Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC v. ODES UTVS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC
Defendant: ODES UTVS, LLC, Mike Smith and Odes UTVS LLC
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Daniel Ben-Zvi
Case Number: 2:2016cv05673
Filed: July 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Manuel L Real
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
2 Judge: Karen L Stevenson
3 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISMISSING THE COMPLAINT AND COUNTERCLAIM WITH PREJUDICE by Judge George H. Wu: Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant TYLERTOWN FARM SUPPLY, LLC ("Plaintiff") and Defendant and Counter-Claimant ODES UTVS, LLC ("Defendant"), constituting all parties to this action, through their counsel of record, enter into this stipulation to dismiss the Complaint and Counterclaim with prejudice. Upon consideration of the Stipulation, the Court hereby enters an Order as follows: (1) Defendant is dismissed with prejudice; and (2) Plaintiff is dismissed with prejudice.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (cr)
March 1, 2017 Filing 53 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to settlement filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Erin Marie Mallon added to party Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC(pty:cd))(Mallon, Erin)
February 27, 2017 Filing 52 Request of Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC to Appear Telephonically at the March 2, 2017 Post-Mediation Status Conference (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mallon, Erin)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson re Stipulation for Protective Order #50 (See order for details) (rh)
December 22, 2016 Filing 50 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant and Counter-Claimant Odes UTVS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Loon, Erica)
December 22, 2016 Filing 49 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Erin Marie Mallon counsel for Plaintiff Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC. Adding Erin M. Mallon as counsel of record for Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC. (Attorney Erin Marie Mallon added to party Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC(pty:pla))(Mallon, Erin)
December 15, 2016 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Brittany Marie Elias on behalf of Defendant Odes UTVS LLC, Counter Claimant Odes UTVS LLC (Attorney Brittany Marie Elias added to party Odes UTVS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Brittany Marie Elias added to party Odes UTVS LLC(pty:cc))(Elias, Brittany)
December 7, 2016 Filing 47 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Daniel Ben-Zvi has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
November 22, 2016 Filing 46 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Dan Ben-Zvi may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC(Johnson, Jeremy)
November 8, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge George H. Wu. Effective November 14, 2016, Judge Wu will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 9D on the 9th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 9D of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 21, 2016 Filing 44 ANSWER to Counterclaim #41 with JURY DEMAND filed by Plaintiff and Counterdefendant Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC.(Johnson, Jeremy)
October 3, 2016 Filing 43 MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets the following: Amended Pleadings due by 10/14/2016. Discovery cut-off 4/19/2017. Motions due by 6/15/2017. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 3/2/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Jury Trial set for 7/25/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (mrgo)
September 30, 2016 Filing 42 Certificate and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Odes UTVS LLC, (Van Loon, Erica)
September 30, 2016 Filing 41 COUNTERCLAIM against Counter Defendant Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC; Jury Demand, filed by Counterclaimant Odes UTVS LLC.(Van Loon, Erica)
September 30, 2016 Filing 40 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #36 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Odes UTVS LLC.(Van Loon, Erica)
September 29, 2016 Filing 39 RESPONSE filed by Defendant Odes UTVS LLCto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held #38 Defendant Odes' Response to Order to Show Cause Why This Case Should not Be Dismissed for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Erica J. Van Loon, #2 Declaration of Mike Smith)(Van Loon, Erica)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTES - IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUBJECT MATTER JURISIDICTION by Judge George H. Wu. **see document for details** (jag)
September 19, 2016 Filing 37 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC.. (Johnson, Jeremy)
September 9, 2016 Filing 36 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Odes UTVS LLC amending Notice of Removal,,, #1 , filed by Plaintiff Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Johnson, Jeremy)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct #34 . Plaintiff shall file and serve its First Amended Complaint on or by September 9, 2016; Defendants have 21 days to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint after being served with the First Amended Complaint. (mrgo)
September 1, 2016 Filing 34 Joint STIPULATION to AMEND COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Johnson, Jeremy)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge George H. Wu. On the Courts own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for October 3, 2016, at 8:30 a.m. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than September 19, 2016. (kss)
August 24, 2016 Filing 32 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Jeffrey E McDonald on behalf of Plaintiff Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will be be appearing as attorney of record in this case. Attorney will be removed from the docket pursuant to G-109. (lt)
August 24, 2016 Filing 31 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeremy S Johnson counsel for Plaintiff Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC. Adding Jeremy S. Johnson as counsel of record for Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC. (Attorney Jeremy S Johnson added to party Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC(pty:pla))(Johnson, Jeremy)
August 24, 2016 Filing 30 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. (kss)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS ODES UTVS, LLC AND MIKE SMITH'S REQUEST TO REFILE A MOTION TO DISMISS BY SEPTEMBER 7, 2016 by Judge George H. Wu: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants may refile a motion to dismiss by September 7, 2016. (cr)
August 22, 2016 Filing 28 Notice of Withdrawal of Memorandum in Support of Motion #3 , Motion to Dismiss (cause or other) #2 filed by Defendants Odes UTVS LLC, Mike Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Request to Refile a Motion to Dismiss)(Van Loon, Erica)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:16-cv-01296 GW(KSx). Case transferred from Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-05673 GW(KSx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn)
August 15, 2016 Filing 26 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney James W Shelson on behalf of Defendants Odes UTVS LLC, Mike Smith. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. (lt)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
August 5, 2016 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Dan Liu on behalf of Defendants Odes UTVS LLC, Mike Smith (Attorney Dan Liu added to party Odes UTVS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dan Liu added to party Mike Smith(pty:dft))(Liu, Dan)
August 5, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Erica J Van Loon on behalf of Defendants Odes UTVS LLC, Mike Smith (Attorney Erica J Van Loon added to party Odes UTVS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Erica J Van Loon added to party Mike Smith(pty:dft))(Van Loon, Erica)
August 1, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James W Shelson. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
August 1, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey E McDonald. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (ghap)
August 1, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap)
August 1, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:16-cv-00062-KS-MTP, from Southern District of Mississippi. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:16-cv-5673-R-SS. (ghap)
August 1, 2016 Filing 18 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Mississippi Southern
July 28, 2016 District Transfer Out to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. (CS) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Memorandum Opinion and Order, the Court grants Defendants' Motions to Strike #13 , #14 Plaintiff's unauthorized sur-replies, and it grants Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue #4 . This case shall immediately be transferred to the United States District Court for the Central District of California. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on 7/28/2016. (CS) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
July 28, 2016 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CD California Complaint, #2 Exhibit New Branson Dealer Discount, #3 Exhibit Email Correspondence, #4 Exhibit Inventory Photograph)(McDonald, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
July 28, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC (McDonald, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
May 31, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike #12 Rebuttal by ODES UTVS, LLC, Mike Smith (Shelson, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
May 31, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #11 Rebuttal by ODES UTVS, LLC, Mike Smith (Shelson, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
May 30, 2016 Filing 12 Rebuttal re #4 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC (McDonald, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
May 30, 2016 Filing 11 Rebuttal re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC (McDonald, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
May 27, 2016 Filing 10 Rebuttal re #4 MOTION to Change Venue filed by ODES UTVS, LLC (Shelson, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
May 27, 2016 Filing 9 Rebuttal re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ODES UTVS, LLC (Shelson, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
May 20, 2016 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC (McDonald, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
May 20, 2016 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Correspondence from Defendants to Plaintiff)(McDonald, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Deadlines and Dates for Response/Rebuttal to Defendants' #2 Motion to Dismiss and #4 Motion to Transfer Venue. Plaintiff's Response to said motions shall be due on or before May 23, 2016. Defendants' Rebuttal, if desired, shall be due on or before June 2, 2016. Signed by District Judge Keith Starrett on May 5, 2016 (dsl) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
May 4, 2016 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Change Venue filed by ODES UTVS, LLC, Mike Smith (Shelson, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
May 4, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION to Change Venue by ODES UTVS, LLC, Mike Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dealer Agreement)(Shelson, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
May 4, 2016 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ODES UTVS, LLC, Mike Smith (Shelson, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
May 4, 2016 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss by ODES UTVS, LLC, Mike Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dealer Agreement)(Shelson, James) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]
May 4, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ODES UTVS, LLC, Mike Smith from Walthall County Circuit Court, case number 2016-45T. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 24643004480) If the complete state court record is not attached as an Exhibit to the Petition for Removal, pursuant to Rule L.U.Civ.R. 5(b): within 14 days removing party must electronically file the entire state court record as a single filing; and all parties shall, within fourteen days after the Case Management Conference, file as separate docket items any unresolved motions that were filed in state court which they wish to advance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit 2-Complete Record for Walthall County Circuit Court, #4 Exhibit 3-Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (CS) [Transferred from Mississippi Southern on 8/1/2016.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC v. ODES UTVS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ODES UTVS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Smith
Represented By: Erica J. Van Loon
Represented By: Dan Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odes UTVS LLC
Represented By: Erica J. Van Loon
Represented By: Dan Liu
Represented By: Brittany Marie Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tylertown Farm Supply, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy S Johnson
Represented By: Erin Marie Mallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Daniel Ben-Zvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?