MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC et al v. The Farmers Insurance Exchange et al
Plaintiff: MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery, LLC and MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Defendant: The Farmers Group, Inc and The Farmers Insurance Exchange
Case Number: 2:2017cv02559
Filed: April 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L. Abrams
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER ON STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR PRODUCTION OF PROTECTED HEALTHINFORMATION by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. 219 (ch)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: RE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES RULING ENTERED JUNE 12, 2019 in Case No. 2:17-cv-2522 [docket 209] filed June 26, 2019;PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES RULIN G ENTERED JUNE 12, 2019 in Case No. 2:17-cv-2559 192 , filed June 26, 2019). The Court finds this motion appropriate for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing date of August 5, 2019 is vacated and the matter is hereby taken under submission. Plaintiffs' consolidated motion for review of Magistrate Judge Paul Abrams's order dated June 12, 2019 is DENIED. (lc). Modified on 8/1/2019 (lc).
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: RE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT in No. 17-2522 (Dkt 82, filed January 22, 2018). DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO STRIKE OR, IN T HE ALTERNATIVE, DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT in No. 17-2559 81 and 82 , filed January 22, 2018). The SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINTS are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file amended complaints. Failure to do so may result in dismissal with prejudice. (lc). Modified on 5/7/2018 .(lc).
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Christina A. Snyder RE: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint in Case No. 2:17-cv-02522-CAS-PLA, Dkt. 54; Defendants' Motion for Order to Temporarily Stay Discovery and, if Necess ary, to then Phase Discovery in Case No. 2:17-cv-02522-CAS-PLA, Dkt. 55; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint in Case No. 2:17-cv-02559-CAS-PLA, Dkt. 53 ; and Defendants' Motion for Order to Temporarily Stay Discovery and, if Necessary, to then Phase Discovery in Case No. 2:17-cv-02559-CAS-PLA, Dkt. 54 . The Court GRANTS defendants' Rule 12(b)(l) motions to dismiss the No-Fault FAC (Case No. 17-2522, dkt. 38) and the Settlement FAC (Case No. 17-2559, dkt. 36). T he FACs are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff shall have 21 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint addressing the deficiencies identified herein. Failure to do so may result in dismissal with prejudice. Because the FACs have been dismissed without prejudice, the Court DENIES as moot defendants' motions to stay discovery (Case No. 17-2559, dkt. 54; Case No. 17-2522, dkt. 55). Court Reporter: Laura Elias. (gk)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams re Stipulation for Protective Order 30 NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT (ch)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC et al v. The Farmers Insurance Exchange et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC
Represented By: Michael Lin Baum
Represented By: Christopher L Coffin
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery, LLC
Represented By: Michael Lin Baum
Represented By: Christopher L Coffin
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: Michael Lin Baum
Represented By: Christopher L Coffin
Represented By: Pedram Esfandiary
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Farmers Group, Inc
Represented By: Joshua Robert Mandell
Represented By: Michael Richard Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Farmers Insurance Exchange
Represented By: Joshua Robert Mandell
Represented By: Michael Richard Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?