Vincent K. Siefe v. Unum Group et al

Plaintiff: Vincent K. Siefe
Defendant: Does, The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company and Unum Group
Case Number: 2:2017cv08199
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Paul L. Abrams
Presiding Judge: Michael W. Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2018 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO DISMISS ACTION WITH PREJUDICE 49 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter shall be dismissed as to all parties, with prejudice, and in its entirety. Each party is to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv)
June 25, 2018 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: A Show Cause re Dismissal Hearing is set for 7/23/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. If a stipulated dismissal is filed prior to this date, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance is needed. All other dates are hereby vacated. (cw)
June 21, 2018 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (See document for further details.) 44 (sbou)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vincent K. Siefe v. Unum Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel W Maguire
Represented By: Edith S Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Daniel W Maguire
Represented By: Edith S Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent K. Siefe
Represented By: Terrence J Coleman
Represented By: Ryan H Opgenorth
Represented By: Rudy Tap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?