Ronald Chakkow Chan v. UBS AG et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Chakkow Chan
Defendant: KELLY HO, UBS AG and UBS AG of Zurich
Case Number: 2:2018cv04211
Filed: May 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
2 Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2022 Filing 86 JUDGMENT by Judge John A. Kronstadt (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that, because there is no personal jurisdiction over Defendants UBS AG and KELLY HO as set forth in the UBS Dismissal Order and the HO Dismissal Order, Judgment shall be entered for Defendants UBS AG and KELLY HO and against Plaintiff RONALD CHAKKOW CHAN; provided, however, this judgment is entered without prejudice to the Plaintiff commencing a new action in a different court where the Plaintiff contends there is personal jurisdiction. Upon entry, this Judgment shall be stayed for 21 days to permit Plaintiff to file an action in a different forum while this action remains pending. It Is So Ordered. (case terminated) (yl)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 (IN CHAMBERS) TEXT-ONLY ORDER CALLING FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE ANY OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT'S PROPOSED JUDGMENT (Dkt. #84 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Pursuant to the Order Re Defendant Kelly Ho's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Dkt. #66 ), Plaintiff was required to file any objections to Defendant's Proposed Judgment within seven days after it was lodged. Dkt. #83 . Defendant lodged the Proposed Judgment on August 8, 2022. Dkt. #84 . No objections have been filed. However, Plaintiff will be afforded a final opportunity to file any objections. Any objections to the form or substance of the proposed judgment shall be filed by August 23, 2022. A failure to do so will be deemed consent to the proposed form of judgment that has been lodged. Based on a review of the proposed form of judgment and any objections that are timely filed, a determination will be made as to the version of the judgment that will be entered. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (maco) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 8, 2022 Filing 84 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Judgment re Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,, #83 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment, #2 Declaration of Dan Marmalefsky, #3 Exhibit A)(Marmalefsky, Dan)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DEFENDANT KELLY HO'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (DKT. #66 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. For the foregoing reasons, the Motion is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to the absence of personal jurisdiction over Defendant. Within 10 days of the issuance of this Order, after meeting and conferring with Plaintiffs counsel to seek to reach an agreement as to the form of a judgment, Defendant shall lodge a proposed judgment that is consistent with this Order. If Plaintiff agrees to the form of the judgment, that shall be confirmed by the signature of his counsel on the judgment. If Plaintiff does not agree with the form of the judgment, any objections shall be filed within seven days after the proposed judgment is lodged, and shall conform to the Local Rules. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
March 1, 2022 Filing 82 Joint Request for Decision on Pending Motion Pursuant to Local Rule 83-9.2 filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan re: Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 73 (Reif, Brandon)
September 2, 2021 Filing 81 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/10/18 re Transcript #80 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jlo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 2, 2021 Filing 80 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/10/18. Court Reporter: Alex Joko, email aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/23/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/4/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2021. (jlo)
August 26, 2021 Filing 79 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan for Court Reporter. Court will contact Mariana Lui o/b/o Ohia A. Amadi at mlui@reiflawgroup.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Reif, Brandon)
August 26, 2021 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan for Court Reporter. Court will contact Mariana Lui o/b/o Ohia A. Amadi at mlui@reiflawgroup.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Reif, Brandon)
March 29, 2021 Filing 77 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #75 . The following error(s) was/were found: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123 not signed or dated. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
March 26, 2021 Filing 76 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Neal S Robb counsel for Defendant UBS AG. Adding Neal S. Robb as counsel of record for Defendant for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. KRISTY H. SAMBOR is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Neal S. Robb. (Robb, Neal)
March 25, 2021 Filing 75 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Neal S Robb counsel for Defendant UBS AG. Adding Neal S. Robb as counsel of record for UBS AG for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. KRISTY H. SAMBOR is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant UBS AG. (Robb, Neal)
July 16, 2020 Filing 74 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dan E Marmalefsky counsel for Defendant Kelly Ho. Jane P. Bentrott is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kelly Ho. (Marmalefsky, Dan)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING DEFENDANT KELLY HO'S SPECIAL APPEARANCE AND MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (DKT. #66 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge John A Kronstadt: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motion, noticed for hearing on March 16, 2020, has been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. The Scheduling Conference set for March 16, 2020 is also taken under submission. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cw) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 4, 2020 Filing 72 Joint STIPULATION for Order to Postpone Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Kelly Ho. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marmalefsky, Dan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 71 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #66 filed by Defendant Kelly Ho. (Marmalefsky, Dan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 70 DECLARATION of RONALD CHAKKOW CHAN IN OPPOSITION NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #66 filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Reif, Brandon)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO FILE MISSING PAGE IN DECLARATION OF RONALD CHAKKOW CHAN (DKT. 68-1) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Declaration of Ronald Chakkow Chan (Dkt. 68-1) filed by Plaintiff, appears to be missing its sixth page, which would include parts of Paragraphs 19 and 20. Plaintiff's counsel shall file a corrected version of the declaration on or before February 21, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (yh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 12, 2020 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #66 , Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #66 #67 filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT HOS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION)(Reif, Brandon)
January 15, 2020 Filing 67 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #66 filed by Defendant Kelly Ho. Motion set for hearing on 3/16/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Marmalefsky, Dan)
January 15, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Kelly Ho. Motion set for hearing on 3/16/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Kelly Ho (Second), #3 Proposed Order) (Marmalefsky, Dan)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Re Joint Stipulation Pursuant to Court Order (Dkt. #63 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is GRANTED as follows: (1) The default previously entered by the Clerk (Dkt. #26 ) as to Defendant Kelly Ho; is VACATED, and the Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default (Dkt. #50 ) is GRANTED. (2) The Application for Default Judgment (Dkt. #51 ) is MOOT. (3) Defendant will appear voluntarily and waive challenges to service of process; (4) Defendant shall file his motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) on or before 1/15/2020. (5) Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan shall file any opposition to that motion on or before 2/1/2019. (6) Defendant may file a reply in support of the motion on or before 2/26/2020; The hearing on the motion is scheduled for 3/16/2020 at 8:30 AM. (jp)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Counsel shall file a Joint Report consistent with this Order. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/6/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ake)
November 25, 2019 Filing 63 STIPULATION for Order Granting Joint Stipulation Pursuant to Court Order filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Kelly Ho. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marmalefsky, Dan)
November 18, 2019 Filing 62 SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT KELLY HO'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE THE CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT (DKT. #50 ) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT KELLY HO (DKT. #51 ) before Judge John A. Kronstadt: The motion hearing is held. The Court DEFERS a final ruling on the Plaintiff's Motion and Defendant's Motion until it is determined whether the parties have reached agreement on a stipulation and proposed order. Court Reporter: Lisa Gonzalez. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #53 filed by Ronald Chakkow Chan. CCA # 19-56034. Pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute. Counsel for appellant is directed to notify his/her client immediately in writing regarding this dismissal. This order served on the district court shall, 21 days after the date of the order, act as the mandate of this court. (mat)
October 22, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Transcript Order Form (G-120), #59 . The following error(s) was found: FILED INCORRECT FORM PLEASE USE TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM G-120 (GENERAL FORMS) You must electronically refile the above referenced Request for Transcript in this case to correct this deficiency. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 22, 2019 Filing 59 TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Court of Appeals case number 19-56034, as to Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan for Court Reporter. Court will contact Cian Williams at docket@reiflawgroup.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Reif, Brandon)
September 19, 2019 Filing 58 REPLY In APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Kelly Ho #51 filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ohia A. Amadi In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Amadi, Ohia)
September 19, 2019 Filing 57 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #26 . #50 filed by Defendant Kelly Ho. (Marmalefsky, Dan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 55 OPPOSITION to APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Kelly Ho #51 filed by Defendant Kelly Ho. (Marmalefsky, Dan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 54 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #26 . #50 filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Buchwalter, #2 Declaration Declaration of Lowe)(Reif, Brandon)
September 3, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. Appeal of Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,, #49 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24372451.) (Amadi, Ohia)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT KELLY HO (DKT. #51 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: Plaintiff filed the Application, which is not set for hearing. The Application is set for hearing on November 18, 2019 at 8:30 a.m., to be heard with the Defendant's Motion to Set Aside the Clerk's Default. Dkt. #50 . Any response to the Motion and Application shall be filed by September 5, 2019, with the reply to be filed no later than September 19, 2019. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 20, 2019 Filing 51 APPLICATION for Default Judgment against Defendant Kelly Ho filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ohia A. Amadi In Support, #2 Exhibit to Amadi Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Amadi, Ohia)
August 15, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Set Aside Default Re: Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form #26 . filed by Specially Appearing Defendant Kelly Ho. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points And Authorities ISO Motion to Set Aside the Clerk's Entry of Default, #2 Declaration of Kelly Ho, #3 Declaration of Dan Marmalefsky, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Proposed Order Granting Specially Appearing Defendant Kelly Ho's Motion to Set Aside the Clerk's Entry of Default) (Attorney Dan E Marmalefsky added to party Kelly Ho(pty:dft)) (Marmalefsky, Dan)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DEFENDANT USB AG'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION (DKT. #17 ); PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE UBS AG'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AND OTHER APPROPRIATE SANCTIONS AGAINST UBS AG (DKT. #31 ) JS-6: Case terminated as to UBS AG and UBS AG of Zurich only by Judge John A. Kronstadt: For the reasons stated in this Order, the Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and the Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. If Plaintiff intends to pursue default judgment against Ho, such motion shall be filed on or before 8/20/2019. If Plaintiff does not so intend, a dismissal shall be filed by that same date. (jp)
July 3, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Change of address by Brandon Scott Reif attorney for Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. Changing attorneys address to 1925 Century Park East | Suite 1700 | Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Reif, Brandon)
April 9, 2019 Filing 47 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 Supplemental Brief filed by Defendant UBS AG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristy H. Sambor in support of Supplemental Brief in support of Motion to Dismiss)(Sambor, Kristy)
April 2, 2019 Filing 46 SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 11 as to Defendants UBS AG #31 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ohia A. Amadi In Support, #2 Exhibit to Amadi Decl.)(Amadi, Ohia)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE NOTICE OF AMENDED STANDING ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Counsel are advised that on March 25, 2019, the Court amended its Consolidated Standing Order. Counsel shall refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court (http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-john-kronstadt) to obtain a copy of the Order. The March 25, 2019 version of the Consolidated Standing Order is effective in this action immediately. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT KELLY HO (DKT. #33 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The hearing on the motion for default judgment, currently set for April 8, 2019, is VACATED. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RE SECOND JOINT REPORT AND STIPULATION RE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY (DKT. #42 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt, the Stipulation is APPROVED. Pursuant to this Court's 1/4/2019 order regarding jurisdictional discovery, Plaintiff Ronald C. Chan's supplemental brief re personal jurisdiction shall be filed no later than 4/2/2019, and Defendant UBS AGs response shall be filed no later than 4/9/2019. Neither brief shall exceed five pages in length, excluding exhibits. (jp)
March 18, 2019 Filing 42 STIPULATION for Discovery as to Jurisdictional filed by Defendant UBS AG. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Stipulation re Jurisdictional Discovery and Second Joint Report)(Sambor, Kristy)
March 7, 2019 Filing 41 STIPULATION for Discovery as to (Jurisdictional Discovery) filed by Defendant UBS AG.(Sambor, Kristy)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY by Judge John A. Kronstadt:(SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
December 24, 2018 Filing 39 JOINT REPORT of of Parties re Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Amadi, Ohia)
December 10, 2018 Filing 38 MINUTES OF Defendant USB AG's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (DKT. #17 ); Plaintiff's Motion to Strike USB AG'S Motion to Dismiss and for Attorneys Fees and Costs and other Appropriate Sanctions against USB AG (DKT. #31 ) before Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court DEFERS ruling on the Defendant's Motion and the Plaintiff's Motion. Counsel shall meet and confer concerning Plaintiff's request for jurisdictional discovery and file a joint report on or before 12/24/2018. The Scheduling Conference is not held. The Court will determine whether to reschedule the conference, if necessary, upon the final issuance of an Order on the Defendant's Motion and the Plaintiff's Motion. Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (jp)
November 30, 2018 Filing 37 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant UBS AG.. (Sambor, Kristy)
November 6, 2018 Filing 36 REPLY IN SUPPORT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 11 as to Defendants UBS AG #31 (Signed) filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Amadi, Ohia)
November 6, 2018 Filing 35 REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE UBS AGS MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND OTHER APPROPRIATE SANCTIONS AGAINST UBS AG PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. RULE 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 11 as to Defendants UBS AG #31 filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Attachments: #1 Reply in support of Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Ohia Amadi in support of Reply to Plaintiff's Rule 11 Motion, #3 Exhibit to O. Amadi Decl.)(Amadi, Ohia)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Re APPLICATION to Continuing Default Judgment Motion Deadline re Kelly HO #33 by Judge John A. Kronstadt that the Application is GRANTED as follows: (1) The deadline for Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan to file and serve a motion for entry of default judgement against Defendant Kelly Ho is continued from 11/5/2018 to 3/4/2019 and (2) The hearing on the default judgment hearing currently scheduled for 12/10/2018 is continued to 4/8/2019 at 08:30 AM. (jp)
November 1, 2018 Filing 33 APPLICATION to Continue Default Judgment Motion Deadline re Kelly Ho from November 5, 2018 to 4 months or as soon thereafter as the Court deems proper filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. Application set for hearing on 11/2/2018 at 12:00 PM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steve A. Buchwalter, #2 Proposed Order Continuing Default Judgment Motion Deadline) (Amadi, Ohia)
October 30, 2018 Filing 32 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 11 as to Defendants UBS AG #31 filed by Defendant UBS AG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristy H. Sambor in Support of UBS AG's Opposition, #2 Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice)(Sambor, Kristy)
October 16, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 11 as to Defendants UBS AG filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. Motion set for hearing on 12/10/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amadi ISO Mtn Rule 11, #2 Declaration Re Chan ISO Mtn Rule 11, #3 Supplement Re Request for Judicial Ntc ISO Mtn Rule 11) (Amadi, Ohia)
October 4, 2018 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO UBS AGS MOTION TO DISMISS) filed by Defendant UBS AG. (Sambor, Kristy)
October 4, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 filed by Defendant UBS AG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Connors in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Kristy Sambor in Support of Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Sambor, Kristy)
September 20, 2018 Filing 28 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #17 filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ronald C. Chan, #2 Exhibit to Chan Declaration, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Declaration of Ohia A. Amadi)(Amadi, Ohia)
September 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT RE DEFENDANT KELLY HO (DKT. #26 ) by Judge John A Kronstadt: On September 5, 2018, default was entered against Defendant, Kelly Ho. Dkt. 26. The Court sets the hearing on the motion for default judgment for December 10, 2018 at 8:30 am, which shall be served on Defendant and filed with the Court no later than November 5, 2018. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 5, 2018 Filing 26 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Kelly Ho (bp)
August 31, 2018 Filing 25 REQUEST for Entry of Default against Defendant Kelly Ho filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. Request set for hearing on 9/4/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amadi ISO Request for Entry of Default) (Reif, Brandon)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AS TO DEFENDANT KELLY HO (DKT. 22 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court issued an Order to Show Cause for Lack of Prosecution on August 20, 2018 (Dkt. 22 ) (the "OSC"). Plaintiff was directed to file a proof of service by August 24, 2018, using the Court's Form CV-001, showing that Defendant Kelly Ho was served with the Complaint and initiating documents. Plaintiff filed a Proof of Service on August 21, 2018 and failed to use the Court's form. The Court will accept the Proof of Service as filed. However, because the Proof of Service states that Defendant was served with the Complaint and initiating documents on June 19, 2018 and June 20, 2018. Dkt. #23 . Because the date has past by which Defendant was to timely respond to the Complaint, the Court CONTINUES the OSC to September 4, 2018. Pursuant to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff shall file an application requesting the entry of default. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider the filing of an application, which complies with the federal rules, on or before the date upon which the response is due, as a satisfactory response to the OSC. The OSC will stand submitted upon the filing of an appropriate response. No oral argument will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Failure to respond will result in the dismissal of this matter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 21, 2018 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan, re Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 22 Summons, Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint served on 06/19/2018. (Reif, Brandon)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION RE DEFENDANT KELLY HO by Judge John A. Kronstadt: On July 18, 2018, Plaintiff filed a Declaration with respect to the service of the initiating documents on Defendant Kelly Hong. Dkt. #16 . A proof of service has not yet been filed. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall file a proof of service using the Court's CV-001 (POS-010) form no later than August 24, 2018. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of the proof of service. No oral argument will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider the filing of a responsive pleading to the complaint and/or proof of service, which indicates proper service in full compliance with the federal rules, on or before the date upon which the response is due, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 6, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant UBS AG's Motion to Dismiss and Defendant UBS AG's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (STIPULATION BY STANDING ORDER) filed by Defendant UBS AG.(Sambor, Kristy)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Joint Report due by 11/30/2018., Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 08:30 AM. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
July 30, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant UBS AG, (Robb, Neal)
July 30, 2018 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant UBS AG identifying UBS Group AG as Corporate Parent. (Robb, Neal)
July 30, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant UBS AG. Motion set for hearing on 12/10/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Declaration of Neal Robb, #3 Declaration of John Connors, #4 Declaration of Pierre Widmer) (Attorney Neal S Robb added to party UBS AG(pty:dft)) (Robb, Neal)
July 18, 2018 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Ohia A. Amadi Re Service of Defendant Kelly Ho filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Reif, Brandon)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT, granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #14 , Defendant UBS AG of Zurich answer due 7/30/2018 by Judge John A. Kronstadt (bp)
July 6, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to July 30, 2018 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UBS AG of Zurich. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sambor, Kristy)
June 15, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UBS AG of Zurich answer now due 7/16/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant UBS AG of Zurich.(Attorney Kristy Hewitt Sambor added to party UBS AG of Zurich(pty:dft))(Sambor, Kristy)
June 15, 2018 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan, on Defendant UBS AG served on 05/25/2018. (Reif, Brandon)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2;18-cv-04211 JAK(FFMx). (rn)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (lom)
May 21, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant UBS AG. (jp)
May 21, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kelly Ho. (jp)
May 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jp)
May 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jp)
May 18, 2018 Filing 5 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan, identifying Ronald Chakkow Chan, Plaintiff; UBS AG, Defendant; and Kelly Ho, Defendant. (Reif, Brandon)
May 18, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Reif, Brandon)
May 18, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Reif, Brandon)
May 18, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Reif, Brandon)
May 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21778972 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Ronald Chakkow Chan. (Attorney Brandon Scott Reif added to party Ronald Chakkow Chan(pty:pla))(Reif, Brandon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronald Chakkow Chan v. UBS AG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Chakkow Chan
Represented By: Brandon Scott Reif
Represented By: Steve A Buchwalter
Represented By: Ohia A Amadi
Represented By: Marc S Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KELLY HO
Represented By: Dan E Marmalefsky
Represented By: Dan E. Marmalefsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG
Represented By: Neal S Robb
Represented By: Kristy Hewitt Sambor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG of Zurich
Represented By: Kristy Hewitt Sambor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?