Michael R. Spengler v. LASD et al
Plaintiff: Michael R. Spengler and Michael Spengler
Defendant: LASD, Carreon, LASD Bureau of Labor Relations and Compliance, John Jane Does Jail Kitchens Dieticians, John Jane Does 272 Staff, 232 Nurse Carreon, Mrs. Morales, John Jane Does of 252 Staff, John Jane Does Tower 2, Sgt. Carter and Los Angeles County Jail
Case Number: 2:2016cv06880
Filed: September 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: David O Carter
Referring Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Michael R Spengler. as to entire case. Dismissal without prejudice. (dro)
October 30, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Michael R Spengler. Dismissal without prejudice prejudice. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iva)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. Within 30 days of the date of this order, or by November 6, 2017, plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint to attempt to cure thedeficiencies discussed (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Form, #2 Notice of Dismissal) (kca)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym, ORDERING Letter submitted by Plaintiff Michael R. Spengler received on 8/18/2017 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: No letters to Court. (ad)
August 4, 2017 Filing 23 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Denying #22 MOTION to Treat Case as Class Action (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym ORDERING Motion for Class Action submitted by Plaintiff Michael R. Spengler received on 07/10/17 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (iva)
July 10, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for Class Action filed by plaintiff Michael R. Spengler. (iva)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym ORDERING Memorandum and incorporated claims submitted by Plaintiff Michael R. Spengler received on 06/30/2017 to be filed and processed as Exhibits to First Amended Complaint; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (lwag)
June 30, 2017 Filing 19 EXHIBITS to First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Spengler. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(lwag)
June 6, 2017 Filing 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by plaintiff Michael R. Spengler. (ad)
June 6, 2017 Filing 16 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Order Denying Motion to Consolidate and Request forAppointment of Counsel Without Prejudice #14 (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge David O. Carter: (see document image for further details). IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that plaintiffs Motions for Injunctive Relief (docket nos. #12 , #13 ) are DENIED. (ad)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym ORDERING General Motion submitted by Plaintiff Michael R. Spengler received on 5/30/2017 to be filed and processed in case number CV17-3076; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (ad)
May 25, 2017 Filing 13 2nd EMERGENCY NOTICE TO HONORABLE SHERI PYM FOR TRO AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by petitioner Michael R. Spengler. (twdb) Modified on 6/7/2017 (ad).
May 22, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION to Consent to Magistrate Judge and Consolidate filed by plaintiff Michael R. Spengler. (ad)
May 22, 2017 Filing 12 2nd Injunction REQUEST for Temporary Restraining Order filed by petitioner Michael R. Spengler. (twdb)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: Addressing Consolidation Request (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Form, #2 Notice of Dismissal) (kca)
April 26, 2017 Filing 10 Letter from Michael Spengler filed. (ad)
February 8, 2017 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by petitioner Michael R. Spengler. (mrgo)
February 3, 2017 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendants Carreon, Carter(EBI Sgt. on 252, in individual capacity), John Jane Does 272 Staff, John Jane Does Jail Kitchens Dieticians, John Jane Does Tower 2, John Jane Does of 252 Staff(Sheriffs, in individual capacities), LASD, LASD Bureau of Labor Relations and Compliance(ADA Coordinator for LASD, in official capacity), LASD Bureau of Labor Relations and Compliance, Los Angeles County Jail, Morales(Deputy/Floor Staff on Floor 252, in individual capacity) amending Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights), #1 , filed by plaintiff Michael R. Spengler(mrgo)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. Within 30 days of the date of this order, or by February 22, 2017,plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint to attempt to cure thedeficiencies discussed (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights Form) (kca)
October 25, 2016 Filing 6 FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received 11.53 into the registry of the Court from Michael R. Spengler. Re: Order on Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV60P), #5 Receipt number RS008095. (lmu)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL CIVIL RIGHTS CASE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for pretrial proceedings.Plaintiff is advised that the court presently is screening the complaint in thisaction, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and 1915A. Until the complaint has been screened and the court has ordered that service of process may occur, plaintiff may not proceed with service of process upon defendants (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym: granting #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee.. It is further ORDERED that the prisoner-plaintiff owes the Court the initial filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $11.53 must be paid within 30 days of the date of this order. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with this order. (kca)
September 13, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa)
September 13, 2016 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Spengler. (esa)
September 13, 2016 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendants Carreon(Admissions Coordnator, in official capacity), Carreon(Admissions Coordinator, in individual capacity), Carter(Deputy, in individual capacity), Carter(Deputy, in official capacity), John Jane Does of 252 Staff(Deputies, in official capacities ), John Jane Does of 252 Staff(Deputies, in individual capacities), LASD, LASD Bureau of Labor Relations and Compliance, Los Angeles County Jail, Morales(Deputy, in individual capacity), Morales(Deputy, in official capacity) pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym, filed by Plaintiff Michael R. Spengler. (esa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/5/2016) (chs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael R. Spengler v. LASD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Spengler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Spengler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LASD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carreon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LASD Bureau of Labor Relations and Compliance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jane Does Jail Kitchens Dieticians
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jane Does 272 Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 232 Nurse Carreon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jane Does of 252 Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jane Does Tower 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?