Tyto Hernandez v. USAA Savings Bank
Plaintiff: Tyto Hernandez
Defendant: USAA Savings Bank
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Peter Rosen
Case Number: 2:2017cv02170
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. § 0227
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Case Terminated; Made JS-6) (vdr)
August 7, 2018 Filing 35 MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Peter Rosen: and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link: #MediationParticipantSurvey(Rosen, Peter)
August 7, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez. (Rosenthal, Matthew)
July 5, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Peter Rosen has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting #28 #31 Non-Resident Attorney David M. Krueger APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant USAA Savings Bank, designating Maureen M. Michail as local counsel. (lt)
June 20, 2018 Filing 31 Supplemental APPLICATION to Supplement Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David M. Krueger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant USAA Savings Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 5/17/2017, Receipt No. 262GS9BF) #28 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #29 , Text Only Scheduling Notice, 30 filed by defendant USAA Savings Bank. (Michail, Maureen)
June 14, 2018 Filing 30 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. In response to the Deficiency #29 as to the Application Pro Hac Vice #28 , the attorney has until 6/20/2018 to file a supplement to their pending application. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 13, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David M. Krueger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant USAA Savings Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 5/17/2017, Receipt No. 262GS9BF) #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
June 12, 2018 Filing 28 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David M. Krueger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant USAA Savings Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325.00 Previously Paid on 5/17/2017, Receipt No. 262GS9BF) filed by defendant USAA Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Michail, Maureen)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick re REQUEST for Protective Order for Discovery of Confidential Information #26 . (sp)
June 1, 2018 Filing 26 REQUEST for Protective Order for Discovery of Confidential Information filed by defendant USAA Savings Bank. (Michail, Maureen)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial set for 12/18/2018 at 8:45 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates, deadlines and requirements imposed.* (vdr)
April 5, 2018 Filing 23 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3, filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez.. (Rosenthal, Matthew)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Case reopened; MD JS-5.) (vdr)
March 21, 2018 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT and Stipulation to Reopen Case filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez. (Rosenthal, Matthew)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Stay Proceedings #17 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendant shall confer with Plaintiff and file a status report advising the Court of the outcome of the decision from the United States Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit in ACA Intl within 14 days from the date of the decision. The status report shall include the parties' position as to how this Court should proceed. All dates on the Court's calendar are hereby vacated and will be reset as necessary. The Clerk shall administratively close the case until further order of the court. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
May 19, 2017 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. No later than 5/25/2017, defendant shall file a supplemental pro hac vice application with an updated certificate of good standing. Please see the court's Notice of Deficiency #18 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 18, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David M. Krueger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant USAA Savings Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19867488) #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
May 18, 2017 Filing 17 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending a decision from the United States Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit in ACA Int'l v. FCC, No. 15-1211 (D.C. Cir.) filed by Defendant USAA Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Michail, Maureen)
May 17, 2017 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David M. Krueger to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant USAA Savings Bank (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19867488) filed by Defendant USAA Savings Bank. (Attachments: #1 Declara tion Declaration of David M. Krueger in Support of Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice Case No. 2:17-CV-02170-FMO(Ex), #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Michail, Maureen)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION #14 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Scheduling Conference is continued for hearing to 6/8/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
April 18, 2017 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Continue scheduling conference from May 25, 2017 to June 8, 2017 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #13 filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenthal, Matthew)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
April 17, 2017 Filing 12 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant USAA Savings Bank, identifying Plaintiff. (Michail, Maureen)
April 17, 2017 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant USAA Savings Bank.(Attorney Maureen M Michail added to party USAA Savings Bank(pty:dft))(Michail, Maureen)
March 30, 2017 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. All pleadings filed in this matter should contain the case number and the assigned judges' initials to ensure proper routing of documents. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-02170 FMO(Ex). (rn)
March 21, 2017 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez, upon Defendant USAA Savings Bank served on 3/21/2017, answer due 4/11/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cailen Johnson, person authorized to accept service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Rosenthal, Matthew)
March 21, 2017 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant USAA Savings Bank. (et)
March 21, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 21, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (et)
March 20, 2017 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez. (Rosenthal, Matthew)
March 20, 2017 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez. (Rosenthal, Matthew)
March 20, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez, (Rosenthal, Matthew)
March 20, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19544563 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Tyto Hernandez. (Attorney Matthew A Rosenthal added to party Tyto Hernandez(pty:pla))(Rosenthal, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyto Hernandez v. USAA Savings Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyto Hernandez
Represented By: Matthew A Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Savings Bank
Represented By: David M Krueger
Represented By: Maureen M Michail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Peter Rosen
Represented By: Peter K Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?