Derrick Dwight Boyd v. Xavier Cano
Petitioner: Derrick Dwight Boyd
Respondent: Xavier Cano
Case Number: 2:2017cv08700
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patrick J. Walsh
Presiding Judge: Stephen V. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 JUDGMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: R&R - Accepting Report and Recommendations 22 Pursuant to the Order Accepting Report and Adopting Findings, Conclusions, and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge, IT IS ADJUDGED that the Petition is denied and this action is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (yl)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND ADOPTING FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITYS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (See document for further details) 19 (yl)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PETITION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED by Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 1/5/2018. SEE ORDER. (im)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derrick Dwight Boyd v. Xavier Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derrick Dwight Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Xavier Cano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?