Nehemiah Kong v. Zohrab S. Daghlian et al
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Defendant: DOES, Raffi Daghlian, Sarkis Daghlian and Pacvine Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv04191
Filed: June 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S. Fischer
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H. Segal
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JUDGMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court having granted Plaintiff's motion for default judgment. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment be entered against Defendants and in favor of Plaintiff for $4,000 in statutory damages. Defendant s are further ORDERED to provide accessible parking spaced at the property located at or about 100 N. Pacific Avenue, Glendale, California in compliance with the Americans with Disabilities Act Accessibility Guidelines. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (bp)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 10/23/2017. (dp)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTES(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 9/11/2017. (dp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nehemiah Kong v. Zohrab S. Daghlian et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raffi Daghlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarkis Daghlian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacvine Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Center for Disability Access
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?