Youth Justice Coalition et al v. City of Los Angeles et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Peter Arellano, Jose Reza and Youth Justice Coalition
Defendant: Charlie Beck, City of Los Angeles, DOES and Mike Feuer
Case Number: 2:2016cv07932
Filed: October 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Valerie Baker Fairbank
Presiding Judge: Rozella A. Oliver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2018 Filing 139 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/30/17 re Transcript 138 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Preston, Phyllis) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 11, 2018 Filing 138 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/30/17. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston, email: stenojag@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/2/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2018. (Preston, Phyllis)
April 18, 2018 Filing 137 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Defendant City of Los Angeles re 134 (Ursea, Agnes)
April 17, 2018 Filing 136 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 18-55485, as to Defendant City of Los Angeles for Court Reporter. Court will contact Irene Perez at irene.m.perez@lacity.org with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Ursea, Agnes)
April 16, 2018 Filing 135 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-55485 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 134 as to Defendant City of Los Angeles. (bm)
April 13, 2018 Filing 134 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, 132 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21583837.) (Attachments: # 1 Attachment: Order (Dkt. 132), # 2 Attachment: Representation Statement)(Ursea, Agnes)
April 11, 2018 Filing 133 NOTICE TO PARTIES: Effective April 17, 2018, Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver will be located at the Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, COURTROOM 590 on the 5th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 590 of the Roybal Federal Building, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building. The location for filing civil and criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services is located at the Roybal Federal Building, 255 East Temple Street, Room 180 (Terrace Level), Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXPAND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 115 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. On January 29, 2018, Plaintiffs Youth Justice Coalition, Peter Arellano (Arellano), and Jose Reza (Reza) for themselves and on behalf of a class of similarly-situated individuals (collectively Plaintiffs) filed a Motion to Expand the Preliminary Injunctions Entered on Behalf of Plaintiffs Arellano and Reza to the Entire Class (Motion). (Doc. No. 115 ). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). For the reasons stated above, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion to the extent that it seeks to extend the Arellano Preliminary Injunction to class members served with a Los Angeles Gang Injunction before January 19, 2018. IT IS SO ORDERED. (ab)
March 1, 2018 Filing 131 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant City of Los Angeles for Court Reporter. Court will contact Irene Perez at irene.m.perez@lacity.org with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Ursea, Agnes)
February 26, 2018 Filing 130 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXPAND THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIONS ENTERED ON BEHALF OF PETER ARELLANO AND JOSE REZA TO THE ENTIRE CLASS; [DOC NO. 115]held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Matter called. Counsel for the respective parties are present. Court issues a tentative ruling and hears oral argument of counsel. Having heard from counsel, Court takes the motion under submission. IT IS SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: Miranda Algorri. (yl)
February 15, 2018 Filing 129 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) 125 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
February 13, 2018 Filing 128 DECLARATION of Patricia Ursea (Corrected) In Opposition To NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Expand Preliminary Injunctions Entered on Behalf Plaintiffs Peter Arellano and Jose Reza to the Entire Class. Motion 115 CORRECTED filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1 to Corrected Ursea Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Ex 2 to Corrected Ursea Declaration)(Ursea, Agnes)
February 13, 2018 Filing 127 DECLARATION of Arturo Martinez (Corrected) In Opposition To NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Expand Preliminary Injunctions Entered on Behalf Plaintiffs Peter Arellano and Jose Reza to the Entire Class. Motion 115 CORRECTED filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1 to Corrected Martinez Decl, # 2 Exhibit Ex 2 to Corrected Martinez Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Ex 3 to Corrected Martinez Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Ex 4 to Corrected Martinez Declaration, # 5 Exhibit Ex 5 to Corrected Martinez Declaration, # 6 Exhibit Ex 6 to Corrected Martinez Declaration)(Ursea, Agnes)
February 12, 2018 Filing 126 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS 122 RE: Declarations 117 , 118 , 120 , 121 , by Clerk of Court. Documents are STRICKEN. DECLARATIONS ONLY SHALL BE RE-FILED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LOCAL RULES. (bm)
February 12, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE Withdrawal of Counsel (Maria Jhai) filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Mandhania, Ankur)
February 12, 2018 Filing 124 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Expand Preliminary Injunctions Entered on Behalf Plaintiffs Peter Arellano and Jose Reza to the Entire Class. Motion 115 Response to City's Objections to Evidence filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Ochoa, Melanie)
February 12, 2018 Filing 123 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Expand Preliminary Injunctions Entered on Behalf Plaintiffs Peter Arellano and Jose Reza to the Entire Class. Motion 115 filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Ochoa, Melanie)
February 6, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Declarations 117 , 118 , 120 , 121 . The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm)
February 5, 2018 Filing 121 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 2/12/18, DOCUMENT 126 . DECLARATION of Arturo Martinez (Amended) In Opposition To NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Expand Preliminary Injunctions Entered on Behalf Plaintiffs Peter Arellano and Jose Reza to the Entire Class. Motion 115 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit Amended, # 5 Exhibit Amended, # 6 Exhibit Amended)(Ursea, Agnes) Modified on 2/12/2018 (bm).
February 5, 2018 Filing 120 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 2/12/18, DOCUMENT 126 . DECLARATION of Patricia Ursea (Amended) In Opposition To NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Expand Preliminary Injunctions Entered on Behalf Plaintiffs Peter Arellano and Jose Reza to the Entire Class. Motion 115 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Ursea, Agnes) Modified on 2/12/2018 (bm).
February 5, 2018 Filing 119 Evidentiary Objection In Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Expand Preliminary Injunctions Entered on Behalf Plaintiffs Peter Arellano and Jose Reza to the Entire Class. Motion 115 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
February 5, 2018 Filing 118 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 2/12/18, DOCUMENT 126 . DECLARATION of Patricia Ursea NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Expand Preliminary Injunctions Entered on Behalf Plaintiffs Peter Arellano and Jose Reza to the Entire Class. Motion 115 In support of opposition filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Ursea, Agnes) Modified on 2/12/2018 (bm).
February 5, 2018 Filing 117 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 2/12/18, DOCUMENT 126 . DECLARATION of Arturo Martinez NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Expand Preliminary Injunctions Entered on Behalf Plaintiffs Peter Arellano and Jose Reza to the Entire Class. Motion 115 In support of opposition filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Ursea, Agnes) Modified on 2/12/2018 (bm).
February 5, 2018 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Expand Preliminary Injunctions Entered on Behalf Plaintiffs Peter Arellano and Jose Reza to the Entire Class. Motion 115 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
January 29, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Expand Preliminary Injunctions Entered on Behalf Plaintiffs Peter Arellano and Jose Reza to the Entire Class. Motion filed by Plaintiff Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. Motion set for hearing on 2/26/2018 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Melanie Ochoa, # 2 Proposed Order) (Ochoa, Melanie)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation re Class Certification and Amended Class Definition and Granting Unopposed Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. Nos. 107, 112.) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips granting 107 MOTION to Certify Class Action; granting 107 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel: For the reasons stated above, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion to the extent that it is modified by the Parties' Stipulation and GRANTS Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Appointment of Counsel. (see document for further details) (bm)
December 7, 2017 Filing 113 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Counsel of record are hereby notified, that the Motion to Certify Class and for Appointment of Class Counsel, is TAKEN OFF CALENDAR the hearing date is VACATED. No appearance by counsel will be necessary. Court to issue order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 6, 2017 Filing 112 STIPULATION to Certify Class filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Re Class Certification)(Ursea, Agnes)
October 30, 2017 Filing 111 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel 107 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
October 27, 2017 Filing 110 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel 107 . On the Court's own motion, the hearing for the above motions are herby CONTINUED from 11/27/17 to 12/11/17 at 2:00 PM before Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The briefing schedule shall remain as originally set. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver re Stipulation for Protective Order 108 NOTE CHANGES HAVE BEEN MADE TO THIS DOCUMENT (sbu)
October 19, 2017 Filing 108 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ochoa, Melanie)
October 2, 2017 Filing 107 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. Motion set for hearing on 11/27/2017 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Declaration, # 5 Declaration, # 6 Declaration, # 7 Proposed Order) (Smolowe, Laura)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Peter Arellano's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 12 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction to stop the City from enforcing the Echo Park Injunction against him. (ah)
August 30, 2017 Filing 105 MINUTES OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; [DOC NO. 12] Hearing held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Matter called. Counsel make their appearance. Court issues a tentative ruling, hears oral argument and takes the matter under submission. Court and counsel confer regarding the issue of bond. Court to issue ruling. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston. (bm)
August 28, 2017 Filing 104 SCHEDULING NOTICE: The Court has received and reviewed the parties stipulation 103 resetting hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 12 . Court ORDERS the hearing is ADVANCED from 8/31/17 to 8/30/2107 AT 2:00 PM before Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 25, 2017 Filing 103 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff Peter Arellano's Motion for Preliminary Injunction from August 31, 2017 to first available hearing date after August 31, 2017 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice, 102 filed by Plaintiff Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ochoa, Melanie)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 SCHEDULING NOTICE: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips Counsel of record are hereby notified, that the Pending Motion for Preliminary Injunction is set on 8/31/2017 AT 02:00 PM before Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 21, 2017 Filing 101 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Miscellaneous Document 99 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The document is accepted as e-filed. (ab)
August 18, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) (lt)
August 17, 2017 PHV FEE PAID for Non-Resident Attorney Adele M. El-Khouri Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt No. 0973-20370559 for $325 pro hac vice fee. (Smolowe, Laura)
August 17, 2017 Filing 99 Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition for Adele M. El-Khouri (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Smolowe, Laura)
August 9, 2017 Filing 98 MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Matter called. Counsel for the respective parties are present. The above matter is before the Court on a status conference having been reassigned to this Court. Court and counsel confer regarding the posture of the case and the pending motion for preliminary injunction, and discovery for the anticipated motion for class certification. Having heard from counsel, and as directed on the record, the Court issues the following briefing schedule. 1. Motion for Class Certification shall be filed no earlier than October 2, 2017. 2. Opposition shall be filed by no later than October 30, 2017. 3. Reply shall be filed by no later than November 13, 2017. 4. Hearing set for November 27, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. 5. Moving papers and opposition shall not exceed 35 pages in length. 6. Reply shall not exceed 25 pages in length. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos (bm)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: At the request 95 of plaintiffs, the Court hereby sets a Status Conference for 8/9/2017 at 9:00 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
July 31, 2017 Filing 96 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. Amendment to Request for ADR Procedure No. 1 - (ADR-1) 94 Corrected (Ochoa, Melanie)
July 31, 2017 Filing 95 REQUEST for Hearing Expedited Status Conference filed by Plaintiff Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Ochoa, Melanie)
July 31, 2017 Filing 94 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 1 filed. Parties request to Appear Before Magistrate Judge for settlement proceedings. Filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition.(Ochoa, Melanie)
July 31, 2017 Filing 93 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 15 days, filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition.. (Ochoa, Melanie)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank to Judge Virginia A. Phillips for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-07932 VAP(RAOx). (rn)
July 19, 2017 Filing 91 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document 89 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect event selected. The correct event is: Civil Events - select - Other Filings - select - Miscellaneous Filings - select - Brief (non motion non appeal). No letters to the Judge - Local Rule 83-2.5. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb)
July 17, 2017 Filing 90 BRIEF filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. Defendant's Letter Brief re Next Steps regarding Lifting Stay,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, 86 . (Ursea, Agnes)
July 17, 2017 Filing 89 Letter Brief regarding appropriate next steps re: Lifting Stay,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, 86 (Ochoa, Melanie)
July 7, 2017 Filing 88 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Melanie Rose Penny Ochoa counsel for Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. Adding Sean Garcia-Leys as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Youth Justice Coalition, et al. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Youth Justice Coalition, et al.. (Ochoa, Melanie)
July 6, 2017 Filing 87 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aditi Fruitwala counsel for Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. Adding Aditi Fruitwala as counsel of record for Plaintiffs Youth Justice Coalition, et al. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Youth Justice Coalition, et al.. (Attorney Aditi Fruitwala added to party Peter Arellano(pty:pla), Attorney Aditi Fruitwala added to party Jose Reza(pty:pla), Attorney Aditi Fruitwala added to party Youth Justice Coalition(pty:pla))(Fruitwala, Aditi)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER LIFTING STAY by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the stay is LIFTED. The Parties shall submit letters, not to exceed three single-spaced pages each, setting forth their respective positions regarding appropriate next steps on Monday, July 17, 2017. The Parties shall submit their Rule 26(f) Conference Statement on or before Monday, July 31, 2017, and the Court shall issue its Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order on or after Friday, August 18, 2017. In a separate order forthcoming shortly, the Court will rule on plaintiff Peter Arellanos application for a preliminary injunction and on the plaintiffs objections to the evidence that the City submitted in opposition thereto. (shb)
June 23, 2017 Filing 85 STATUS REPORT and Stipulation Rule 26(f) Conference Statement filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kreilkamp, Jacob)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Continuing Stay Until Friday, June 23, 2017 and Directing Parties to File Status Report or Notice of Settlement on Friday, June 23, 2017 83 by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. The proceedings are hereby stayed as follows: All remaining proceedings, including but not limited to, Parties' deadlines to submit their Rule 26(f) Conference Statement and class certification briefing, are stayed for an additional period of 31 days until Friday, June 23, 2017. The Parties SHALL FILE a status report by Friday, June 23, 2017 in which they either will (a) request a further brief stay so that they may continue, with the mediator's assistance, to attempt to reach a final settlement of the pending claims, or (b) inform the Court that the Parties have been unable to reach a settlement, and propose a new briefing schedule for the Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification. (lom)
May 23, 2017 Filing 83 STATUS REPORT and Stipulation to Continue Stay of Proceedings filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ochoa, Melanie)
May 22, 2017 Filing 82 STATUS REPORT Request For One-Day Extension to File Joint Status Report filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Jhai, Maria)
May 15, 2017 Filing 80 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Melanie Rose Penny Ochoa counsel for Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. Carmen Iguina is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Youth Justice Coalition, et al.. (Ochoa, Melanie)
May 15, 2017 Filing 79 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Melanie Rose Penny Ochoa counsel for Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. Amelia L.B. Sargent is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Youth Justice Coalition, et al.. (Ochoa, Melanie)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the proceedings are stayed as follows: All remaining proceedings, including but not limited to deadlines to submit Rule 26(f) Conference Statement and class certification briefing, are stayed for an additional ten days until May 22, 2017. The Parties SHALL FILE a status report by May 22, 2017 if they have not yet reached and informed the Court of a settlement before that date. (shb)
May 12, 2017 Filing 78 STATUS REPORT and Stipulation to Continue Stay of Proceedings filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ochoa, Melanie)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank, GRANTING Stipulation to Continue Stay of Proceedings 76 . IT IS ORDERED that the stay of proceedings will continue as follows: All remaining proceedings, including but not limited to the parties deadlines to submit their Rule 26(f) Conference Statement and class-certification briefing, are stayed for an additional period of 11 days until Friday, May 12, 2017. The Parties SHALL FILE a status report on Friday, May 12, 2017 if they have not yet reached and informed the Court of a settlement before that date. (shb)
April 21, 2017 Filing 76 STIPULATION to Continue Stay of Proceedings from May 1, 2017 to May 12, 2017 filed by Plaintiff Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ochoa, Melanie)
April 11, 2017 Filing 75 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Melanie Rose Penny Ochoa counsel for Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. Catherine Wagner is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Youth Justice Coalition, et al.. (Ochoa, Melanie)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the stay of proceedings will be continued as follows: All remaining proceedings, including but not limited to, Parties deadlines to submit their Rule 26(f) Conference Statement and class certification briefing, are stayed for an additional period of 45 days until May 1, 2017. The Parties SHALL FILE a status report by Monday, May 1, 2017 if they have not yet reached and informed the Court of a settlement before that date. (shb)
March 16, 2017 Filing 73 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STAY OF PROCEEDINGS filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ochoa, Melanie)
March 6, 2017 Filing 72 NOTICE of Change of address by Maria Jhai attorney for Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. Changing attorneys address to 350 S. Grand Avenue, 50th Floor, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Jhai, Maria)
February 17, 2017 Filing 71 REPLY support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ochoa, Melanie)
February 3, 2017 Filing 70 Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Evidence re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 (Response to Dckt 61) filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Chart Response to Objections)(Ursea, Agnes)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank GRANTING Stipulation to Stay Case 67 . (See order for further details). (shb)
January 27, 2017 Filing 68 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: 28 LAINTIFF, JOSE REZA'S PMOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Plaintiff Jose Rezas application for preliminary injunction [Doc #28] is GRANTED without opposition. The preliminary injunction proposed at Document #28-3 is hereby ISSUED. (shb)
January 27, 2017 Filing 67 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Settlement Discussions filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order TO STAY PROCEEDINGS)(Ochoa, Melanie)
January 24, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE of Decision: of Recent Authority filed by Plaintiff Peter Arellano. [Link to Docket No. 12] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ochoa, Melanie)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ORDER Re: Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Conference and Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) Conference and Related Orders by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the new deadlines are as follows: The deadline to conduct the Rule 26(f) Conference is continued to Tuesday, January 31, 2017. The deadline to submit the Rule 26(f) Conference Statement is continued to Friday, February 17, 2017. The Court shall hold a Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference or issue its Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order on or after Friday, March 3, 2017. (See order for details). (shb)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: No later than Friday, February 3, 2017, the defendant City SHALL RESPOND to the evidentiaryobjections that plaintiff Reza lodged on January 9, 2017. No later than Monday, February 20, 2017, plaintiffs MAY FILE a reply. (See order for details) (shb)
January 12, 2017 Filing 63 STIPULATION to Continue RE FED. R. CIV. PROC. 16(b) AND 26(f) CONFERENCES AND ORDER filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order RE FED. R. CIV. PROC. 16(b) AND 26(f) CONFERENCES AND ORDER)(Ochoa, Melanie)
January 10, 2017 Filing 62 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Reply (Motion related) 59 . The following error(s) was found: Case number is incorrect or missing.: Case number is missing the correct judge initials. The correct case number is: 2:16-cv-7932-VBF (RAOx). In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb)
January 9, 2017 Filing 61 OBJECTIONS to Declaration (Motion related), 42 , Motion Related Document 52 , Declaration (Motion related) 41 , Motion Related Document 49 , Motion Related Document, 45 , Motion Related Document 47 , Declaration (Motion related) 48 , Motion Related Document 50 , Motion Related Document 51 , Motion Related Document 46 , Motion Related Document 53 , Motion Related Document, 43 , Declaration (Motion related), 44 , Motion Related Document 54 Plaintiffs' Objections to Evidence Submitted By Defendants in Opposition to Plaintiff Arellano's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Ochoa, Melanie)
January 9, 2017 Filing 60 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Plaintiff Peter Arellano. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 107)(Ochoa, Melanie)
January 9, 2017 Filing 59 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Plaintiff Peter Arellano. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration James Diego Vigil)(Ochoa, Melanie)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank, re STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Plaintiffs' Reply briefs in support of the Motions for Preliminary Injunction, 57 . Plaintiffs MAY FILE a memorandum of points and authorities not to exceed twenty-five (25) pages in length in support of their Reply in Support of Plaintiff Peter Arellanos application for preliminary injunction. Plaintiffs shall not file any reply brief in support of Jose Rezas application for preliminary injunction. This is because the only remaining named defendant, the City of Los Angeles, has filed a notice stating that it does not oppose Rezas application for preliminary injunction (Document #39 filed December 16, 2016). By separate order to be issued shortly, the Court will enter the unopposed preliminary injunction sought by plaintiff Reza. (shb)
December 21, 2016 Filing 57 STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Plaintiffs' Reply briefs in support of the Motions for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Jhai, Maria)
December 19, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion Related Document 52 , Motion Related Document 49 , Motion Related Document, 45 , Motion Related Document 47 , Motion Related Document 50 , Motion Related Document 51 , Motion Related Document 46 , Motion Related Document 53 , Motion Related Document, 43 , Motion Related Document 54 . The following error(s) was found RE various exhibits to declarations of Martinez, McDougal and Ursea : Title page and its required LR 11-3,8 information is missing. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 16, 2016 Filing 55 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 In support of opposition filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 54 VOL. 6 EXHIBITS TO A. PATRICIA URSEA DECLARATION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 In support of opposition filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 53 VOL. 5 EXHIBITS TO A. PATRICIA URSEA DECLARATION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 In support of opposition filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 52 VOL. 4 EXHIBITS TO A. PATRICIA URSEA DECLARATION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 In support of opposition filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 51 VOL. 3 EXHIBITS TO A. PATRICIA URSEA DECLARATION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 In support of opposition filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 50 VOL. 2 EXHIBITS TO A. PATRICIA URSEA DECLARATION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 In support of opposition filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 49 VOL. I EXHIBITS TO A. PATRICIA URSEA DECLARATION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 In support of opposition filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 48 DECLARATION of A. Patricia Ursea In Opposition To NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 47 VOL. 3 EXHIBITS TO JAMES MCDOUGAL DECLARATION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 In support of opposition filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 46 VOL. 2 EXHIBITS TO JAMES MCDOUGAL DECLARATION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 45 VOL. I EXHIBITS TO JAMES MCDOUGAL DECLARATION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re for Plaintiff Jose Reza . Motion 28 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 44 DECLARATION of James McDougal In Opposition To (Arellano) and Non-Opposition to (Reza) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re for Plaintiff Jose Reza . Motion 28 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 43 EXHIBIT TO ARTURO MARTINEZ DECLARATION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re for Plaintiff Jose Reza . Motion 28 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 42 DECLARATION of Arturo Martinez In Opposition To (Arellano) and Non-Opposition to (Reza) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re for Plaintiff Jose Reza . Motion 28 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Officer Lamar In Opposition To NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 40 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re for Plaintiff Jose Reza . Motion 28 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles. (Ursea, Agnes)
December 16, 2016 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 2 filed by Defendant City of Los Angeles.(Ursea, Agnes)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party 35 . The complaint is dismissed without prejudice as to defendants Mike Feuer and Charlie Beck. Mike Feuer, City Attorney of the City of Los Angeles in his official capacity is TERMINATED as a party defendant. Charlie Beck, Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department in his official capacity is TERMINATEDas a party defendant. The only parties defendant remaining in the case are the City of Los Angeles and Does 1-10 in their official and individual capacities.,Charlie Beck (Chief of the Los Angeles Police Department, in his official capacity) and Mike Feuer (City Attorney of the City of Los Angeles, in his official capacity) terminated. (shb)
December 15, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation to Dismiss Party 35 . The following error(s) was found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (shb)
December 14, 2016 Filing 35 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss defendants Charlie Beck, Mike Feuer filed by plaintiffs Youth Justice Coalition, Jose Reza, Peter Arellano.(Bibring, Peter)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank, GRANTING Stipulation to Continue Deadlines Related to Plaintiff's Arellano and Reza's Motion for Class Certification 33 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Notwithstanding Local Rule 23-3, Plaintiffs deadline to file a motion for class certification is hereby extended to and includes January 30, 2017. Defendants response is due on or before March 1, 2017. Plaintiffs reply is due on or before March 14, 2017. (shb)
December 5, 2016 Filing 33 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Motion for Class Certification Deadline from January 25, 2017 to January 30, 2017 filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Iguina, Carmen)
November 16, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Carmen G Iguina counsel for Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. Changing email to ciguina@aclusocal.org. Filed by Plaintiffs Carmen Iguina. (Iguina, Carmen)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank, re Stipulation to Continue Deadlines 29 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the new deadlines are as follows: The deadline for all Defendants to respond to the Complaint, currently November 16, 2016 for Defendant Feuer and November 17, 2016 for Defendants City and Beck, will be continued to and including December 16, 2016. In the event that Defendants file a motion challenging the Complaint, Plaintiffs opposition will be due on January 16, 2017, and Defendants Reply will be due on January 30, 2017. The deadline for the Defendants to respond to the Arellano Preliminary Injunction Motion, currently November 21, 2016, and to the Reza Preliminary Injunction Motion, once filed, will be continued to and including December 16, 2016. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file any Replies, currently December 5, 2016, will be continued to and including January 9, 2017. The motion hearing previously noticed by plaintiff-movant Reza for December 12, 2016 is VACATED sine die, the Court finds Rea's application for preliminary injunction to be suitable for disposition without oral argument. (shb)
November 15, 2016 Filing 30 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge Valerie B. Fairbank. Effective November 22, 2016, Judge Fairbank will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 14, 2016 Filing 29 First STIPULATION to Continue Deadline to respond to Complaint and Preliminary Injunction Motions from Various dates in Nov. to December 16 for response to Complaint and both PI Motions Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re for Plaintiff Jose Reza . Motion 28 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 2 filed by Defendants Charlie Beck, City of Los Angeles, Mike Feuer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Continuing Certain Deadlines)(Ursea, Agnes)
November 14, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re for Plaintiff Jose Reza . Motion filed by plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. Motion set for hearing on 12/12/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Plaintiff Jose Reza, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Jose Reza in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Plaintiff Jose Reza, # 3 Supplement [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction for Plaintiff Jose Reza) (Iguina, Carmen)
November 7, 2016 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Agnes Patricia Ursea counsel for Defendants Charlie Beck, City of Los Angeles, Mike Feuer. Adding A. Patricia Ursea as counsel of record for City of Los Angeles, Mike Feuer, Charlie Beck for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Mike Feuer, Charlie Beck. (Attorney Agnes Patricia Ursea added to party Charlie Beck(pty:dft), Attorney Agnes Patricia Ursea added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Agnes Patricia Ursea added to party Mike Feuer(pty:dft))(Ursea, Agnes)
November 7, 2016 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition, served on 11/2/16 and 11/7/16. (Jhai, Maria)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano 12 . The hearing that plaintiff-movant Arellano noticed for December 5, 2016 is VACATED sine die. No later than Monday, November 21, 2016, defendants SHALL FILE a brief responding to plaintiff Arellanos motion for a preliminary injunction.No later than Monday, December 5, 2016, plaintiff Arellano MAY FILE a reply to such response. Until and unless otherwise ordered by the undersigned, the parties SHALL COMPLY with the Initial Standing Order issued by Judge Otero on October 27, 2016 with the following exception: contrary to paragraph 3a of that Order, a document that is e-filed before midnight will be considered filed on that date, not the next day. (See order for further details). (shb)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 14-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:09-cv-01090 VBF(RNBx). Case transferred from Judge S. James Otero to Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-07932 VBF(RAOx). Signed by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank (rn)
November 1, 2016 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 served on November 1, 2016. (Jhai, Maria)
November 1, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE TO PARTIES by District Judge S. James Otero. Effective November 7, 2016, Judge Otero will be located at the 1st Street Courthouse, COURTROOM 10C on the 10th floor, located at 350 W. 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 10C of the 1st Street Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be hand delivered to the judge's mail box outside the Clerk's Office on the 4th floor of the 1st Street Courthouse. The location for filing civil documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing and for viewing case files and other records services remains at the United States Courthouse, 312 North Spring Street, Room G-8, Los Angeles, California 90012. The location for filing criminal documents in paper format exempted from electronic filing remains at Edward R. Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, 255 East Temple Street, Room 178, Los Angeles, California 90012. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 31, 2016 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibits 1 - 50, # 3 Exhibits 51 - 106)(Iguina, Carmen)
October 31, 2016 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Catherine Wagner in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibits B - G)(Iguina, Carmen)
October 31, 2016 Filing 19 DECLARATION of James Diego Vigil in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - F)(Iguina, Carmen)
October 31, 2016 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Ana Muniz in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibits C - F)(Iguina, Carmen)
October 31, 2016 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Malcolm W. Klein in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Iguina, Carmen)
October 31, 2016 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Joshua Green in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Iguina, Carmen)
October 31, 2016 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Sean Garcia-Leys in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Iguina, Carmen)
October 31, 2016 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Peter Arellano in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Iguina, Carmen)
October 31, 2016 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion 12 filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Iguina, Carmen)
October 31, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re Plaintiff Peter Arellano . Motion filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. Motion set for hearing on 12/5/2016 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Iguina, Carmen)
October 27, 2016 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Youth Justice Coalition, Jose Reza, Peter Arellano, upon Defendant Charlie Beck served on 10/27/2016, answer due 11/17/2016; City of Los Angeles served on 10/27/2016, answer due 11/17/2016; Mike Feuer served on 10/26/2016, answer due 11/16/2016. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons returned. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service 2, # 2 Proof of Service 3)(Sargent, Amelia)
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (jy)
October 26, 2016 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 2 as to Defendants Charlie Beck, City of Los Angeles, Mike Feuer. (jtil)
October 26, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 26, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil)
October 25, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiffs Peter Arrellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. Related Case(s): CV09-1090 VBF (RNBx), CV11-01135 DMG (JEMx), CV14-00805 ODW (JEMx) (Iguina, Carmen)
October 25, 2016 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arrellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition (Iguina, Carmen)
October 25, 2016 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs Peter Arrellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition, (Iguina, Carmen)
October 25, 2016 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 2 filed by plaintiffs Peter Arrellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Iguina, Carmen)
October 25, 2016 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 10/25/2016, receipt number 097318776207), filed by plaintiffs Youth Justice Coalition, Jose Reza, Peter Arrellano. (Attorney Carmen G Iguina added to party Peter Arrellano(pty:pla), Attorney Carmen G Iguina added to party Jose Reza(pty:pla), Attorney Carmen G Iguina added to party Youth Justice Coalition(pty:pla))(Iguina, Carmen)
October 25, 2016 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Peter Arrellano, Jose Reza, Youth Justice Coalition. (Iguina, Carmen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Youth Justice Coalition et al v. City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Arellano
Represented By: Peter Bibring
Represented By: Joshua D Green
Represented By: Carmen G Iguina
Represented By: Maria Jhai
Represented By: Jacob S Kreilkamp
Represented By: Ankur Mandhania
Represented By: Melanie Rose Penny Ochoa
Represented By: Laura Danielle Smolowe
Represented By: Catherine A Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Reza
Represented By: Peter Bibring
Represented By: Joshua D Green
Represented By: Carmen G Iguina
Represented By: Maria Jhai
Represented By: Jacob S Kreilkamp
Represented By: Ankur Mandhania
Represented By: Melanie Rose Penny Ochoa
Represented By: Laura Danielle Smolowe
Represented By: Catherine A Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youth Justice Coalition
Represented By: Peter Bibring
Represented By: Joshua D Green
Represented By: Carmen G Iguina
Represented By: Maria Jhai
Represented By: Jacob S Kreilkamp
Represented By: Ankur Mandhania
Represented By: Melanie Rose Penny Ochoa
Represented By: Laura Danielle Smolowe
Represented By: Catherine A Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Beck
Represented By: Agnes Patricia Ursea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Agnes Patricia Ursea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Feuer
Represented By: Agnes Patricia Ursea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?