Andres Gomez v. Jack In The Box Inc et al
Plaintiff: Andres Gomez
Defendant: Does and Jack In The Box Inc
Case Number: 2:2016cv09405
Filed: December 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Beverly Reid O'Connell
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H. Segal
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell ORDER RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. Plaintiff filed a Complaint with this Court on December 20, 2016. On April 26, 2017, the Court issued an Order to Show Cause RE: Lack ofProsecution in light of the Plaintiffs apparent failure to seek default judgment. The Order specifically warned Plaintiff that the Court could dismiss this action if good cause was not shown for any extension of time. Plaintiff was to respond to the Courts Orde r to Show Cause no later than May 17, 2017. To date, however, no Motion for Default Judgment or response to the Courts Order has been filed with this Court. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action without prejudice for lack of prosecution and for failure to respond to the Court's Order to Show Cause. IT IS SO ORDERED (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (rfi)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 5/17/2017. (rfi)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 2/20/2017. (rfi)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andres Gomez v. Jack In The Box Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack In The Box Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Gomez
Represented By: Roland Au
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?