Eqyss Grooming Products, Inc. v. Groomy-USA, Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Eqyss Grooming Products, Inc.
Defendant: Does, Groomy-USA, Ltd., Purrfect Paws Grooming and Swesco Holding GmbH
Case Number: 2:2017cv00372
Filed: January 17, 2017
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Beverly Reid O'Connell
Referring Judge: Andrew J. Wistrich
Nature of Suit: Trademark

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, THAT judgment should be, and it hereby is, entered in favor of Plaintiff against Defendants Groomy and Purrfect Paws. FURTHER ORDERED , ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, THAT Defendant Groomy and Defendant Purrfect Paws together with all of their parents, subsidiaries, affiliates, agents, successors and assigns, and all those acting in concert or participation with them are hereby permanently enjoined FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, THAT Plaintiff is awarded attorneys fees in the amount of $7,600.00 against Defendants Groomy and Purrfect Paws. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
July 20, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/10/2017. (rfi)
May 4, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 5/25/2017. (rfi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eqyss Grooming Products, Inc. v. Groomy-USA, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groomy-USA, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purrfect Paws Grooming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swesco Holding GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eqyss Grooming Products, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine M Bond
Represented By: Jeffrey G Sheldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?