Natalio Trevizo v. S. Webster et al

Plaintiff: Natalio Trevizo
Defendant: R. Blair, Does and S. Webster
Case Number: 2:2017cv05868
Filed: August 8, 2017
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Michael W. Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Karen L. Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before November 12, 2018, why the Court should not recommend that this action be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (see order for details) (hr)
June 25, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. At this point, almost four weeks have passed since Plaintiff's deadline for filing a Proof of Service for each defendant, and he has failed to do so correctly. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before July 25, 2018, why the Court should not recommend that this action be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (see order for details) (hr)
October 12, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES AND CLOSING CASE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald that Plaintiff has failed to submit a timely response. Accordingly, the Request to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees is DENIED and the case is closed. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natalio Trevizo v. S. Webster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalio Trevizo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?