Ali Khoshbakhti Vayeghan v. John F. Kelly, et al. Featured Case
Defendant: John Kelly, John F. Kelly, Kevin K. Mcaleenan, Mitchell Merriam, Donald Trump, U.S. Customs and Border Protection and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Petitioner: Ali Khoshbakhti Vayeghan
Case Number: 2:2017cv00702
Filed: January 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: S. James Otero
Presiding Judge: Gail J. Standish
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TRANSFERRING CIVIL ACTION pursuant to General Order 05-07. ORDER case transferred from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for Discovery. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-00702 SJO (GJSx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE TRO BRIEFING AND HEARING 13 by Judge S. James Otero; 1. The briefing schedule set forth in the Temporary Restraining Order [Amended and Corrected], Dkt. No. 6 (TRO) at 3 (filed January 29, 2017), is stayed until further notice of this Court; 2. The hearing presently set in the TRO for February 10, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. is vacated; 3. In lieu of the TRO hearing, the Court will set an in-person status conference for February 10, 2017 at 9:30 a.m., to discuss the status of the compliance. In the event Mr. Vayeghan is admitted to the United States pursuant to the terms of the TRO, and the Plaintiffs determine they need no further action on the TRO, the Court directs them to file a notice withdrawing their motion before that date. (lc)
January 31, 2017 Filing 14 60 DAY Summons Issued, In re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 1 as to all Defendants. (mkr)
January 31, 2017 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Continue TRO Briefing and Hearing filed by petitioner Ali Khoshbakhti Vayeghan. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re TRO Briefing and Hearing)(Bibring, Peter)
January 30, 2017 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, 1 filed by petitioner Ali Khoshbakhti Vayeghan. (Bibring, Peter)
January 30, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Errata and Corrected Proof of Service filed by petitioner Ali Khoshbakhti Vayeghan. (Bibring, Peter)
January 30, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner All Plaintiffs, identifying ALI KHOSHBAKHTI VAYEGHAN JOHN F. KELLY, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security DONALD TRUMP, President of the United States U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, Acting Commissioner of CBP MITCHELL MERRIAM, Los Angeles Field Director, CBP. (Bibring, Peter)
January 30, 2017 Filing 9 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Ali Khoshbakhti Vayeghan. (Iguina, Carmen)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
January 30, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge S. James Otero and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (jtil)
January 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER [AMENDED and CORRECTED] by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Amended TRO Application is GRANTED. Respondents and their officers, agents, employees, attorneys, and all persons acting in concert or participating with them, are enjoined and restrained from barring Petitioners return to the United States. Respondents shall transport Petitioner back to the United States and admit him under the terms of his previously approved visa. Respondents shall communicate the terms of this Courts order immediately to officers in Dubai, and to authorities in the airport in Dubai holding Petitioner on Respondents orders. (see order for complete details.) (kd)
January 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: granting 2 EX PARTE APPLICATION for TRO (kr)
January 29, 2017 Filing 4 PETITION AMENDED APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER with filing fee previously paid (5.00 paid on 01/28/2017,, filed by plaintiffs Ali Khoshbakhti Vayeghan. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in support of Petitioner's Amended Temporary Restraining Order, # 2 Proposed Order to Show Cause) (Attorney Peter Bibring added to party Ali Khoshbakhti Vayeghan(pty:pet))(Bibring, Peter)
January 29, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance (Ward, Brian)
January 28, 2017 Filing 2 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Staying of Petitioner's Removal from the United Sates filed by Petitioner Ali Khoshbakhti Vayeghan. Ex Parte Application set for hearing on 1/28/2017 at 05:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (Attachments: # 1 Points & Authorities, # 2 Declaration Iguina Declaration, # 3 Proposed Order Order to Show Cause) (Iguina, Carmen)
January 28, 2017 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (28 USC 2241), Receipt No. 0973-19268510 for $5 filing fee, filed by Plaintiff Ali Khoshbakhti Vayeghan. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Carmen G Iguina added to party Ali Khoshbakhti Vayeghan(pty:pet))(Iguina, Carmen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali Khoshbakhti Vayeghan v. John F. Kelly, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kelly
Represented By: Brian Christopher Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Kelly
Represented By: Brian Christopher Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. Mcaleenan
Represented By: Brian Christopher Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Merriam
Represented By: Brian Christopher Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Represented By: Brian Christopher Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Brian Christopher Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Brian Christopher Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ali Khoshbakhti Vayeghan
Represented By: Ahilan T Arulanantham
Represented By: Peter Bibring
Represented By: Megan A Brewer
Represented By: Carmen G Iguina
Represented By: Jennifer L Pasquarella
Represented By: Stacy Eva Tolchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?