Christina Harper v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al

Plaintiff: Christina Harper
Defendant: Silverado Senior Living Holdings, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2018cv00238
Filed: January 10, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: John A Kronstadt
1 Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 27 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO DISMISS CASE WITH PREJUDICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case #26 . Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, it is hereby Ordered that the Stipulation is GRANTED. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its and her own fees and costs, (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bp)
October 3, 2018 26 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a) filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blohm, Nicole)
August 6, 2018 25 NOTICE re Selection of Private Mediator filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Nunneri, Tatiana)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 24 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than October 22, 2018. Status Conference set for November 5, 2018 at 1:30 pm before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ake)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 23 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO PRIVATE MEDIATION AND SETTING DATES RE SETTLEMENT by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has reviewed the Joint Report Regarding the Status of Settlement Discussions. Dkt. #22 . The request to participate in private mediation is Granted. Counsel shall confer and file a notice by August 8, 2018, regarding the agreed-upon mediator. If the parties are not able to agree, the notice shall include three nominees from each party. A resume and hourly rate for each nominee shall be attached to the notice. The Court will select one of the proposed nominees. A Post-Mediation Status Conference is set for November 5, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. Mediation is to be completed no later than October 22, 2018. If a settlement is reached, the parties are ordered to file a notice of settlement, with a proposed date by which the matter will be dismissed. No appearance will be required on November 5, 2018, if such notice is filed on or before October 26, 2018. If a notice of settlement is not filed, counsel shall file a joint report by October 26, 2018, regarding the status of settlement and whether a second session would be productive. The joint report shall not disclose the substantive contents of any settlement communications between the parties. The Court will determine if the November 5 hearing is necessary upon review of the report.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 6, 2018 22 JOINT REPORT of Regarding Status of Settlement Discussions filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (Nunneri, Tatiana)
May 14, 2018 21 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge John A. Kronstadt. The scheduling conference is held. The Court confers with counsel regarding the status of the case. The Court has reviewed the parties' May 4, 2018 Joint Report and sets the following. Deadline to file simultaneous opening breifs, 10/29/18. Deadline to file simultaneous briefs, 11/19/18. Court Trial set for 12/18/2018 09:00 AM. Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (bp)
May 4, 2018 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alan E Kassan counsel for Plaintiff Christina Harper. Alan E. Kassan is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Christina Harper. (Kassan, Alan)
May 4, 2018 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mitchell O Hefter counsel for Plaintiff Christina Harper. Adding Mitchell O. Hefter as counsel of record for Christina Harper for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Christina Harper. (Attorney Mitchell O Hefter added to party Christina Harper(pty:pla))(Hefter, Mitchell)
May 4, 2018 18 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1/2 Day, filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Nunneri, Tatiana)
April 11, 2018 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Andrew Michael Kantor counsel for Plaintiff Christina Harper. Andrew M. Kantor is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Christina Harper. (Kantor, Andrew)
April 11, 2018 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Corinne Chandler counsel for Plaintiff Christina Harper. Adding Corinne Chandler as counsel of record for Plaintiff Christina Harper for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Christina Harper. (Attorney Corinne Chandler added to party Christina Harper(pty:pla))(Chandler, Corinne)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Scheduling Conference is set for May 14, 2018 at 1:30 pm, before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (yl)
March 14, 2018 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America, identifying Christina Harper; Silverado Senior Living Holdings, Inc.; Life Insurance Company of North America ("LINA"); Connecticut General Corporation; Cigna Holdings, Inc.; and Cigna Corporation. (Attorney Tatiana Semerjian Nunneri added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Nunneri, Tatiana)
March 14, 2018 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Nicole Y Blohm added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Blohm, Nicole)
February 8, 2018 12 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Christina Harper pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) [Without Prejudice] as to Silverado Senior Living Holdings, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan. (Kantor, Andrew)
January 30, 2018 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 3/14/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Sevana Babooian added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Babooian, Sevana)
January 29, 2018 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christina Harper, upon Defendant Silverado Senior Living Holdings, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan served on 1/23/2018, answer due 2/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Melissa Solomon, Director Risk Management in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kantor, Andrew)
January 29, 2018 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Christina Harper, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 1/22/2018, answer due 2/12/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Process Specialist in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kantor, Andrew)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso)
January 10, 2018 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Life Insurance Company of North America, Silverado Senior Living Holdings, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan. (esa)
January 10, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
January 10, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa)
January 10, 2018 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christina Harper, (Kantor, Andrew)
January 10, 2018 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Christina Harper. (Kantor, Andrew)
January 10, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Christina Harper. (Kantor, Andrew)
January 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21080412 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Christina Harper. (Attorney Andrew Michael Kantor added to party Christina Harper(pty:pla))(Kantor, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christina Harper v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverado Senior Living Holdings, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Nicole Y Blohm
Represented By: Tatiana Semerjian Nunneri
Represented By: Sevana Babooian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Harper
Represented By: Glenn R Kantor
Represented By: Andrew Michael Kantor
Represented By: Alan E Kassan
Represented By: Mitchell O Hefter
Represented By: Corinne Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?