Stephen Chucri v. Kleinberg and Lerner, LLP et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Chucri
Defendant: Marvin Kleinberg, Kleinberg & Lerner, LLP, John Roselli, III, Kleinberg and Lerner, LLP and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv03082
Filed: April 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2018 Filing 10 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Specifically, Plaintiff was directed to inform the Court in writing by April 24, 2018, if he objected to the remand. To date, despite the passage of the deadline set by the Court, Plaintiff has not waived the procedural defect. Accordingly, for the reasons stated in the April 17, 2018 order, this action is remanded to the Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. BC698396. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (mrgo)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. Because Moving Defendants are California citizens, the Notice of Removal is procedurally defective under the "local defendant" limitation on removals. See 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2). As a result of the procedurally defective Notice of Removal, this action is remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case No. BC698396. See 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). The Court stays this order until April 24, 2018. If Plaintiff wishes to remain in federal court and thereby waive the procedural defect discussed above, Plaintiff shall notify the Court in writing on or before April 24, 2018. If Plaintiff does not file such a Notice, the Court will conclude that he has not waived the procedural defect, and the Court will remand this action to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo)
April 16, 2018 Filing 7 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)]; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE [FRCP 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. Scheduling Conference set for May 21, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. (lom)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
April 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
April 12, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Stephen Chucri in Los Angeles Superior Court on 3/16/2018; attached as Exhibit 2. (jtil)
April 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Marvin Kleinberg, Kleinberg & Lerner, LLP, (Michel, Allen)
April 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Marvin Kleinberg, Kleinberg & Lerner, LLP. (Michel, Allen)
April 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California-County of Los Angeles, case number BC698396 Receipt No: 0973-21579759 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants Marvin Kleinberg, Kleinberg & Lerner, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Allen L. Michel in Support of Removal of State Court Action, #2 Declaration Declaration of Marvin Kleinberg in Support of Removal of State Court) (Attorney Allen L Michel added to party Marvin Kleinberg(pty:dft), Attorney Allen L Michel added to party Kleinberg & Lerner, LLP(pty:dft))(Michel, Allen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephen Chucri v. Kleinberg and Lerner, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Chucri
Represented By: John Mark Pierce
Represented By: Carolynn Kyungwon Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Kleinberg
Represented By: Allen L Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kleinberg & Lerner, LLP
Represented By: Allen L Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roselli, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kleinberg and Lerner, LLP
Represented By: Allen L Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?