Cerelux Ltd. v. Yue Shao et al
Plaintiff: Cerelux Ltd.
Defendant: Does, James Evans, Namecheap, Inc., David Pearce, Yue Shao and Pablo Stafforini
Case Number: 2:2017cv02909
Filed: April 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W. Fitzgerald
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. For the reasons stated herein, a Response to Order to Show Cause as to defendant Yue Shao is due by 1/22/2018. (cw)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that a preliminary injunction shall issue. (SEE ATTACHMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 65(c) of the Federal R ules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff shall be required to give security in the amount of one thousand dollars ($1,000). FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall personally serve a copy of this Order, the complaint, and all papers filed in support of this Order on Defendants Namecheap, Inc., and Yue Shao on or before 5/8/2017. (jp)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (SEE ATTACHMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (jp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cerelux Ltd. v. Yue Shao et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cerelux Ltd.
Represented By: Ji-In Lee Houck
Represented By: Brett E Lewis
Represented By: Justin H R Mercer
Represented By: Dylan Ruga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Evans
Represented By: Steven Thomas Gebelin
Represented By: Scott Michael Lesowitz
Represented By: Erik Syverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Namecheap, Inc.
Represented By: Sridavi Ganesan
Represented By: Eugene Rome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pearce
Represented By: Steven Thomas Gebelin
Represented By: Scott Michael Lesowitz
Represented By: Erik Syverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yue Shao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pablo Stafforini
Represented By: Steven Thomas Gebelin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?