Federal Trade Commission v. M and T Financial Group et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Salar Tahour, American Counseling Center Corp., M and T Financial Group, American Counseling Center Corp. a corporation, also d/b/a StuDebt, Student Debt Relief Group, SDRG, Student Loan Relief Counselors, SLRC, and Capital Advocates Group doing business as Studebt Inc. also known as Student Debt Relief Group doing busine, Student Debt Relief Group and M and T Financial Group a corporation, also d/b/a StuDebt, Student Debt Relief Group, SDRG, Student Loan Relief Counselors, SLRC, and Capital Advocates Group doing business as Studebt Inc. doing business as Student Debt Relief Group doing business as
Receiver: Robb Evans
Case Number: 2:2017cv06855
Filed: September 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0045
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER APPROVING FINAL REPORT AND ACCOUNTING; FINAL REQUEST FOR APPROVALAND PAYMENT OF RECEIVERS AND PROFESSIONALS FEES AND COSTS; AND FOR DISCHARGEAND EXONERATION OF BOND AND RELATED RELIEF #89 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court hereby APPROVES and AUTHORIZES payment of the fees of the Receiver, the Receivers members, staff and professionals, and reimbursement of cost (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILED BREAKDOWN OF SPECIFIED APPLICABLE FEES HEREIN): 1) Total of $115,378.77 for Receiver's Fees for the period from November 1, 2017 through December 31, 2019. 2)$51,661.72 Total for Receivers counsel, Barnes & Thornburg LLPs fees and costs from November 1, 2017 through December 31, 2019 and for the period from January 1, 2020 through closing of the estate; 3) Total 5,757.57 for Receivers prior counsel Diamond McCarthy LLPs fees and costs from November 1, 2017 through December 31, 2017. 4) The bond posted #27 by the Receiver in this case shall be exonerated effective upon completion of the administration of the receivership estate and distribution of the remaining funds in the Receivers possession and custody to the FTC. (lc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 94 The hearing on the MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING FINAL #89 , scheduled for March 30, 2020 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 4, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving Final Report and Accounting; Final Request for Approval and Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from November 1, 2017 through Closing; and for Discharge and Exoneration #89 filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Wei, Joannie)
February 24, 2020 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving Final Report and Accounting; Final Request for Approval and Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from November 1, 2017 through Closing; and for Discharge and Exoneration #89 served on February 24, 2020. (Caris, Gary)
February 24, 2020 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans, re Notice of Motion, #90 served on February 24, 2020. (Caris, Gary)
February 24, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving Final Report and Accounting; Final Request for Approval and Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from November 1, 2017 through Closing; and for Discharge and Exoneration #89 filed by Receiver Robb Evans. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Caris, Gary)
February 24, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Approving Final Report and Accounting; Final Request for Approval and Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from November 1, 2017 through Closing; and for Discharge and Exoneration of Bond and Related Relief; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris in Support Thereof filed by Receiver Robb Evans. Motion set for hearing on 3/30/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Caris Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 to Caris Declaration, #3 Declaration of Brick Kane, #4 Exhibit 1 to Kane Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Kane Declaration, #6 Proposed Order) (Caris, Gary)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR THIRD ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES UNDER SECTIONX.A OF THE STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND MONETARY JUDGMENT AND SECOND EXTENSION ORDER #86 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: 1. The deadline for the Receiver to sell the real property commonly known as 791 N. Bundy Drive, Los Angeles, California is extended from December 31, 2019 under the Second Extension Order to February 29, 2020; 2. The deadline for the Receiver to file its final fee motion is extended from December 31, 2019 under the Second Extension Order to February 29, 2020; and 3. The deadline for the Receiver to file its final report is extended from December 31, 2019 under the Second Extension Order to February 29, 2020. (lc)
December 16, 2019 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Third Order Extending Deadlines Under Section X.A of the Stipulated Order for Permenant Injunction and Monetary Judgment and Second Extenion Order #86 served on December 16, 2019. (Caris, Gary)
December 16, 2019 Filing 86 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Third Order Extending Deadlines Under Section X.A of the Stipulated Order for Permenant Injunction and Monetary Judgment and Second Extenion Order filed by Receiver Robb Evans. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brick Kane in Support of Ex Parte Application for Third Order Extending Deadlines Under Section X.A of the Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment and Second Extension Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Caris, Gary)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR SECOND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES UNDER SECTIONX.A OF THE STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND MONETARY JUDGMENT AND FIRST EXTENSION ORDER #83 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: 1. The deadline for the Receiver to sell the real property commonly 17 known as 791 N. Bundy Drive, Los Angeles, California is extended from February 18 7, 2019 under the First Extension Order to December 31, 2019; 2. The deadline for the Receiver to file its final fee motion is extended 20 from February 7, 2019 under the First Extension Order to December 31, 2019; and 3. The deadline for the Receiver to file its final report is extended from 2 February 7, 2019 under the First Extension Order to December 31, 2019. (lc)
February 4, 2019 Filing 84 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Receiver Robb Evans, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Second Order Extending Deadlines Under Section X.A of the Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment and First Extension Order #83 served on February 4, 2019. (Caris, Gary)
February 4, 2019 Filing 83 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Second Order Extending Deadlines Under Section X.A of the Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment and First Extension Order filed by Receiver Robb Evans. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brick Kane in Support of Ex Parte Application for Second Order Extending Deadlines Under Section X.A of the Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment and First Extension Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Caris, Gary)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS DEFENDANTS COUNSEL OF RECORD WITHOUT PREJUDICE #79 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II . (lc). Modified on 9/26/2018 (lc).
September 5, 2018 Filing 81 The hearing on the MOTION TO WITHDRAW #79 , scheduled for September 10, 2018 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES UNDER SECTION X.A OF THE STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND MONETARY JUDGMENT #76 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. ORDERED that the Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment (Order) shall be and is hereby modified as follows: 1. The deadline for the Receiver to complete the liquidation of the assets of the Receivership Defendants set forth at Section X.A.1. of the Order is extended to February 7, 2019; 2. The deadline for the Receiver to sell the real property commonly known as 791 N. Bundy Drive, Los Angeles, California set forth at Section X.A.2 of the Order is extended to February 7, 2019; 3. The Receiver shall only file one more fee motion at the time it files its final report and seeks to wind up the receivership estate, instead of two fee motions as now provided at Section X.A.1.b and Section X.A.2.b of the Order, with the fee motion to be filed not later than February 7, 2019; and 4. The deadline for the Receiver to file its final report set forth at Section X.A.2.b of the Order is extended to February 7, 2019. (lom)
August 8, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Richard B. Newman to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants American Counseling Center Corp., M and T Financial Group, Salar Tahour(individually ), Salar Tahour(as an officer of M and T Financial Group and American Counseling Center Corp.). Motion set for hearing on 9/10/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Newman, Richard)
August 7, 2018 Filing 78 Amended Certificate of Service re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File For Order Extending Deadlines Under Section X.A of the Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment #76 (Caris, Gary)
August 7, 2018 Filing 77 Certificate of Service re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File For Order Extending Deadlines Under Section X.A of the Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment #76 (Caris, Gary)
August 7, 2018 Filing 76 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File For Order Extending Deadlines Under Section X.A of the Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment filed by Permanent Equity Receiver Robb Evans. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brick Kane In Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Extending Deadlines, #2 Proposed Order re Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Deadlines) (Caris, Gary)
June 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND MONETARY JUDGMENT as to Defendants M&T Financial Group, American Counseling Center Corp., and Salar Tahour by Judge Otis D. Wright, II : A. Judgment in the amount of Eleven Million, Six Hundred Ninety-Four Thousand, Three Hundred Forty Seven Dollars and Forty-Nine Cents. ($11,694,347.49) is entered in favor of the Commission against Individual Defendant and Corporate Defendants, jointly and severally, as equitable monetary relief. B. Individual Defendant is ordered to pay to the Commission Three Hundred Seventy Nine Thousand, Five Hundred Ninety Six Dollars and Sixty-Two Cents ($379,596.62). Such payment must be made within seven (7) days of entry of this Order by electronic fund transfer in accordance with instructions previously provided by a representative of the Commission. (SEE DOCUMENT RE OTHER SPECIFICS RE INJUNCTION,DISSOLUTION OF ASSET FREEZE, RECEIVERSHIP TERMINATION, COMPLIANCE MONITORING, AND OTHER REQUIREMENTS THEREIN) (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (lc)
June 7, 2018 Filing 74 STIPULATION for Settlement Entry of Proposed Stipulated Order for Permanent Injunction and Monetary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wei, Joannie)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting Stipulated Motion to Stay Proceedings and Applicable Deadlines for 150 Days Pending Federal Trade Commissions Formal Review of Settlement #72 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:The Court STAYS the case for 150 days pending the Federal Trade Commissions Formal Review of Settlement. The parties shall prepare and file and status report no later than September 14, 2018, explaining the outcome of the Commissioners review of the settlement. The Court VACATES the hearing on the Motion set for May 14, 2018. (lc)
April 12, 2018 Filing 72 Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Federal Trade Commission's Formal Review of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. Motion set for hearing on 5/14/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Wei, Joannie)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Richard B. Newman in place of attorney Jeffrey A. Backman, Richard W. Epstein and Greenspoon Marder LLP filed by Defendants American Counseling Center Corp., M and T Financial Group, Salar Tahour #68 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Richard Newman in place of attorney Babak Lalezari filed by Defendants American Counseling Center Corp., M and T Financial Group, Salar Tahour(individually ), Salar Tahour(as an officer of M and T Financial Group and American Counseling Center Corp. #69 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
January 25, 2018 Filing 69 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Richard Newman in place of attorney Babak Lalezari filed by Defendants American Counseling Center Corp., M and T Financial Group, Salar Tahour(individually ), Salar Tahour(as an officer of M and T Financial Group and American Counseling Center Corp.). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lalezari, Babak)
January 25, 2018 Filing 68 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Richard B. Newman in place of attorney Jeffrey A. Backman , Richard W. Epstein and Greenspoon Marder LLP filed by Defendants American Counseling Center Corp., M and T Financial Group, Salar Tahour(individually ). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Backman, Jeffrey)
January 18, 2018 Filing 67 Status REPORT of Receiver's Analysis of Salar Tahour's Purchase of Real Property filed by Receiver Robb Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Report of Receiver's Analysis)(Caris, Gary)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright II: THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES. Bench trial: 2/12/19 9:00 AM; File final trial exhibit stipulation: 2//7/19; hearing on motions in limine: 1/28/19 1:30 PM; Final Pretrial Conference: 1/14/19 1:30 PM; file motions in limine: 1/14/19; lodge Pretrial conference order and pretrial exhibit stipulation, file contentions of fact and law, exhibit and witness lists, status report regarding settlement: 1/7/19; last date to conduct settlement conference: 1/7/18; last day for hearing motions: 9/17/18; expert discovery cutoff: 8/17/18; percipient/fact discovery cutoff: 6/18/18; last date to amend pleadings or add parties: 4/23/18. (lc) Modified on 12/22/2017 (lc).
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for Settlement Conference. (lc)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING AND AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF RECEIVERS AND PROFESSIONALS FEES AND COSTS FROM INCEPTION OF THE RECEIVERSHIP THROUGHOCTOBER 31, 2017 #58 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Thefees and costsincurred from the inception of the receivership, on or about September 19, 2017,through October 31, 2017 are hereby approved and authorized to be paid from the assets of the receivership estate: A. The fees of the Receiver, the Receivers members and staff of $103,958.15 and Receivers costs of $4,431.22, for a total of $108,389.37; and B. The fees of the Receivers former counsel, Diamond McCarthy LLP of $35,057.25 and Diamond McCarthy LLPs costs of $256.09, for a total of $35,313.34.The hearing on the Motion is VACATED. (lc)
December 18, 2017 Filing 63 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from Inception of the Receivership Through October 31, 2017; Memorandum of Poin #58 filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Wei, Joannie)
December 18, 2017 Filing 62 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10, filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission.. (Wei, Joannie)
December 6, 2017 Filing 61 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Receiver's Miscellaneous Document, #60 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Proof of Service Subsequent Document. Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
December 5, 2017 Filing 60 Certificate of Service filed by Receiver Robb Evans re: Declaration (Motion related),, #59 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from Inception of the Receivership Through October 31, 2017; Memorandum of Poin #58 (Caris, Gary)
December 5, 2017 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Declaration of Brick Kane In Support of Motion for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from Inception of the Receivership Through October 31, 2017 in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from Inception of the Receivership Through October 31, 2017; Memorandum of Poin #58 filed by Receiver Robb Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Caris, Gary)
December 5, 2017 Filing 58 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Notice of Motion and Motion for Order Approving and Authorizing Payment of Receiver's and Professional's Fees and Costs from Inception of the Receivership Through October 31, 2017; Memorandum of Points and Authorities and Declaration of Gary Owen Caris In Support Thereof filed by Permanent Equity Receiver Robb Evans. Motion set for hearing on 1/8/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) (Caris, Gary)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER APPROVING OF BARNES AND THORNBURG LLP AS COUNSEL FOR THE RECEIVER IN PLACE OF DIAMOND McCARTHY LLP #55 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
November 20, 2017 Filing 56 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Receiver's Miscellaneous Document #55 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request: Substitute Attorney ( Not the G01 form). Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
November 20, 2017 Filing 55 Substitution of Attorney and Request for Court Approval Thereof filed by Receiver Robb Evans (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Substitution of Attorney and Request for Court Approval Thereof)(Caris, Gary)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE APPLICATION PERMITTING PERMANENT EQUITY RECEIVER TO TRANSMIT INFORMATION REGARDING CONSUMER CLIENTS OF RECEIVERSHIP DEFENDANTS TO THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION FOR LIMITED PURPOSES #51 (SEE DOCUMENT AS APPLICABLE TO THE DOE) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
November 7, 2017 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Gary Owen Caris In Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Receiver for Defendants M&T Financial Group and American Consulting Center Corp. to Transmit Information Regarding Consumer Clients of Receivership Defendants to the United States Department of Education for Limited Pur #51 filed by Receiver Robb Evans. (Caris, Gary)
November 7, 2017 Filing 52 DECLARATION of Brick Kane In Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Receiver for Defendants M&T Financial Group and American Consulting Center Corp. to Transmit Information Regarding Consumer Clients of Receivership Defendants to the United States Department of Education for Limited Pur #51 filed by Receiver Robb Evans. (Caris, Gary)
November 7, 2017 Filing 51 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Appoint Receiver for Defendants M&T Financial Group and American Consulting Center Corp. to Transmit Information Regarding Consumer Clients of Receivership Defendants to the United States Department of Education for Limited Purposes filed by Receiver Robb Evans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Caris, Gary)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION TO SELL RECEIVERSHIP DEFENDANTS PERSONAL PROPERTY ATPUBLIC AUCTION #49 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
November 1, 2017 Filing 49 STIPULATION for Leave to Sell Receivership Defendants' Personal Property at Public Auction filed by Receiver Robb Evans. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Caris, Gary)
October 27, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE Schedule of Known Creditors of the Receivership Defendants filed by Permanent Equity Receiver [Local Civil Rule 66-5] filed by Receiver Robb Evans. (Caris, Gary)
October 16, 2017 Filing 47 DECLARATION of Salar Tahour Pursuant to Section XIII of the Stipulated Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants M and T Financial Group, Salar Tahour, Salar Tahour. (Lalezari, Babak)
October 12, 2017 Filing 46 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)]; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE [FRCP 26(f)] by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Scheduling Conference set for January 8, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (lom)
October 11, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #40 . The following error(s) was/were found: Missing first page of Notice of Appearance or Withdrawlal of Counsel G123 In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
October 11, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #41 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #40 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #39 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incomplete docket text -Missing name of event. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
October 11, 2017 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) #3 Defense and Affirmative Defenses filed by Defendants American Counseling Center Corp., M and T Financial Group, Salar Tahour(individually ).(Backman, Jeffrey)
October 10, 2017 Filing 42 STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge George H. Wu for Judge Otis D. Wright, II. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants, Defendants' officers, agents, employees, and attorneys, and all other persons in active concert or participation with any of them, who receive actual notice of this Order, whether acting directly or indirectly, in connection with the telemarketing, advertising, marketing, promoting, offering for sale, sale, or provision of student loan debt relief services, are restrained and enjoined from: (see document for additional details). (mrgo)
October 10, 2017 Filing 41 (Attorney Lesley Anne Fleetwood Hawes added to party Robb Evans(pty:rc))(Hawes, Lesley)
October 10, 2017 Filing 40 (Caris, Gary)
October 10, 2017 Filing 39 (Attorney Gary O Caris added to party Robb Evans(pty:rc))(Caris, Gary)
October 6, 2017 Filing 38 TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: Counsel are advised that Plaintiff FTC's Application for a Preliminary Injunction #18 #25 , set for October 16, 2017 will be held before the Honorable George H. Wu. The time to appear at the hearing has changed from 1:30 p.m. to 8:30 a.m. Judge Wu is located in Courtroom 9D of the United States Courthouse at 350 West 1st Street, Los Angeles, California. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 6, 2017 Filing 37 TEMPORARY EQUITY RECEIVER'S REPORT of Activities filed by Receiver Robb Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A continued)(Caris, Gary)
October 6, 2017 Filing 36 STIPULATION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wei, Joannie)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey A. Backman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants American Counseling Center Corp., M and T Financial Group, Salar Tahour(individually ), Salar Tahour(as an officer of M and T Financial Group and American Counseling Center Corp. and designating Babak Lalezari #33 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard W. Epstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants M&T Financial Group d/b/a StuDebt, Student Debt Relief Group, SDRG, Student Loan Relief Counselors, SLRC,Capital Advocates Group, American Counseling Center Corp., d/b/a StuDebt, Student Debt Relief Group, SDRG, Student Loan Relief Counselors, SLRC, and Capital Advocates Group and Salar Tahour and designating Babak Lalezari as local counsel #32 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
October 2, 2017 Filing 33 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey A. Backman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants American Counseling Center Corp., M and T Financial Group, Salar Tahour, Salar Tahour (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-2059953 9) filed by Defendants American Counseling Center Corp., M and T Financial Group, Salar Tahour(individually ), Salar Tahour(as an officer of M and T Financial Group and American Counseling Center Corp.). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lalezari, Babak)
October 2, 2017 Filing 32 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Richard W. Epstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants American Counseling Center Corp., M and T Financial Group, Salar Tahour, Salar Tahour (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-2059952 9) filed by DEFENDANTS American Counseling Center Corp., M and T Financial Group, Salar Tahour(individually ), Salar Tahour(as an officer of M and T Financial Group and American Counseling Center Corp.). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lalezari, Babak)
October 2, 2017 Filing 31 DECLARATION of SALAR TAHOUR Pursuant to Section X of the TRO filed by Defendants American Counseling Center Corp., M and T Financial Group, Salar Tahour, Salar Tahour. (Lalezari, Babak)
October 2, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance, #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
September 29, 2017 Filing 29 Disclosure of Interested Parties filed by Defendants All Defendants, (Lalezari, Babak)
September 29, 2017 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Babak Lalezari on behalf of Defendants American Counseling Center Corp., M and T Financial Group, Salar Tahour, Salar Tahour (Attorney Babak Lalezari added to party American Counseling Center Corp. (pty:dft), Attorney Babak Lalezari added to party M and T Financial Group (pty:dft), Attorney Babak Lalezari added to party Salar Tahour(pty:dft), Attorney Babak Lalezari added to party Salar Tahour(pty:dft))(Lalezari, Babak)
September 26, 2017 Filing 27 UNDERTAKING OF RECEIVER in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Receiver Robb Evans (lc)
September 26, 2017 Filing 26 OATH OF APPOINTED COURT RECEIVER RE DUTIES AND TO OBEY ORDER OF THE COURT filed by Receiver Robb Evans (lc)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Regarding Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order with Asset Freeze,Appointment of Receiver, Other Equitable Relief, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #20 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: That the hearing on Plaintiff Federal Trade Commissions application for a preliminary injunction shall be held on October 16, 2017, at 1:30 p.m. The TRO entered in this matter on September 19, 2017 shall be extended in full force and effect through and until the close of business on October 16, 2017, or the date of the Courts ruling on the Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction, whichever is later and; (SEE DOCUMENT FOR TRO MODIFICATIONS AND SPECIFIC DEADLINES THEREIN) (lc) Modified on 9/26/2017 (lc).
September 26, 2017 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission, upon Defendant Salar Tahour(individually ) served on 9/20/2017, answer due 10/11/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Salar Tahour in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Wei, Joannie)
September 26, 2017 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission, upon Defendant M and T Financial Group served on 9/20/2017, answer due 10/11/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Salar Tahour, Officer and Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Wei, Joannie)
September 26, 2017 Filing 22 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission, upon Defendant American Counseling Center Corp. served on 9/20/2017, answer due 10/11/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Officer and Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Wei, Joannie)
September 26, 2017 Filing 21 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Joannie T Wei counsel for Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. Changing email to slevine1@ftc.gov. Filed by Plaintiff Joannie Wei. (Wei, Joannie)
September 25, 2017 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Continue Temporary Restraining Order from October 2, 2017 to October 16, 2017 Re: Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #18 filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wei, Joannie)
September 19, 2017 Filing 18 EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITH ASSET FREEZE, APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER, OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE (lc) Modified on 9/25/2017 (lc).
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING aPPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Audrey L.C. Austin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission [Docket no. 9]designating Barbara Y K Chun as local counsel by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel A.A. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission designating Barbara Y K Chun as local counsel[docket no. 8] by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTINGAPPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joannie T Wei to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission designating Barbara Y K Chun as local counsel[docket no. 7] by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: (lc)
September 19, 2017 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #3 as to Defendants American Counseling Center Corp., M and T Financial Group, Salar Tahour(individually ), Salar Tahour(as an officer of M and T Financial Group and American Counseling Center Corp.). (car)
September 18, 2017 Filing 19 RECOMMENDATION FOR TEMPORARY RECEIVER filed by plaintiff Federal Trade Commission (lc)
September 18, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 18, 2017 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car)
September 18, 2017 Filing 12 Certification and Declaration of Plaintiff's Counsel Joannie Wei In Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Applications for 1) Temporary Restraining Order [FRCP 65(b) and Local Rule 65-1]; 2) Order Waiving Ex Parte Notice Requirement [FRCP 65(5) and Local Rule 7-19.2]; and 3) Order Temporarily Sealing the Case File [Local Rule 79-5] filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (car)
September 18, 2017 Filing 11 DECLARATIONS In Support of Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order with an Asset Freeze, Appointment of a Receiver, and Other Equitable Relief, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #4 VOLUME II filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Document, #2 Part 3 of Document, #3 Part 4 of Document, #4 Part 5 of Document, #5 Part 6 of Document)(car)
September 18, 2017 Filing 10 DECLARATIONS In Support of Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order with Asset Freeze, Appointment of a Receiver, Other Equitable Relief, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #4 VOLUME I filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Document, #2 Part 3 of Document, #3 Part 4 of Document, #4 Part 5 of Document, #5 Part 6 of Document, #6 Part 7 of Document, #7 Part 8 of Document, #8 Part 9 of Document)(car) Modified on 9/19/2017 (car).
September 18, 2017 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Audrey L.C. Austin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for U.S. Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (car)
September 18, 2017 Filing 8 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel A.A. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for U.S. Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (car)
September 18, 2017 Filing 7 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joannie T Wei to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Not Required for U.S. Government Attorney) filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (car)
September 18, 2017 Filing 5 Memorandum In Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order with an Asset Freeze, Appointment of a Receiver, and Other Equitable Relief, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue #4 filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (car) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2017: #1 Part 2 of document) (car).
September 18, 2017 Filing 4 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order with an Asset Freeze, Appointment of a Receiver, and Other Equitable Relief, and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (car)
September 18, 2017 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Defendants Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams, filed by Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Temporarily Sealing the Case File by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Granting #1 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Temporarily Seal the Case File (car)
September 18, 2017 Filing 1 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Temporarily Seal the Case File and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Temporarily Seal the Case File filed by Federal Trade Commission. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. M and T Financial Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salar Tahour
Represented By: Richard B Newman
Represented By: Babak Lalezari
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Backman
Represented By: Richard W Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Counseling Center Corp.
Represented By: Babak Lalezari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M and T Financial Group
Represented By: Babak Lalezari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Counseling Center Corp. a corporation, also d/b/a StuDebt, Student Debt Relief Group, SDRG, Student Loan Relief Counselors, SLRC, and Capital Advocates Group doing business as Studebt Inc. also known as Student Debt Relief Group doing busine
Represented By: Richard B Newman
Represented By: Babak Lalezari
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Backman
Represented By: Richard W Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Student Debt Relief Group
Represented By: Babak Lalezari
Represented By: Richard B Newman
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Backman
Represented By: Richard W Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M and T Financial Group a corporation, also d/b/a StuDebt, Student Debt Relief Group, SDRG, Student Loan Relief Counselors, SLRC, and Capital Advocates Group doing business as Studebt Inc. doing business as Student Debt Relief Group doing business as
Represented By: Babak Lalezari
Represented By: Richard B Newman
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Backman
Represented By: Richard W Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Robb Evans
Represented By: Gary O Caris
Represented By: Lesley Anne Fleetwood Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Barbara Y K Chun
Represented By: Barbara Y. K. Chun
Represented By: Audrey L C Austin
Represented By: Joannie T Wei
Represented By: Samuel A A Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?