Novelty Textiles, Inc. v. Salt and Pepper Clothing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Novelty Textiles, Inc.
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., DOES, Fastrend Apparel, Inc. and Salt & Pepper Clothing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv07831
Filed: October 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M. Gee
Presiding Judge: Alexander F. MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO DISMISS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Dolly M. Gee, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case 30 . THE FOLLOWING IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); 2. This dismissal is subject to and predicated upon the settlement agreement that gave rise to the stipulated dismissal; 3. The parties will each bear their respective costs and attorneys' fees as incurred against one another in connection with this action; and 4. All scheduled dates and deadlines are VACATED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (smo)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon re Stipulation for Protective Order 25 . (ib)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee.The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before December 15, 2016 why this action should not be dismissed as to defendant Fastrend Apparel, Inc. for lack of prosecution. No oral argument of this matter will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed as to defendant Fastrend Apparel, Inc. if the above-mentioned document(s) are not filed by the date indicated above. (iv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Novelty Textiles, Inc. v. Salt and Pepper Clothing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: L Katie Machado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fastrend Apparel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salt & Pepper Clothing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Novelty Textiles, Inc.
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?