Anthony Shawn Woods v. City of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Shawn Woods
Defendant: City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles County Probation Dept., Los Angeles Police Dept., Los Angeles Sanitation Bureau and Unknown Riley
Case Number: 2:2017cv07853
Filed: October 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J. Guilford
Presiding Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE 101 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: Pursuant to the Second Amended Answer filed by all named Defendants on May 9, 2018, Dkt. 49, and Plaintiff's Response to the Order to Show Cause, Dkt. 53, the Court discharges the Order to Show Cause re: Entry of Default, Dkt. 44. (dts)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 5/25/2018. (dts)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anthony Shawn Woods v. City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles County Probation Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Sanitation Bureau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Shawn Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?