Michael A Wilborn v. Jodi Anne Darling
Plaintiff: Michael A. Wilborn
Defendant: Jodi Anne Darling
Case Number: 2:2018cv03433
Filed: April 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Manuel L Real
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Manuel L. Real. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 5/30/2019. See Order for details. (cch)
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 Mail Returned addressed to Michael A. Wilborn re Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) #7 . (gk)
July 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: Request for Entry of Default against Defendant Jodi Anne Darling #6 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: No proof of service/waiver of service on file. Requesting party shall file a new Request/Application with noted deficiencies corrected in order to have default reconsidered. (gk)
July 3, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST for Entry of Default against Defendant Jodi Anne Darling filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Wilborn. (gk)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
April 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jp)
April 24, 2018 Filing 3 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 as to Defendant Jodi Anne Darling. (jp)
April 24, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Wilborn. (jp)
April 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant Jodi Anne Darling. Case assigned to Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.) Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Michael A. Wilborn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (jp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael A Wilborn v. Jodi Anne Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Anne Darling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Wilborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?