Unicolors, Inc. v. Gill Leather Fashions, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Defendant: Does, Gill Leather Fashions, Inc., Ivanka Trump Marks II LLC and The TJX Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01287
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E. McDermott
Presiding Judge: Fernando M. Olguin
Nature of Suit: Copyright

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin that the above-captioned action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 30 days from the filing date of this Order, to re-open the action if settlement is not consummated. The court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott 38 . (san)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 3/17/2017. (vdr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unicolors, Inc. v. Gill Leather Fashions, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gill Leather Fashions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivanka Trump Marks II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The TJX Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Represented By: Amy J Choe
Represented By: Chan Yong Jeong
Represented By: Ryan Nicholas Ostrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?