David Arnold, et al v. City of Redondo Beach, et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Fonteno, Michael Martinez, Catherine Garcia, Ryan Harrison, Brian Weiss, Victor Salazar, John Bruce, Matthew Alston, David M. Christian, Charles T. Prestia, Keith Turner, Brett Manis, Clinton Daniel, Latoya Harris, Todd Heywood, Fabian Saucedo, Ryan Crespin, Jonathan D. Naylor, Terrence Stevens, Joshua Spry, Timothy McFarland, Brian Long, William J. Turner, Aaron Plugge, Robert Carlborg, Frank Hernandez, Patrick Knox, David Arnold, Wayne Windman, W. Corey King, John J. Anderson, Lou Velez, Edward Jackson, Michael Snakenborg, Christopher Bushman, Stephen M. Sprengel, Salvador Garcia, Mark Chafe, Daryn Glenn, Erik Frame, Jason Sapien, Robert S. Martin, Christopher Sosenko, Andrew Lewis, Delvin Delery, John Banach, Bryan Ridenour, Vincent Dileva, Michael Strosnider, -, Michael J. Green, Wesley Hatfield, Blake Nimmons, Michael A. Diehr, Justin Drury, Jenna Wolfinger, Richard A. Kochheim, Yesenia Contreras, Daniel Haley, Michael Strosnider, Corey W. King, Ian Meissen and Brian Day
Defendant: City of Redondo Beach and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Consolidated Plaintiff: Shell Conatser, Vincent J. Dipane, Steven Hong, Brad Boster, Michael Henry Hernandez, Jonathan Reyes, Joel Dodier, Melissa De Paoli, Robert L. Herrera, Michael Manente, Tyler Hoff, Morgan Lee Peterson, Andrew Yamamoto, Jasen Brown, Patrick Wagoner, John Cabeza de Vaca, Jason Johnson, Gary Treskes, Ryan Stout, Jake Steelman, Brian Regan, Steve Fernandez, Andrei Alexandrescu, Gregory Allen, Joseph Boehm, David Poirier, Grant Currie, Dustin Conard, Eric Paulson, John Velasquez Jr., Norm Shultz, Tim Dennis, Bart Waddell, Brandon Lackey, Matthew Taras, Chad E. Smith, Kyle ODell, Gary Dailey, Jeremy Sisante, Arnuld Menjivar, Matthew Bandy, Chad Michael Smith, Jason May, Kenneth Campos, Chris Lubba, Ben Bellante, Dave Smith, Brad Sweatt, David Buckner, Keving Coffelt, Duane Vroom, Darren Mallabon, Donovan Hall and Curt Andrew Mahoney
Consolidated 3Rd Party Defendant: Ryan Hunt
Case Number: 2:2017cv09097
Filed: December 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Steve Kim
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT #63 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The OSC shall be continued until July 8, 2020. The parties shall show cause, in writing, no later than July 8, 2020, why settlement has not been finalized.No hearing will be held.All other dates in this action remain vacated and taken off calendar. (lc)
June 8, 2020 Filing 63 Joint STIPULATION for Order To Continue Order to Show Cause re: Settlement filed by defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing Order to Show Cause re: Settlement)(Wu, Eric)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: In light of the parties recent Notice of Settlement (ECF No. 61), the Court hereby ORDERS the parties TO SHOW CAUSE, in writing, no later than June 8, 2020, why settlementhas not been finalized. No hearing will be held. All other dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. The Court will discharge this order upon the filing of a dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. (lc)
March 10, 2020 Filing 61 STIPULATION for Settlement , STIPULATION to Vacate Order Continuing Pretrial Deadlines Order,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,,, #60 filed by Plaintiffs Andrei Alexandrescu, Gregory Allen, Matthew Alston, John J. Anderson, David Arnold, John Banach, Matthew Bandy, Ben Bellante, Joseph Boehm, Brad Boster, Jasen Brown, John Bruce, David Buckner, Christopher Bushman, John Cabeza de Vaca, Kenneth Campos, Robert Carlborg, Mark Chafe, David M. Christian, Keving Coffelt, Dustin Conard, Shell Conatser, Yesenia Contreras, Ryan Crespin, Grant Currie, Gary Dailey, Clinton Daniel, Brian Day, Melissa De Paoli, Delvin Delery, Tim Dennis, Michael A. Diehr, Vincent Dileva, Vincent J. Dipane, Joel Dodier, Justin Drury, Steve Fernandez, Joseph Fonteno, Erik Frame, Catherine Garcia, Salvador Garcia, Daryn Glenn, Michael J. Green, Daniel Haley, Donovan Hall, Latoya Harris, Ryan Harrison, Wesley Hatfield, Frank Hernandez, Michael Henry Hernandez, Robert L. Herrera, Todd Heywood, Tyler Hoff, Steven Hong, Ryan Hunt, Edward Jackson, Jason Johnson, Corey W. King, Patrick Knox, Richard A. Kochheim, Brandon Lackey, Andrew Lewis, Brian Long, Chris Lubba, Curt Andrew Mahoney, Darren Mallabon, Michael Manente, Brett Manis, Robert S. Martin, Michael Martinez, Jason May, Timothy McFarland, Ian Meissen, Arnuld Menjivar, Jonathan D. Naylor, Blake Nimmons, Kyle ODell, Eric Paulson, Morgan Lee Peterson, Aaron Plugge, David Poirier, Charles T. Prestia, Brian Regan, Jonathan Reyes, Bryan Ridenour, Victor Salazar, Jason Sapien, Fabian Saucedo, Norm Shultz, Jeremy Sisante, Chad E. Smith, Chad Michael Smith, Dave Smith, Michael Snakenborg, Christopher Sosenko, Stephen M. Sprengel, Joshua Spry, Jake Steelman, Terrence Stevens, Ryan Stout, Michael Strosnider, Brad Sweatt, Matthew Taras, Gary Treskes, Keith Turner, William J. Turner, John Velasquez Jr., Lou Velez, Duane Vroom, Bart Waddell, Patrick Wagoner, Brian Weiss, Wayne Windman, Jenna Wolfinger, Andrew Yamamoto. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Ryan Hunt(pty:con3df))(Swanson, Samantha)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER CONTINUTING PRETRIAL DEADLINES #9 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:1. The trial date shall remain as March 31, 2020 at 9:00 a.m.; 2. The Deadline to File Final Trial Exhibit Stipulation shall remain as March 26, 2020; 3. The following trial deadlines and dates are CONTINUED as indicated: a. Hearing on Motions in Limine shall be continued from March 23, 2020 until March 30, 2020, at 1:30 p.m.;b. Deadline to File Oppositions to Motions in Limine shall be continued from March 16, 2020 until March 23, 2020; c. Final Pretrial Conference and Deadline to File Motions in Limine shall be continued from March 9, 2020 until March 16, 2020, at 1:30 p.m.; and d. Deadline to File Pretrial Documents shall be continued from March 2, 2020 until March 12, 2020. (lc)
February 28, 2020 Filing 59 Joint STIPULATION for Order Continuing Pretrial Deadlines filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing Pretrial Deadlines)(Wu, Eric)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: On January 16, 2020, Plaintiffs and Defendant stipulated to continue the trial date and allassociated dates #57 . Having considered the parties stipulation and good causeappearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The trial date shall be CONTINUED to March 31, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. The current trial date of February 25, 2020, is hereby VACATED. The following corresponding trial deadlines and dates are CONTINUED as indicated,.in accordance with the continued trial date: a. Deadline to File Final Trial Exhibit Stipulation: March 26, 2020. b. Hearing on Motions in Limine at 1:30 p.m.: March 23, 2020. c. Deadline to File Oppositions to Motions in Limine: March 16, 2020. d. Final Pretrial Conference at 1:30 p.m. and Deadline to File Motions in Limine: March 9, 2020. e. Deadline to File Pretrial Documents: March 2, 2020. (lc)
January 16, 2020 Filing 57 STIPULATION to Continue Trial from 02/25/20 to 03/25/20 filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wu, Eric)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #32 AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #38 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II . (lc). Modified on 11/25/2019 (lc).
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE #54 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The trial date shall be CONTINUED to February 25, 2020, 9:00 a.m.; The following corresponding trial deadlines and dates shall be CONTINUED as indicated, in accordance with the continued trial date: a. Deadline to File Final Trial Exhibit Stipulation: February 20, 2020; b. Hearing on Motions in Limine at 1:30 p.m.: February 10, 2020; c. Deadline to File Oppositions to Motions in Limine: February 3, 2020; d. Final Pretrial Conference at 1:30 p.m. and Deadline to File Motions in Limine: January 27, 2020; and e. Deadline to File Pretrial Documents: January 17, 2020. (lom)
September 13, 2019 Filing 54 STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date from November 12, 2019 to February 25, 2010 filed by Plaintiffs David Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Swanson, Samantha)
May 29, 2019 Filing 53 The hearing on the MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #32 #38 , scheduled for June 3, 2019 at 1:30 P.M., are hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matters stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 14, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Change of address by Philip A Toomey attorney for Defendant City of Redondo Beach. Changing attorneys address to 2041 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 300, El Segundo, CA 90245. Filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Toomey, Philip)
May 14, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE of Change of address by Eric J Wu attorney for Defendant City of Redondo Beach. Changing attorneys address to 2041 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 300, El Segundo, CA 90245. Filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Wu, Eric)
May 14, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Change of address by Fadi K Rasheed attorney for Defendant City of Redondo Beach. Changing attorneys address to 2041 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 300, El Segundo, CA 90245. Filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Rasheed, Fadi)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re Stipulation for Trial #46 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The trial date shall be continued to November 12, 2019, 9:00 a.m. The current trial date of June 25, 2019, is hereby vacated. The following corresponding trial deadlines and dates shall be continued as indicated, in accordance with the continued trial date: a. Deadline to File Final Trial Exhibit Stipulation: November 7, 2019; b. Hearing on Motions in Limine at 1:30 p.m.: October 28, 2019; c. Deadline to File Oppositions to Motions in Limine: October 15, 2019; d. Final Pretrial Conference at 1:30 p.m. and Deadline to File Motions in Limine: October 7, 2019; and e. Deadline to File Pretrial Documents: September 30, 2019. (lc) Modified on 5/7/2019 (lc).
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: On the Courts own motion, the Court CONTINUES the hearings on Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment #32 , currently set for hearing on May 13, 2019, and Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment #38 , currently set for hearing on May 20, 2019, to June 3, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. (lc)
May 7, 2019 Filing 47 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Affirmative Defenses #38 Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Matthew Alston, John J. Anderson, David Arnold, John Banach, John Bruce, Christopher Bushman, Robert Carlborg, Mark Chafe, David M. Christian, Yesenia Contreras, Ryan Crespin, Clinton Daniel, Brian Day, Delvin Delery, Michael A. Diehr, Vincent Dileva, Justin Drury, Joseph Fonteno, Erik Frame, Catherine Garcia, Salvador Garcia, Daryn Glenn, Michael J. Green, Daniel Haley, Latoya Harris, Ryan Harrison, Wesley Hatfield, Frank Hernandez, Todd Heywood, Edward Jackson, Corey W. King, Patrick Knox, Richard A. Kochheim, Andrew Lewis, Brian Long, Brett Manis, Robert S. Martin, Michael Martinez, Timothy McFarland, Ian Meissen, Jonathan D. Naylor, Blake Nimmons, Aaron Plugge, Charles T. Prestia, Bryan Ridenour, Victor Salazar, Jason Sapien, Fabian Saucedo, Michael Snakenborg, Christopher Sosenko, Stephen M. Sprengel, Joshua Spry, Terrence Stevens, Michael Strosnider, Keith Turner, William J. Turner, Lou Velez, Brian Weiss, Wayne Windman, Jenna Wolfinger. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Swanson, Samantha)
May 3, 2019 Filing 46 Joint STIPULATION for Jury Trial on 08-12-19 filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Continue Trial Date)(Wu, Eric)
April 29, 2019 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Affirmative Defenses #38 filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement, #2 Objections to Evidence, #3 Declaration of Eric J. Wu, #4 Appendix of Authorities)(Wu, Eric)
April 29, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY in Support of Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment #32 filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diane Strickfaden, #2 Appendix of Authorities)(Wu, Eric)
April 22, 2019 Filing 43 Objections Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment #32 Memorandum of Evidentiary Objections to the Declarations of Diane Strickfaden and Mary Furst filed by Plaintiff David Arnold. (McGill, Michael)
April 22, 2019 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment #32 filed by Plaintiff David Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law)(McGill, Michael)
April 16, 2019 Filing 41 INDEX OF AUTHENTICATED EXHIBITS re: Notice of Lodging #40 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Affirmative Defenses #38 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(McGill, Michael)
April 16, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,,, #39 (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law)(McGill, Michael)
April 16, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Affirmative Defenses #38 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 56-1 Statement of uncontroverted facts lacking. Other error(s) with document(s): Missing Proposed statement of uncontroverted facts...As an alternative, prepare and e-file a formal Notice of Lodging, to be docketed only under its specific event: Notice of Lodging, to which the formal proposed statement of uncontroverted facts is submitted as Separate Attachment thereto.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 15, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Defendants' Affirmative Defenses filed by Plaintiffs Andrei Alexandrescu, Gregory Allen, Matthew Alston, John J. Anderson, David Arnold, John Banach, Matthew Bandy, Ben Bellante, Joseph Boehm, Brad Boster, Jasen Brown, John Bruce, David Buckner, Christopher Bushman, John Cabeza de Vaca, Kenneth Campos, Robert Carlborg, Mark Chafe, David M. Christian, Keving Coffelt, Dustin Conard, Shell Conatser, Yesenia Contreras, Ryan Crespin, Grant Currie, Gary Dailey, Clinton Daniel, Brian Day, Melissa De Paoli, Delvin Delery, Tim Dennis, Michael A. Diehr, Vincent Dileva, Vincent J. Dipane, Joel Dodier, Justin Drury, Steve Fernandez, Joseph Fonteno, Erik Frame, Catherine Garcia, Salvador Garcia, Daryn Glenn, Michael J. Green, Daniel Haley, Donovan Hall, Latoya Harris, Ryan Harrison, Wesley Hatfield, Frank Hernandez, Michael Henry Hernandez, Robert L. Herrera, Todd Heywood, Tyler Hoff, Steven Hong, Ryan Hunt, Edward Jackson, Jason Johnson, Corey W. King, Patrick Knox, Richard A. Kochheim, Brandon Lackey, Andrew Lewis, Brian Long, Chris Lubba, Curt Andrew Mahoney, Darren Mallabon, Michael Manente, Brett Manis, Robert S. Martin, Michael Martinez, Jason May, Timothy McFarland, Ian Meissen, Arnuld Menjivar, Jonathan D. Naylor, Blake Nimmons, Kyle ODell, Eric Paulson, Morgan Lee Peterson, Aaron Plugge, David Poirier, Charles T. Prestia, Brian Regan, Jonathan Reyes, Bryan Ridenour, Victor Salazar, Jason Sapien, Fabian Saucedo, Norm Shultz, Jeremy Sisante, Chad E. Smith, Chad Michael Smith, Dave Smith, Michael Snakenborg, Christopher Sosenko, Stephen M. Sprengel, Joshua Spry, Jake Steelman, Terrence Stevens, Ryan Stout, Michael Strosnider, Brad Sweatt, Matthew Taras, Gary Treskes, Keith Turner, William J. Turner, John Velasquez Jr., Lou Velez, Duane Vroom, Bart Waddell, Patrick Wagoner, Brian Weiss, Wayne Windman, Jenna Wolfinger, Andrew Yamamoto. Motion set for hearing on 5/20/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration Declaration of Michael A. McGill in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B and C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment) (Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Andrei Alexandrescu(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Gregory Allen(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Matthew Bandy(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Ben Bellante(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Joseph Boehm(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Brad Boster(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Jasen Brown(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party David Buckner(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party John Cabeza de Vaca(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Kenneth Campos(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Keving Coffelt(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Dustin Conard(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Shell Conatser(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Grant Currie(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Gary Dailey(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Melissa De Paoli(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Tim Dennis(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Vincent J. Dipane(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Joel Dodier(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Steve Fernandez(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Donovan Hall(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Michael Henry Hernandez(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Robert L. Herrera(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Tyler Hoff(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Steven Hong(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Ryan Hunt(pty:con3df), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Jason Johnson(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Brandon Lackey(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Chris Lubba(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Curt Andrew Mahoney(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Darren Mallabon(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Michael Manente(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Jason May(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Arnuld Menjivar(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Kyle ODell(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Eric Paulson(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Morgan Lee Peterson(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party David Poirier(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Brian Regan(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Jonathan Reyes(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Norm Shultz(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Jeremy Sisante(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Chad E. Smith(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Chad Michael Smith(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Dave Smith(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Jake Steelman(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Ryan Stout(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Brad Sweatt(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Matthew Taras(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Gary Treskes(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party John Velasquez Jr.(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Duane Vroom(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Bart Waddell(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Patrick Wagoner(pty:conpla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Andrew Yamamoto(pty:conpla)) (McGill, Michael)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO FURTHER CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #36 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. For good cause shown, 1. The hearing on Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, currently scheduled for May 6, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5D, shall be continued to May 13, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5D. 2. The briefing schedule for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, shall be continued accordingly pursuant to rule 7-11 of the Local Rules of the Central District of California. (lom)
March 28, 2019 Filing 36 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment from May 6, 2019 to May 13, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment #32 filed by Plaintiff David Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGill, Michael)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT #34 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. For good cause shown, 1. The hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, originally scheduled for April 22, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5D, shall be continued to May 6, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5D. (lom)
March 25, 2019 Filing 34 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the alternative, Partial Summary Judgment from April 22, 2019 to May 6, 2019 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment #32 filed by Plaintiff David Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGill, Michael)
March 15, 2019 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Diane Strickfaden In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment #32 filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2, #2 Exhibit 3-5, #3 Exhibit 6-12, #4 Exhibit 13-25, #5 Exhibit 26-39, #6 Exhibit 40-52, #7 Exhibit 53-67, #8 Exhibit 68-96, #9 Exhibit 97-129)(Wu, Eric)
March 15, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. Motion set for hearing on 4/22/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Separate Statement of Uncontroverted Facts, #3 Declaration of Mary E. Furst, #4 Appendix, #5 Proposed Judgment) (Wu, Eric)
March 7, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #30 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incomplete docket text; missing name of event. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 6, 2019 Filing 30 (Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Andrei Alexandrescu(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Gregory Allen(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Matthew Alston(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party John J. Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party David Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party John Banach(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Matthew Bandy(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Ben Bellante(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Joseph Boehm(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Brad Boster(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Jasen Brown(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party John Bruce(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party David Buckner(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Christopher Bushman(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party John Cabeza de Vaca(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Kenneth Campos(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Robert Carlborg(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Mark Chafe(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party David M. Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Keving Coffelt(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Dustin Conard(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Shell Conatser(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Yesenia Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Ryan Crespin(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Grant Currie(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Gary Dailey(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Clinton Daniel(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Brian Day(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Melissa De Paoli(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Delvin Delery(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Tim Dennis(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Michael A. Diehr(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Vincent Dileva(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Vincent J. Dipane(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Joel Dodier(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Justin Drury(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Steve Fernandez(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Joseph Fonteno(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Erik Frame(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Catherine Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Salvador Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Daryn Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Michael J. Green(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Daniel Haley(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Donovan Hall(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Latoya Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Ryan Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Wesley Hatfield(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Frank Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Michael Henry Hernandez(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Robert L. Herrera(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Todd Heywood(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Tyler Hoff(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Steven Hong(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Edward Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Jason Johnson(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Corey W. King(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Patrick Knox(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Richard A. Kochheim(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Brandon Lackey(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Andrew Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Brian Long(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Chris Lubba(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Curt Andrew Mahoney(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Darren Mallabon(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Michael Manente(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Brett Manis(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Robert S. Martin(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Michael Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Jason May(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Timothy McFarland(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Ian Meissen(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Arnuld Menjivar(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Jonathan D. Naylor(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Blake Nimmons(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Kyle ODell(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Eric Paulson(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Morgan Lee Peterson(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Aaron Plugge(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party David Poirier(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Charles T. Prestia(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Brian Regan(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Jonathan Reyes(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Bryan Ridenour(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Victor Salazar(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Jason Sapien(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Fabian Saucedo(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Norm Shultz(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Jeremy Sisante(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Chad E. Smith(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Chad Michael Smith(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Dave Smith(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Michael Snakenborg(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Christopher Sosenko(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Stephen M. Sprengel(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Joshua Spry(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Jake Steelman(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Terrence Stevens(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Ryan Stout(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Michael Strosnider(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Brad Sweatt(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Matthew Taras(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Gary Treskes(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Keith Turner(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party William J. Turner(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party John Velasquez Jr.(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Lou Velez(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Duane Vroom(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Bart Waddell(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Patrick Wagoner(pty:conpla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Brian Weiss(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Wayne Windman(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Jenna Wolfinger(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha M Swanson added to party Andrew Yamamoto(pty:conpla))(Swanson, Samantha)
February 4, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Electronic Filing re Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings #28 e-mailed to Fadi K Rasheed at frasheeed@leechtishman.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.4.1 [frasheeed@leechtishman.com]: Recipient address rejected. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION TO DEEM COMPLAINT AMENDED AND CONTINUE DISCOVERY DEADLINES #27 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: 1. Plaintiffs Complaint shall be deemed amended to include the following two additional plaintiffs: a. Brian Day; and b. Ian Meissen; 2. Defendants previously filed Answers, including assertions of Affirmative Defenses, shall be deemed as responsive to Plaintiffsamended Complaint; 3. The percipient/fact discovery cut-off date is continued from March 11, 2019 to May 10, 2019; 4. The expert discovery cut-off date of March 25, 2019 is continued to May 24, 2019, but the expert disclosure date shall remain January 28, 2019; and 5. The deadline for hearing motions is continued from May 6, 2019 to May 27, 2019. (lc)
January 28, 2019 Filing 27 Joint STIPULATION to AMEND Scheduling Order,, Terminate Hearings,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #18 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #12 filed by Plaintiff David Arnold. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGill, Michael)
December 10, 2018 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric J Wu counsel for Defendant City of Redondo Beach. Adding Fadi K. Rasheed as counsel of record for City of Redondo Beach for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Wu, Eric)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES FOR ALL PURPOSES #24 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II the Court approves the Stipulation to Consolidate Cases For All Purposes filed in David Arnold, et al. v. City of Redondo Beach (Case No. 2:17-CV-9097-ODW (SKx)) and Gregory Allen, et al. v. City of Redondo Beach (Case No. 2:18-cv-1533-ODW-SK). The Related Actions are consolidated for all purposes, pursuant to Rule 42(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with ALL FUTURE FILINGS TO BE DUNE IN Case No. 2:17-CV-9097-ODW (SKx), which shall be captioned In re City of Redondo Beach FLSA Litigation.] (lc)
May 15, 2018 Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases as to 2:17-CV-9097-ODW-SK and 2:18-CV-1533-ODW-SK filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Toomey, Philip)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court ORDERS, the parties, TO SHOW CAUSE, why these cases (this case and re Allen, et al. v. City of Redondo Beach 2:18-cv-01533-ODW-SK) should not be consolidated for all further proceedings including disposition. Counsel for parties in both actions must meet and confer before May 25, 2018, and discuss the potential for consolidating these largely overlapping actions. After meeting andconferring, the parties shall jointly submit a stipulation consolidating the actions, or, if the parties do not agree to consolidate the actions, a joint status report explaining the reasons they claim should preclude consolidation. The Court is inclined to consolidate these matters. The parties must submit their stipulation or joint report before June 1, 2018. The Court will issuethis same Order to Show Cause in the Allen matter. (lc)
May 7, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Eric J Wu counsel for Defendant City of Redondo Beach. Changing firm name and address to Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, Inc., 841 Apollo Street, Suite 325, El Segundo, CA 90245. Filed by defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Wu, Eric)
May 7, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. correcting Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information (G-06), #20 (Wu, Eric)
May 7, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Eric J Wu counsel for Defendant City of Redondo Beach. Changing firm name and address to Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, Inc., 841 Apollo Street, Suite 325, El Segundo, CA 90245. Filed by defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Wu, Eric)
May 3, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney Philip A Toomey counsel for Defendant City of Redondo Beach. Changing firm name and address to Leech Tishman Fuscaldo & Lampl, Inc. 841 Apollo Street, Suite 325, El Segundo, CA 90245. Filed by defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Toomey, Philip)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. Amended Pleadings due by 7/23/2018., Discovery cut-off 3/11/2019., Exhibit List due by 5/27/2019., Witness List due by 5/27/2019., Motions in Limine to be filed by 6/3/2019., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/27/2019., Status Report due by 5/27/2019., Last date to conduct settlement conference is 4/29/2019. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR ALL OTHER SPECIFIED DATES) (lc)
April 20, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. Related Case(s): 2:18-cv-1533-FMO-E (Wu, Eric)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for Settlement Conference. (lc)
April 19, 2018 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7, filed by Plaintiff David Arnold.. (McGill, Michael)
April 9, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE TO PARTIES by U.S. Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Effective, April 12, 2018, Judge Kim will be located at the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, COURTROOM 540 on the 5th floor, located at 255 East Temple Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. All Court appearances shall be made in Courtroom 540 of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse, and all mandatory chambers copies shall be delivered to the judge's mail box located outside the Clerk's Office on the 12th floor of the Roybal Federal Building and U.S. Courthouse. Magistrate Judge Kim's Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Connie Lee, may be reached at (213) 894-4436. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 21, 2018 Filing 13 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)]; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE [FRCP 26(f)] by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Scheduling Conference set for April 30, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. See document for requirements. (lom)
February 16, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach.(Wu, Eric)
February 16, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Eric J. Wu counsel for Defendant City of Redondo Beach. Filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Attorney Eric J. Wu added to party City of Redondo Beach(pty:dft))(Wu, Eric)
February 16, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Philip A Toomey counsel for Defendant City of Redondo Beach. Adding Philip A. Toomey as counsel of record for City of Redondo Beach for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Attorney Philip A Toomey added to party City of Redondo Beach(pty:dft))(Toomey, Philip)
January 9, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs David Arnold. upon All Defendants. Waiver of Service signed by Philip A. Toomey. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service of Summons (CV-108))(McGill, Michael)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
December 20, 2017 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant City of Redondo Beach. (Attachments: #1 attachment) (esa)
December 20, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
December 20, 2017 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (esa)
December 19, 2017 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Matthew Alston, John J. Anderson, David Arnold, John Banach, John Bruce, Christopher Bushman, Robert Carlborg, Mark Chafe, David M. Christian, Yesenia Contreras, Ryan Crespin, Clinton Daniel, Delvin Delery, Michael A. Diehr, Vincent Dileva, Justin Drury, Joseph Fonteno, Erik Frame, Catherine Garcia, Salvador Garcia, Daryn Glenn, Michael J. Green, Daniel Haley, Latoya Harris, Ryan Harrison, Wesley Hatfield, Frank Hernandez, Todd Heywood, Edward Jackson, W. Corey King, Patrick Knox, Richard A. Kochheim, Andrew Lewis, Brian Long, Brett Manis, Robert S. Martin, Michael Martinez, Timothy McFarland, Jonathan D. Naylor, Blake Nimmons, Aaron Plugge, Charles T. Prestia, Bryan Ridenour, Victor Salazar, Jason Sapien, Fabian Saucedo, Michael Snakenborg, Christopher Sosenko, Stephen M. Sprengel, Joshua Spry, Terrence Stevens, Michael Strosnider, Keith Turner, William J. Turner, Lou Velez, Brian Weiss, Wayne Windman, Jenna Wolfinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Additional Plaintiffs)(McGill, Michael)
December 19, 2017 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Matthew Alston, John J. Anderson, David Arnold, John Banach, John Bruce, Christopher Bushman, Robert Carlborg, Mark Chafe, David M. Christian, Yesenia Contreras, Ryan Crespin, Clinton Daniel, Delvin Delery, Michael A. Diehr, Vincent Dileva, Justin Drury, Joseph Fonteno, Erik Frame, Catherine Garcia, Salvador Garcia, Daryn Glenn, Michael J. Green, Daniel Haley, Latoya Harris, Ryan Harrison, Wesley Hatfield, Frank Hernandez, Todd Heywood, Edward Jackson, W. Corey King, Patrick Knox, Richard A. Kochheim, Andrew Lewis, Brian Long, Brett Manis, Robert S. Martin, Michael Martinez, Timothy McFarland, Jonathan D. Naylor, Blake Nimmons, Aaron Plugge, Charles T. Prestia, Bryan Ridenour, Victor Salazar, Jason Sapien, Fabian Saucedo, Michael Snakenborg, Christopher Sosenko, Stephen M. Sprengel, Joshua Spry, Terrence Stevens, Michael Strosnider, Keith Turner, William J. Turner, Lou Velez, Brian Weiss, Wayne Windman, Jenna Wolfinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Additional Plaintiffs)(McGill, Michael)
December 19, 2017 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying None other than the plaintiffs. (McGill, Michael)
December 19, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-20995471 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Andrew Lewis, Richard A. Kochheim, Daryn Glenn, Robert Carlborg, Wesley Hatfield, Joseph Fonteno, Matthew Alston, David Arnold, Erik Frame, W. Corey King, Justin Drury, Victor Salazar, Lou Velez, Frank Hernandez, Ryan Harrison, Todd Heywood, Wayne Windman, Blake Nimmons, Catherine Garcia, Michael A. Diehr, Stephen M. Sprengel, Latoya Harris, Yesenia Contreras, Patrick Knox, Brett Manis, Ryan Crespin, William J. Turner, Christopher Sosenko, Charles T. Prestia, Michael J. Green, Fabian Saucedo, Delvin Delery, Daniel Haley, Edward Jackson, Christopher Bushman, Joshua Spry, Jonathan D. Naylor, Robert S. Martin, John J. Anderson, Terrence Stevens, David M. Christian, Jenna Wolfinger, Aaron Plugge, Clinton Daniel, Michael Snakenborg, Vincent Dileva, Michael Strosnider, Timothy McFarland, Mark Chafe, John Banach, Brian Long, Brian Weiss, Jason Sapien, Michael Martinez, Bryan Ridenour, Salvador Garcia, Keith Turner, John Bruce. (Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Matthew Alston(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party John J. Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party David Arnold(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party John Banach(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party John Bruce(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Christopher Bushman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Robert Carlborg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Mark Chafe(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party David M. Christian(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Yesenia Contreras(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Ryan Crespin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Clinton Daniel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Delvin Delery(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Michael A. Diehr(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Vincent Dileva(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Justin Drury(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Joseph Fonteno(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Erik Frame(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Catherine Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Salvador Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Daryn Glenn(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Michael J. Green(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Daniel Haley(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Latoya Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Ryan Harrison(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Wesley Hatfield(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Frank Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Todd Heywood(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Edward Jackson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party W. Corey King(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Patrick Knox(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Richard A. Kochheim(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Andrew Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Brian Long(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Brett Manis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Robert S. Martin(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Michael Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Timothy McFarland(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Jonathan D. Naylor(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Blake Nimmons(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Aaron Plugge(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Charles T. Prestia(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Bryan Ridenour(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Victor Salazar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Jason Sapien(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Fabian Saucedo(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Michael Snakenborg(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Christopher Sosenko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Stephen M. Sprengel(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Joshua Spry(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Terrence Stevens(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Michael Strosnider(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Keith Turner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party William J. Turner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Lou Velez(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Brian Weiss(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Wayne Windman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael A McGill added to party Jenna Wolfinger(pty:pla))(McGill, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Arnold, et al v. City of Redondo Beach, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Fonteno
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Martinez
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Garcia
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Harrison
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Weiss
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Salazar
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bruce
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Alston
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Christian
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles T. Prestia
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Turner
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Manis
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Daniel
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Harris
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Heywood
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fabian Saucedo
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Crespin
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan D. Naylor
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Stevens
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Spry
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy McFarland
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Long
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Turner
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Plugge
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Carlborg
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Hernandez
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Knox
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Arnold
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Windman
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. Corey King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Anderson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Velez
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Jackson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Snakenborg
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Bushman
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen M. Sprengel
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salvador Garcia
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Chafe
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryn Glenn
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Frame
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Sapien
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Martin
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Sosenko
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Lewis
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delvin Delery
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Banach
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Ridenour
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Dileva
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Strosnider, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Green
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Hatfield
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Nimmons
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Diehr
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Drury
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna Wolfinger
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard A. Kochheim
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yesenia Contreras
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Haley
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Strosnider
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey W. King
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Meissen
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Day
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Redondo Beach
Represented By: Philip A Toomey
Represented By: Eric J. Wu
Represented By: Eric J Wu
Represented By: Fadi K Rasheed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Shell Conatser
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Vincent J. Dipane
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Steven Hong
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brad Boster
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael Henry Hernandez
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jonathan Reyes
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Joel Dodier
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Melissa De Paoli
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robert L. Herrera
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Michael Manente
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tyler Hoff
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Morgan Lee Peterson
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Andrew Yamamoto
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jasen Brown
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Patrick Wagoner
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Cabeza de Vaca
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jason Johnson
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Gary Treskes
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ryan Stout
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jake Steelman
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brian Regan
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Steve Fernandez
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Andrei Alexandrescu
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Gregory Allen
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Joseph Boehm
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Poirier
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Grant Currie
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dustin Conard
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Eric Paulson
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: John Velasquez Jr.
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Norm Shultz
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Tim Dennis
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Bart Waddell
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brandon Lackey
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Matthew Taras
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Chad E. Smith
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kyle ODell
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Gary Dailey
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jeremy Sisante
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Arnuld Menjivar
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Matthew Bandy
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Chad Michael Smith
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Jason May
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kenneth Campos
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Chris Lubba
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Ben Bellante
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dave Smith
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Brad Sweatt
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: David Buckner
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Keving Coffelt
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Duane Vroom
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Darren Mallabon
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Donovan Hall
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Curt Andrew Mahoney
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated 3rd party defendant: Ryan Hunt
Represented By: Robert Louis Baumann
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Represented By: Samantha M Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?