David Lillie v. Mantech Int l Corp., et al
Plaintiff: David Lillie
Defendant: Does and Mantech Int l Corp.
Case Number: 2:2017cv02538
Filed: April 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H. Segal
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: RE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR A NEW TRIAL 188 , PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR TWO TIMES BACK PAY AND INTEREST UNDER 31 U.S.C. 3730(H) 186 AND PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES 187 . The defendants renewed motion for judgment as a matter of law is GRANTED as to plaintiffs claims under the FCA, the DCWPA, and § 1102.5. In the event that the Court of Appeals were to find that judgment as a matter of law is not appropriate in this case, the Court conditionally grants a new trial Plaintiffs motion for two times back pay is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs motion for attorneys fees is DENIED. (lc). Modified on 7/26/2019. (lc).
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 JUDGMENT ON SPECIAL VERDICT 179 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: On February 28, 2019, the jury returned into Court with its special verdict, finding for Plaintiff on all causes of action.Plaintiff was awarded: past lost earnings in the amount of  6;521,983.00; future lost earnings in the amount of $339,828.00; past emotional distress damages in the amount of $321,875.00; and future emotional distress damages in the amount of $321,875.00. Plaintiff was awarded a total of $1 ,505,561.00. It is therefore, ORDERED that judgment be and is hereby awarded in favor of Plaintiff in the sum of $1,505,561.00 with interest thereon, from February 28, 2019, until paid, at a rate equal to the weekly average 1-year constant maturity Treasury yield for the week preceding the date that the Court enters its final judgment. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (lc). Modified on 4/9/2019. (lc).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: JPLS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO QUASH TRIAL SUBPOENAS AND FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER 129 . JPLs ex parte application to quash plaintiffs trial subpoenas is DENIED. JPLs request for a protective order is also DENIED. (lc) .Modified on 2/15/2019 (lc).
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE No. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS ECONOMIC DAMAGES 75 IS DENIED. (lc). Modified on 12/26/2018 .(lc).
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTES OF Pretrial Conference and Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder: RE:DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE No. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS ECONOMIC DAMAGES 75 , filed September 24, 2018)DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE No . 2 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFFS EXPERT LESLIE MICHELLE DAUGHERTY 76 , filed September 24, 2018) DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE No. 3 TO EXCLUDE LAY WITNESS TESTIMONY REGARDING PLAINTIFFS DIAGNOSIS AND THE CAUSE OF HIS ALLEGED EMOTIONAL DISTRES S 77 , filed September 24, 2018) DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE No. 4 TO PRECLUDE PLAINTIFF FROM OFFERING ANY EVIDENCE REGARDING THE JET PROPULSION LABORATORYS ALLEGED NONCOMPLIANCEIN RESPONSE TO SUBPOENAS 78 filed September 24, 2018) DEFENDANTS MOTI ON IN LIMINE No. 5 TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY FROM PLAINTIFFS EXPERT RICHARD FETTIG 79 , filed September 24, 2018).Defendants motion in limine 2 is DENIED. Tothe extent that defendant seeks to exclude lay testimony as to medical opinions about causation or diagnosis, defendants motion in limine 3 is GRANTED. Otherwise, it is denied. Motion in limine 4 is GRANTED. Defendants motion in limine 5 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court requests supplemental briefing on defendants motion in limine 1. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (lc)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTES OF DEFENDANT MANTECH INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 19 Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder. In accordance with the foregoing the Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part defendant's motion to dismiss. Specifically, the Court DENIES defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiffs' first, second, and third claims. The Court GRANTS defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's fourth, fifth, and sixth claims and DISMISSES those claims WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If plaintiff believes that he may cure the deficiencies in his claims for breach of contract, breach of implied-in-fact contract, and breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fa ir dealing, he is hereby granted thirty days (30) in which to file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies in those claims. Failure to file an amended complaint may result in dismissal of these claims with prejudice. Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (lom) Modified on 8/15/2017 (lom).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Lillie v. Mantech Int l Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mantech Int l Corp.
Represented By: Eric A Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Lillie
Represented By: Esperanza Cervantes Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?