Richard Graff v. CitiMortgage, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Richard Graff
Defendant: Cal-Western Recovenyance Corp, CitiMortgage, Inc, Does and NBS Default Services
Case Number: 2:2017cv03439
Filed: May 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M. Olguin
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Walsh
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ADJUDGED that the above-captioned case is dismissed with prejudice. The parties shall bear their own fees and costs. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 3/2/2018. (vdr)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff is granted until 11/2/2017, to effect service of process on all unserveddefendants. Plaintiff shall file valid proofs of service by no later than 11/7/2017. (vdr)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin.Plaintiff is granted until 10/2/2017 to file a First Amended Complaint. (vdr)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/4/2017. (vdr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Graff v. CitiMortgage, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Recovenyance Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBS Default Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?