BMW of North America, LLC et al v. Arion Euthenia, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BMW of North America, LLC and Bayerische Motoren Werke AG
Defendant: Arion Euthenia, LLC, Does, Katie Lau, Marsons Electronics Corp. and Pak Tao Ng
Case Number: 2:2017cv04969
Filed: July 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E. McDermott
Presiding Judge: Fernando M. Olguin
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ADJUDGED that: (1) Judgment is hereby entered in favor of plaintiffs BMW of North America, LLC and Bayerische Motoren Werke AG and against defendant Marsons Electronics Corp., on plaintiffs claim for tradem ark infringement. (2) Plaintiffs shall recover against defendant Marsons Electronics Corp. in the amount of $207,600, consisting of $200,000 in statutory damages, and $7,600 in attorney fees. (3) Plaintiffs remaining claims are dismiss ed without prejudice. (4) Defendant Marsons Electronics Corp. is permanently enjoined and restrained from directly or indirectly, or authorizing or assisting any third party to engage in. Plaintiffs shall serve defendant Marsons Electronics Corp. with a copy of this Judgment in such a manner as to make it operative in any future proceedings. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (jp)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PERMANENT INJUNCTION against Defendants Arion Euthenia, LLC., and Pak Tao NG aka Thomas NG and DISMISSAL, With Prejudice by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. ORDERS, ADJUDICATES and DECREES that a permanent injunction shall be and hereby is entered against D efendants. Defendants are hereby restrained and enjoined. No appeals shall be taken from this Permanent Injunction, and the parties waive all rights to appeal. Each party shall bear their own attorneys fees and costs incurred in this matter. Upon entry of this Permanent Injunction against Defendants, the case shall be dismissed as to Defendants, with prejudice. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL RE: LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/15/2017. (vdr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMW of North America, LLC et al v. Arion Euthenia, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arion Euthenia, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsons Electronics Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pak Tao Ng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Marcus F Chaney
Represented By: Nicole Drey Huerter
Represented By: Christopher Dain Johnson
Represented By: Christopher Q Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayerische Motoren Werke AG
Represented By: Marcus F Chaney
Represented By: Nicole Drey Huerter
Represented By: Christopher Dain Johnson
Represented By: Christopher Q Pham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?