Leonard Robert Quiroz v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Leonard Robert Quiroz
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2017cv01024
Filed: February 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E. McDermott
Presiding Judge: Beverly Reid O'Connell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JUDGMENT by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank, in favor of Nancy A. Berryhill against Leonard Robert Quiroz Related to: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations, 33 . IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is AFFIRMED and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (sbou)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH COURT'S ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before March 23, 2018, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. (See document for further details.) (sbou)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 4/14/2017. [See Order for further details.] (san)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard Robert Quiroz v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Robert Quiroz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?