Ramtin Massoudi MD Inc v. Alex Azar, et al

Plaintiff: Ramtin Massoudi MD Inc
Defendant: Alex Azar and Seema Verma
Case Number: 2:2018cv01087
Filed: February 8, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
Referring Judge: Jean P. Rosenbluth
Presiding Judge: Christina A. Snyder
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2018 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Christina A. Snyder: RE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 28 . The Court GRANTS plaintiffs request for leave to amend its complaint. Plaintiff may file the proposed first amended complaint identified in Exhibit 1 on or before April 30, 2018. (lc). Modified on 4/24/2018. (lc).
April 23, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Christina A. Snyder: RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION SHOULD NOT ISSUE (Dkt. 21). The Court DISMISSES without prejudice plaintiffs complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (lc). Modified .on 4/24/2018 (lc).
February 12, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) - PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The Court HEREBY ORDERS the following: (1) Plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order 6 is DENIED. (2) Plaintiff shall file proof of service of process in connection with the complaint pursuant to Rule 4(i)(1) no later than 2/16/2018. (3) The Court sets a hearing on an order to show cause why preliminary injunction should not issue for 3/12/2018 at 10:00 AM, and directs defendants to show cause why they should not be enjoined from withholding, recouping, or otherwise failing to pay Ramtin Massoudi MD Inc. its future Medicare receivables pending the outcome of an administrative hearing before an Administrative Law Judge. (4) Defendants are directed to file an opposition on or before 2/26/2018, and plaintiff shall file a reply on or before 3/5/2018. Court Reporter: Not Present. (gk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramtin Massoudi MD Inc v. Alex Azar, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: Timothy Daniel Biche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seema Verma
Represented By: Timothy Daniel Biche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramtin Massoudi MD Inc
Represented By: Henry Robert Fenton
Represented By: Nicholas D Jurkowitz
Represented By: Dennis E Lee
Represented By: Alexandra de Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?