective transferor courts (see document for further details). Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-01801-CJC-JPR et al. (See attachment). (rrp)
December 29, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE OF TRANSFER/Remand and Reopening of Case. This action has been remanded to this court from the District of South Carolina, case number (See Conditional Remand Order dated 12/29/2016). The case has been reopened and assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (REOPENED, MD-JS5). Associated Cases: 2:14-cv-01801-CJC-JPR et al. (See Conditional Remand Order dated 12/29/2016). (rrp)
August 30, 2016 Filing 15 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from District of South Carolina, 2:16-cv-02975 filed 8/30/2016. (lom)
August 29, 2016 Filing 14 Transfer order from the Unites States Judicial Panel of Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2502, transferring case to USDC, District of South Carolina and assigned to Honorable Richard M. Gergel. Case transferred electronically. (lwag)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Staying Action by Judge Cormac J. Carney: A motion to transfer this case is currently pending before the United States JudicialPanel of Multidistrict Litigation (The AMDL Panel@). Accordingly, this case is stayed pending a decision by the MDL Panel. Plaintiff shall advise the Court of the MDL Panel=s decision on the motion within 14 days of receipt of that decision. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lwag)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:13-cv-01250 CJC(JPRx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-05560 CJC(JPRx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (rn)
July 27, 2016 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc., served on July 26, 2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Searcy, Marshall)
July 27, 2016 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc..(Searcy, Marshall)
July 27, 2016 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc., served on July 26, 2016. (Searcy, Marshall)
July 26, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 26, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
July 26, 2016 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc. (Searcy, Marshall)
July 26, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc., (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Searcy, Marshall)
July 26, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc.. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings Related Case(s): See Appendix A (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Searcy, Marshall)
July 26, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc.. Related Case(s): 14-cv-1899, 14-cv-1818, 14-cv-1932, and others (Searcy, Marshall)
July 26, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A)(Searcy, Marshall)
July 26, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC617993 Receipt No: 0973-18249943 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Pfizer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J) (Attorney Marshall M Searcy, III added to party Pfizer Inc.(pty:dft))(Searcy, Marshall)
July 26, 2016 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Kaiser Permanente Downey Pharmacy, Kaiser Permanente International, McKesson Corporation, Pfizer Inc., Does 1-50. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Herbert Myers, Verna Lea Nash, Evelyn Thomas, Norma Daniel, Barbara Talbert, Henry Smith, Patricia Ann Moore, Lawana Smith, Glenford Talbert, Kenneth Russell, Alice Parks, Shirley Farthing, Luther Daniel, Johnathan Hankins, Mary Ann Maxwell, Bonnie Paul, Virgile Lyles, Yurris McClendon, Patricia Russell, Robert Parks, Clinton Jay Boggs, Mary Lyles, Carl B. Paul, Lola Miller, Karen Boggs, Miriam M. Myers, Brenda Hankins. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/22/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #2] (et)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawana Smith et al v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy A Moseley
Represented By: Habib Nasrullah
Represented By: Emma E Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Downey Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente International
Represented By: Sally Hosn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Marshall M Searcy, III
Represented By: Mark S Cheffo
Represented By: Michael Tucker Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawana Smith
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Hankins
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Parks
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Verna Lea Nash
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lyles
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgile Lyles
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Ann Maxwell
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Myers
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Paul
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl B. Paul
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Hankins
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Talbert
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Jay Boggs
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Russell
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lola Miller
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Smith
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Ann Moore
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenford Talbert
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Parks
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Thomas
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther Daniel
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Farthing
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yurris McClendon
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Russell
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Boggs
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam M. Myers
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Daniel
Represented By: Keith L Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?