Carmen John Perri v. Burger King No. 12201 et al
Plaintiff: Carmen John Perri
Defendant: EL SEGUNDO PLAZA ASSOCIATES, L.P., a California limited partnership, DOES 1-10, BURGER KING #12201, a business of unknown form, El Segundo Plaza Associates, L.P. and Burger King No. 12201
Case Number: 2:2018cv04644
Filed: May 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Manning, Joseph)
August 23, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Manning, Joseph)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: The file in this case lacks the papers that would show it is being timely prosecuted, as reflected below. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby orders plaintiff /s to show cause in writing no later than August 24, 2018, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution and sanctions imposed on counsel. (See minutes for further details) (yl)
June 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Other error(s) with document(s): The case number is missing the judge initials. The correct case number is 2:18cv04644-RSWL (PLAx). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
June 26, 2018 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri, upon Defendant Burger King No. 12201 served on 6/12/2018, answer due 7/3/2018. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
June 26, 2018 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to El Segundo Plaza Associates, L.P. answer now due 7/23/2018, filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Manning, Joseph)
May 30, 2018 Filing 10 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. See notice for further details including service instructions and deadlines for either party. (jre)
May 29, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Burger King No. 12201. (ghap)
May 29, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant El Segundo Plaza Associates, L.P. (ghap)
May 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (ghap)
May 25, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. (Manning, Joseph)
May 25, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. (Manning, Joseph)
May 25, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri, (Manning, Joseph)
May 25, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. (Manning, Joseph)
May 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21823271 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party Carmen John Perri(pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmen John Perri v. Burger King No. 12201 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EL SEGUNDO PLAZA ASSOCIATES, L.P., a California limited partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURGER KING #12201, a business of unknown form
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Segundo Plaza Associates, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burger King No. 12201
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen John Perri
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Represented By: Michael John Manning
Represented By: Craig G Cote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?