UL LLC v. Gangsong Group Corp. et al

Plaintiff: UL LLC
Defendant: Sun Defang, Defang USA LLC, James Ellenberg, Flying Medical USA LLC, Gangsong Group Corp., John Does, Logistic Public Warehouse, ManSeeManWant LLC, Shenzhen Kebe Technology Co. Ltd., Shenzhen Leidisi Electronics Technology Co., Ltd., Thomas Soon Chiah, Sum Fortune International Group, TRC International Corp. and Jing Hua Zhou
Case Number: 2:2017cv08166
Filed: November 8, 2017
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Charles F. Eick
Presiding Judge: Dale S. Fischer
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 80 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT DECREE AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANTS GANGSONG GROUP CORP., FLYING MEDICAL USA LLC, LOGISTIC PUBLIC WAREHOUSE, AND THOMAS SOON CHIAH by Judge Dale S. Fischer (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
November 30, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANTS TRC INTERNATIONAL CORP., SUM FORTUNE INTERNATIONAL GROUP, DEFANG USA, LLC, MANSEEMANWANT LLC, AND JAMES ELLENBERG by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Refer to the Court's order for specifics. (pso).
November 29, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick re Stipulation for Protective Order 43 . (sp)
November 22, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR STIPULATED PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AS TO DEFENDANTS GANGSONG GROUP CORP. AKA LOGISTICS PUBLIC WAREHOUSE FLYING MEDICAL USA LLC, AND THOMAS SOON CHIAH by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (See document for details) (mrgo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UL LLC v. Gangsong Group Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Defang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defang USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ellenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flying Medical USA LLC
Represented By: Rabeh M A Soofi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gangsong Group Corp.
Represented By: Rabeh M A Soofi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logistic Public Warehouse
Represented By: Rabeh M A Soofi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ManSeeManWant LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Kebe Technology Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Leidisi Electronics Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Soon Chiah
Represented By: Rabeh M A Soofi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sum Fortune International Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRC International Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jing Hua Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UL LLC
Represented By: Matthew R Gershman
Represented By: Amy L Kramer
Represented By: Benjamin S Kurtz
Represented By: Jeffrey G Mote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?