Iveth Uribe v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Plaintiff: IVETH URIBE
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation and Does 1 to 25
Case Number: 2:2017cv07765
Filed: October 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2018 Filing 23 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (yl)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REMANDING ACTION FROM FEDERAL COURT TO STATE COURT. The Stipulation of Defendant COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION and Plaintiff IVETH URIBE for Remand to the Los Angeles County Superior Court has been fully considered by the Court and IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Stipulation is APPROVED for the reasons set forth therein. The above-captioned action is hereby remanded to the Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. BC666651. All scheduled dates and deadlines are VACATED. #21 by Judge Dolly M. Gee Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (yl)
January 31, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Werbin, Anthony)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER #19 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. DENIED AS MOOT. (kti)
December 21, 2017 Filing 19 REQUEST to Continue Conference from December 22, 2017 to January 16, 2018 filed by Iveth Uribe Iveth Uribe. Request set for hearing on 1/16/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Benedetto, Sergio)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/26/2018 (early mediation); 9/3/2018. Joint report re results of early mediation due by 5/3/2018; joint status report re settlement due by 9/10/2018; no appearance necessary. (gk)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial set for 11/27/2018 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/30/2018 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Amended Pleadings and Addition of Parties Cut-Off 2/1/2018. Early Mediation Deadline 4/26/2018. Joint Report re Results of Early Mediation 5/3/2018. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 7/24/2018. Motions due by 7/31/2018. Settlement Conference Completion Date 9/3/2018. Motions in Limine to be filed by 10/9/2018. Joint Status Report re Settlement due by 9/10/2018. Proposed Pretrial Conference Order due by 10/9/2018. Joint Exhibit List due by 10/9/2018. Witness List due by 10/9/2018. See document for further details. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates) (gk)
December 18, 2017 Filing 16 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Declaration #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Order. Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Other error(s) with document(s): For any request - to find the correct efiling event, see: Motions and Related Filings - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests - Order. This will set the Request before the Judge. All [Prop] Order are attached as the second and/or separate attachment to the Request. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
December 18, 2017 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Sergio F. Benedetto,Esq. filed by Plaintiff Iveth Uribe. (Benedetto, Sergio)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENT(S) by Judge Dolly M. Gee: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Declaration #13 , for the following reasons: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment; Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.4. (lom)
December 15, 2017 Filing 13 DOCUMENT IS STRICKEN, see docket entry no. #14 - DECLARATION of Sergio F. Benedetto,Esq. filed by Plaintiff Iveth Uribe. (Benedetto, Sergio) Modified on 12/18/2017 (lom).
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Having received the joint 26(f) report #10 #11 , the Court hereby RESETS the scheduling conference on calendar for December 22, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. The Order to Show Cause dated December 5, 2017 #9 is DISCHARGED. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 8, 2017 Filing 11 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. Exhibit "A" as to Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #10 . (Werbin, Anthony)
December 8, 2017 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.. (Werbin, Anthony)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)- ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Dolly M. Gee. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff show cause in writing no later than December 12, 2017, why sanctions should not be imposed for their failure to cooperate and participate with opposing counsel in a Rule 26(f) conference and for failure to file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report. The filing of a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by the deadline will be deemed a satisfactory response. The scheduling conference on December 15, 2017 is hereby VACATED and will be rescheduled if necessary. (iv)
October 30, 2017 Filing 8 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26 (f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee is set for hearing 12/15/2017 at 9:30 AM. (iv)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (iv)
October 25, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
October 25, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
October 24, 2017 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/19/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #2](et)
October 24, 2017 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Costco Wholesale Corporation, Does 1 to 25, filed by Plaintiff Iveth Uribe. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/28/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #1] (et)
October 24, 2017 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 served on 10/24/17. (Werbin, Anthony)
October 24, 2017 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Werbin, Anthony)
October 24, 2017 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation, identifying COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES, INC.; GALLAGHER BASSETT SERVICES, INC. (Werbin, Anthony)
October 24, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC666651 Receipt No: 0973-20713757 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Anthony William Werbin added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:bkmov))(Werbin, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iveth Uribe v. Costco Wholesale Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Eugene J Egan
Represented By: Anthony William Werbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IVETH URIBE
Represented By: Sergio F Benedetto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?