Mary Salazar v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mary Salazar
Defendant: Citibank N.A. and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv04370
Filed: June 13, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M. Olguin
Presiding Judge: Karen L. Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice to Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC 45 , the above-captioned case is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson re Amended Stipulation for Protective Order 33 . (see order for details) (hr)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 9/13/2017. (vdr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mary Salazar v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Salazar
Represented By: Stephanie R Tatar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?