Parham Javaheripur v. Fifth Third Bank et al
Plaintiff: Javaheripur and Parham Javaheripur
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank and Doe
Case Number: 2:2016cv07279
Filed: September 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon the parties' Stipulated Motion to Dismiss #27 , the action between Plaintiff Parham Javaheripur and Defendant Fifth Third Bank is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and expense. (gk)
July 17, 2017 Filing 27 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to settlement filed by defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Raffi)
July 7, 2017 Filing 26 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Parham Javaheripur. (Amador, R)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of Plaintiff's notice of settlement, filed 6/16/2017, indicating that the case has settled in its entirety #24 ,this action is placed in inactive status. By 7/17/2017 the parties shall file either (1) a proper stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment or (2) motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of 7/18/2017. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
June 16, 2017 Filing 24 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Parham Javaheripur. (Amador, R)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STAY #16 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of the foregoing, the Court exercises its discretion to stay the action pending the D.C. Circuits ruling in ACA International, except that Javaheripur may subpoena cell phone records from third party witnesses, subject to Fifth Thirds objections, if any. The parties shall file a joint status report, providing an update regarding proposed pretrial and trial dates and deadlines, within 15 days after the D.C. Circuit issues its ruling in ACA International. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See order for details.) (kti)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendants Motion to Stay Pending Ruling by the D.C. Circuit Court of Appeals #16 presently scheduled for hearing on February 3, 2017, [is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. Further, he Scheduling Conference, currently scheduled for hearing on February 3, 2017, is hereby VACATED and no appearances are necessary. The Court will issue a Scheduling and Case Management Order based upon a review of the parties Joint Rule 26(f) Report. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 20, 2017 Filing 21 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2, filed by Plaintiff Parham Javaheripur.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Amador, R)
January 20, 2017 Filing 20 REPLY in support to Stay Case #16 filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Kassabian, Raffi)
January 13, 2017 Filing 19 OPPOSITION to to Stay Case #16 filed by Plaintiff Parham Javaheripur. (Amador, R)
January 3, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Defendant Fifth Third Bank's Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay Pending Ruling by the D.C. Circuit Court of Appeals filed 12/28/2016 #16 . The following error(s) was found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests - Stay Case. The filer notices a hearing date of 2/3/2017 at 9:30 AM, however, used the event, Notice (Other) for docketing this filing. Only a motion-type event will allow the filer to set a hearing date. For this instance only, the clerk has converted the docketing event, and placed this matter on calendar. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (gk)
December 28, 2016 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank identifying Fifth Third Bancorp as Corporate Parent. (Kassabian, Raffi)
December 28, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion and Motion to Stay Pending Ruling by the D.C. Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - B, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Raffi) Modified on 1/3/2017 (gk).
December 27, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint #13 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (iv)
December 20, 2016 Filing 14 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26 (f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee is set for hearing 2/3/2017 at 9:30 AM. (iv)
December 19, 2016 Filing 13 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition #12 filed by defendant Fifth Third Bank.(Kassabian, Raffi)
December 5, 2016 Filing 12 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Parham Javaheripur(Amador, R)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (L.R. 8-3) #10 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Fifth Third Bank has until December 7, 2016 to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. (lom)
November 14, 2016 Filing 10 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to December 7, 2016 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kassabian, Raffi)
October 27, 2016 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fifth Third Bank answer now due 11/14/2016, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Fifth Third Bank.(Attorney Raffi Kassabian added to party Fifth Third Bank(pty:dft))(Kassabian, Raffi)
October 25, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Dolly M Gee. Effective October 31, 2016, Judge Gee will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 8C on the 8th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 8C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (iv)
October 4, 2016 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (et)
October 4, 2016 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 4, 2016 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et)
September 27, 2016 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Parham Javaheripur. (Amador, R)
September 27, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Parham Javaheripur. (Amador, R)
September 27, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-18629853 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Parham Javaheripur. (Attorney R Robert Amador added to party Parham Javaheripur(pty:pla))(Amador, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parham Javaheripur v. Fifth Third Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javaheripur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Parham Javaheripur
Represented By: Ramo Robert Amador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Abraham J Colman
Represented By: Raffi Kassabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?