Securities and Exchange Commission v. Edward Chen et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Edward Chen, Jean Chen, GH Design Group, LLC, GH Investment LP, Golden Galaxy LP, Home Paradise Investment Center LLC and Mega Home, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv06929
Filed: September 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Presiding Judge: John E. McDermott
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT EDWARD CHEN by Judge Percy Anderson, in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Edward Chen in the principal amount of $24,655,000, interest in the amount of $1,173,098, attorneys fees of $0. 00, costs of $0.00 for a total judgment of $25,828,098. Related to: Stipulation for Judgment 176 , and shall be jointly and several liable with codefendants Jean Chen, GH Investment LP, GH Design Group, LLC, Golden Galaxy LP, Home Paradise Investment Center (limited as set forth in its separate judgment) and Mega Home, LLC, for the payment of those sums. (See document for details) (mrgo)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANTS GH INVESTMENT LP AND GH DESIGN GROUP, LLC by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, that GH Investment LP and GH Design Group, LLC and their officers, agents, servants, employees, attorneys, subsi diaries and affiliates, and those persons in active concert or participation with any of them, who receive actual notice of this Order, by personal service or otherwise, and each of them, be and hereby are permanently restrained and enjoined from, directly or indirectly. (SEE ATTACHMENT OF THIS JUDGMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (jp)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Percy Anderson. Absent a showing of good cause, an action must be dismissed without prejudice if the summons and complaint are not served on a defendant within 90 days after the complaint is filed. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before March 26, 2018 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to def endants Home Paradise Investment Center LLC, GH Investment LP, GH Design Group, LLC, Golden Galaxy LP, and Mega Home, LLC. Failure to respond to this Order may result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to dismissal of the complaint as to these defendants. (iv)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE: (1) ENTRY OF PARTIAL PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; (2) TO CONTINUE HEARING RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED; AND (3) PERMIT THE RECEIVER TO ENGAGE EB-5 COUNSEL PENDING HEARING ON THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED pending trial on the action that Defendants Edward Chen a/k/a Jianqiao Chen, Jian Qiao Chen, and Jian Chen (Edward Chen), Jean Chen a/k/a Jing Jian and Jean Jiang (Jean Chen), and their officers, agent s, servants, employees, attorneys, subsidiaries and affiliates, and those persons in active concert or participation with any of them, who receive actual notice of this Order, by personal service or otherwise, and each of them, be and hereby are p reliminarily restrained and enjoined from, directly or indirectly, in the offer or sale of any securities, by the use of any means or instruments of transportation or communication in interstate commerce or by the use of the mails: (see document for further details). (mrgo)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Edward Chen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Chen
Represented By: Milena Dolukhanyan
Represented By: Edward Gartenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Chen
Represented By: Nicolas Morgan
Represented By: Thomas A Zaccaro
Represented By: Elon Berk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GH Design Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GH Investment LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Galaxy LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Paradise Investment Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mega Home, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Kristin S Escalante
Represented By: Benjamin M Faulkner
Represented By: Junling Ma
Represented By: Donald W Searles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?