Hugo Esqueda v. El Jalisco Restaurant et al

Plaintiff: Hugo Esqueda
Defendant: Does and El Jalisco Restaurant
Case Number: 2:2017cv05664
Filed: July 31, 2017
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Suzanne H. Segal
Presiding Judge: George H. Wu
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE by Judge George H. Wu, re Order to Show Cause 14 : Plaintiff was given until January 2, 2018 to respond and no response or objection has been filed. Plaintiff is hereby notified that this action is dismissed without prejudice. (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (cr)
December 18, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge George H. Wu: The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below.Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than January 2, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. (cr)
November 14, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge George H. Wu: The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, o n its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than November 28, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. (cr)
October 30, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge George H. Wu: The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, o n its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than November 13, 2017 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. (cr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hugo Esqueda v. El Jalisco Restaurant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Jalisco Restaurant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hugo Esqueda
Represented By: Kevin Hyunjong Hong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?