Securities and Exchange Commission v. Notis Global, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Bruce Bedrick, Yocelin Legaspi, Vincent Mehdizadeh, New-Age Investment Consulting, Inc. and Notis Global, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01905
Filed: March 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Presiding Judge: Stephen V. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT BRUCE BEDRICK by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Bruce Bedrick Related to: Judgment 48 . (See document for details) (mrgo)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT BRUCE BEDRICK by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Bruce Bedrick Related to: Stipulation for Judgment 47 . (See document for details) (mrgo)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT NOTIS GLOBAL, INC. F/K/A MEDBOX, INC. by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Notis Global, Inc. Related to: Stipulation for Judgment 7 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AN D DECREED that Defendant is permanently restrained and enjoined from violating, directly or indirectly, Section 10(b) of the Securities Exchange Act (the "Exchange Act") [15 U.S.C. § 78j(b)] and Rule 10b-5 promulgated thereunder [17 C .F.R. Section 240.10b-5], by using any means or instrumentality of interstate commerce, or of the mails, or of any facility of any national securities exchange, in connection with the purchase or sale of any security: (see document for further details). (mrgo)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT VINCENT MEHDIZADEH by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Vincent Mehdizadeh in the principal amount of $6,014,048, interest in the amount of $270,299.35, attorneys fees of $0.00, costs of $0.00 for a total judgment of $12,298,395.35. Related to: Stipulation for Judgment 8 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant is permanently restrained and enjoined from violating, direct ly or indirectly, Section 10(b) of the Securities Exchange Act (the "Exchange Act") [15 U.S.C. § 78j(b)] and Rule 10b-5 promulgated thereunder [17 C.F.R. Section 240.10b-5], by using any means or instrumentality of interstate commerce, or of the mails, or of any facility of any national securities exchange, in connection with the purchase or sale of any security: (see document for further details). (mrgo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Notis Global, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Bedrick
Represented By: Jeaneen M Kappell
Represented By: Stephen J Korotash
Represented By: John Warren Rissier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yocelin Legaspi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Mehdizadeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New-Age Investment Consulting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Notis Global, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Megan Molloy Bergstrom
Represented By: Gary Y Leung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?