Blue Cross of California et al v. Sonoma West Medical Center, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Community Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans Inc, Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, BCBSM, Inc. doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Community Insurance Company doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthem Health Plans Inc doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc. doing business as Empire Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Colorado, Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, HMO HealthKeepers, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield and Blue Cross of California doing business as Anthem Blue Cross
Defendant: DL Investment Holdings LLC, Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc., Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Sonoma West Medical Center, Inc., Neisha Carter Zaffuto, Aaron Durall and Durall Capital Holdings, LLC
Counter Defendant: Anthem Health Plans, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Inc., John Doe(s) 1-10, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield, Blue Cross of California, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross of California, Anthem Health Plans, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield and Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Material Witness: Taaj Jenkins and Willow Tree, LLC
Counter Claimant: Neisha Carter Zuffuto
Case Number: 2:2018cv04912
Filed: June 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: S James Otero
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION AND REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE #253 by Judge S. James Otero(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc)
April 11, 2019 Filing 256 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Settling Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc., Neisha Carter Zuffuto, re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration, #255 served on April 11, 2019. (Shifrin, Dmitry)
April 11, 2019 Filing 255 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF Joint APPLICATION to file document Confidential Settlement Agreement under seal #254 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc., Counter Claimants DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc., Neisha Carter Zuffuto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shifrin, Dmitry)
April 11, 2019 Filing 254 Joint APPLICATION to file document Confidential Settlement Agreement under seal filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc., Counter Claimants DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc., Neisha Carter Zuffuto. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shifrin, Dmitry)
April 10, 2019 Filing 253 Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bornstein, William)
April 5, 2019 Filing 252 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. The Court finds the following motion is suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing on the MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims #229 ., set for hearing on April 15, 2019. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, re Joint Stipulation re Discovery Motion #250 . Defendants are granted until April 10, 2019 to file their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Terminating and Other Sanctions for Defendants' Violation of the Court's Discovery Orders. Plaintiffs are granted until April 15, 2019 to file their Reply, if any, in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Terminating and Other Sanctions for Defendants' Violation of the Court's Discovery Orders. (ec)
April 4, 2019 Filing 250 JOINT STIPULATION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions for Defendants' Violation of the Court's Discovery Orders #237 , SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Terminating Sanctions for Defendants' Violation of the Court's Discovery Orders re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #242 #247 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc., Counter Claimants DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc., Neisha Carter Zuffuto. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Dmitry Shifrin added to party Neisha Carter Zaffuto(pty:dft))(Shifrin, Dmitry)
April 1, 2019 Filing 249 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims #229 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
March 28, 2019 Filing 248 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., re SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Terminating Sanctions for Defendants' Violation of the Court's Discovery Orders re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #242 #247 served on 3/27/2019. (Bornstein, William)
March 27, 2019 Filing 247 SEALED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Terminating Sanctions for Defendants' Violation of the Court's Discovery Orders re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #242 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E, #2 Exhibit F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit K, #8 Exhibit L)(Martinez, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 246 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Mohamad Ahmad, Yussuf Abdel-Aleem, John Wisiackas, Uriah Tagle to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
March 27, 2019 Filing 245 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Mohamad Ahmad, Yussuf Abdel-Aleem, John Wisiackas, Uriah Tagle to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/6/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION TO MODIFY THE PARTIES ADR SELECTION PROCEDURE UNDER L.R. 16-15 #243 by Judge S. James Otero. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Parties Joint Stipulation to Modify the Parties ADR Selection from ADR Procedure No. 1 to ADR Procedure No. 3 is GRANTED. (lom)
March 26, 2019 Filing 243 Joint STIPULATION to MODIFY Request for ADR Procedure No. 1 - (ADR-1),, #99 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE MOTION FOR TERMINATING AND OTHER SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANTS' VIOLATION OF THE COURT'S DISCOVERY ORDERS AND SUPPORTING MATERIALS UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: granting in part and denying in part #238 APPLICATION to Seal Document. (See document for details.) (sbou)
March 25, 2019 Filing 241 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims #229 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
March 25, 2019 Filing 240 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., Anthem Health Plans, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Blue Cross of California, Inc., Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,, #239 served on 03/22/2019. (Bornstein, William)
March 22, 2019 Filing 239 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Plaintiffs' Motion for Terminating Sanctions for Defendants' Violation of the Court's Discovery Orders under seal #238 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Plaintiffs' Motion for Terminating Sanctions for Defendants' Violation of the Court's Discovery Orders, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit I, #7 Exhibit J, #8 Exhibit K, #9 Exhibit L)(Martinez, David)
March 22, 2019 Filing 238 APPLICATION to file document Plaintiffs' Motion for Terminating Sanctions for Defendants' Violation of the Court's Discovery Orders under seal filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Plaintiffs' Motion for Terminating Sanctions for Defendants' Violation of the Court's Discovery Orders, #2 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
March 22, 2019 Filing 237 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions for Defendants' Violation of the Court's Discovery Orders filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chelsea Walker, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C (UNDER SEAL), #5 Exhibit D (UNDER SEAL), #6 Exhibit E (UNDER SEAL), #7 Exhibit F (UNDER SEAL), #8 Exhibit G (UNDER SEAL), #9 Exhibit H (UNDER SEAL), #10 Exhibit I (UNDER SEAL), #11 Exhibit J (UNDER SEAL), #12 Exhibit K (UNDER SEAL), #13 Exhibit L (UNDER SEAL), #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
March 21, 2019 Filing 236 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Levi G. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee #235 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
March 21, 2019 Filing 235 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Levi G. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23415739) filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
March 20, 2019 Filing 234 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: granting #230 Ex Parte Application. The briefing schedule for said motion is as follows: Plaintiff's opening brief is due Friday, March 22, 2019; Defendant's opposition is due Friday, April 5, 2019; Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due Wednesday, April 10, 2019, and may only address issues raised in the opposition. The parties are also required to submit Word versions of their briefs as well as proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law within 48 hours of filing their briefs (opening brief for Plaintiffs; opposition brief for Defendants). The motion will stand submitted as of April 10, 2019, unless the Court sets the motion for hearing. (ec)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: The Court refers the ex Parte Application to File a Motion for Terminating and Other Sanctions forDefendants' Violation of the Courts Discovery Orders #230 filed by Plaintiffs to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for a report and recommendation. REFERRED to Magistrate Gail J. Standish. (lc)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian F. McEvoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. and designating Mohamad S. Ahmad as local counsel #227 by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
March 14, 2019 Filing 231 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to FILE A MOTION FOR TERMINATING AND OTHER SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANTS' VIOLATION OF THE COURTS DISCOVERY ORDERS #230 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ahmad, Mohamad)
March 11, 2019 Filing 230 EX PARTE APPLICATION to FILE A MOTION FOR TERMINATING AND OTHER SANCTIONS FOR DEFENDANTS' VIOLATION OF THE COURTS DISCOVERY ORDERS filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chelsea A. Walcker, #2 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
March 8, 2019 Filing 229 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke A. Hasskamp in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims, #2 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO FILE MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS #226 by Judge S. James Otero: Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a motion to dismiss Defendants Amended Counterclaims on or before March 8, 2019. (lc)
February 28, 2019 Filing 227 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian F. McEvoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 2/19/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23234049) filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
February 26, 2019 Filing 226 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Amended Counterclaims filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
February 26, 2019 Filing 225 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. The Court finds the following motions suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing on the MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants DL Investment Holdings LLC, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. [ECF No. 158] and MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, Aaron Durall [ECF No. 159]., set for hearing on March 4, 2019. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 22, 2019 Filing 224 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian F. McEvoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - #204 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Application lists only 1 party and proposed order lists 5 parties. Application and Proposed Order are inconsistent. (lt)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting #194 Non-Resident Attorney Dmitry Shifrin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DL Investment Holdings LLC f/k/a Durall Capital Holdings, LLC; Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.;Medivance Billing Service, Inc.; Aaron Durall; and Neisha Carter Zaffuto, designating Mohamad Ahmad as local counsel. (lom)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: granting #193 Non-Resident Attorney David Di Pietro APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants DL Investment Holdings LLC f/k/a Durall Capital Holdings, LLC; Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.;Medivance Billing Service, Inc.; Aaron Durall; and Neisha Carter Zaffuto, designating Mohamad Ahmad as local counsel. (lom)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John S. Wisiackas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. and designating Mohamad S. Ahmad as local counsel #192 by Judge S. James Otero. (lc)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Chad C. Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. and designating Mohamad S. Ahmad as local counsel #191 by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
February 20, 2019 Filing 219 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: regarding #196 Ex Parte Application to Seal Document ; #198 Ex Parte Application to Seal Document ; #205 Ex Parte Application to Compel; #207 Ex Parte Application to Compel; #209 Ex Parte Application to Compel; #211 Ex Parte Application to Compel; #212 Ex Parte Application to Compel. The Court certainly does not condone the Defendants' and third parties' alleged lack of compliance with rules, procedures, and court orders. However, Plaintiffs have not timely served and followed up on the discovery at issue here. Thus, for the reasons discussed above and in light of the impending discovery cutoff, the Court hereby DENIES the ex parte applications and related requests i.e., Docket Nos.196, 198, 205, 207, 209, 211 and 212 as untimely. (ec)
February 20, 2019 Filing 218 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., re First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO CUROMD, INC. #205 served on 2/20/2019. (Martinez, David)
February 20, 2019 Filing 217 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., re First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO M.A. MCLAREN, INC. #207 served on 2/20/2019. (Martinez, David)
February 20, 2019 Filing 216 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., re First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO JOHN HANAN #212 served on 2/20/2019. (Martinez, David)
February 20, 2019 Filing 215 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Compliance With Third-Party Subpoenas Directed To Phil Gori, P.G. Investments II, Inc. And Gori Family Limtied Partnership #209 served on 2/20/2019. (Martinez, David)
February 20, 2019 Filing 214 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., re First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO KERR KONCEPTS, INC. #211 served on 02/20/2019. (Martinez, David)
February 20, 2019 Filing 213 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John S. Wisiackas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee #192 . The following error(s) was/were found: Superseded version of Form G-64 used. Other error(s) with document(s): See court's website for updated form. (lom)
February 19, 2019 Filing 212 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO JOHN HANAN filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF LUKE A. HASSKAMP IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO JOHN HANAN, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
February 19, 2019 Filing 211 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO KERR KONCEPTS, INC. filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Luke A. Hasskamp In Support of Plaintiffs' First Ex Parte Application To Compel Compliance With Third-Party Subpoena Directed To Kerr Koncepts, Inc, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Martinez, David)
February 19, 2019 Filing 210 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from to Deny Defendants' Summary Judgment Motions re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #159 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Ju #182 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
February 19, 2019 Filing 209 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Compliance With Third-Party Subpoenas Directed To Phil Gori, P.G. Investments II, Inc. And Gori Family Limtied Partnership filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Luke Hasslamp In Support Of Plaintiffs First Ex Parte Application To Comepl Complaince With Third-Party Subpoena Directed to Phil Gori, P.G. Investments II, Inc. And Gori Family Limited Partnership, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Martinez, David)
February 19, 2019 Filing 208 FIRST AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs amending Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #54 ; JURY DEMAND, filed by Defendants Medivance Billing Service, Inc., DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc., Neisha Carter Zaffuto (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Ahmad, Mohamad)
February 19, 2019 Filing 207 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO M.A. MCLAREN, INC. filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF LUKE A. HASSKAMP IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO M.A. MCLAREN, INC., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
February 19, 2019 Filing 206 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bruce D. Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Material Witnesses Taaj Jenkins, Willow Tree, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 2/19/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23233427) filed by Non-Party Witness Taaj Jenkins, Willow Tree, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Attorney Joseph Carpello added to party Taaj Jenkins(pty:mw), Attorney Joseph Carpello added to party Willow Tree, LLC(pty:mw)) (Carpello, Joseph)
February 19, 2019 Filing 205 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO CUROMD, INC. filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF LUKE A. HASSKAMP IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST EX PARTE APPLICATION TO COMPEL COMPLIANCE WITH THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA DIRECTED TO CUROMD, INC., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
February 19, 2019 Filing 204 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brian F. McEvoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23234049) filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
February 19, 2019 Filing 203 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alex J. Bartko to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23233980) filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
February 19, 2019 Filing 202 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,,, #197 served on 02/18/2019. (Bornstein, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 201 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., re EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document - Plaintiffs' Opposed Ex Parte Application to Compel Compliance with the Court's January 9, 2019 Order and for Sactions Against Taaj Jenkins and Willow Tree LLC under seal #198 on counsel for Third Parties Taaj Jenkins and Willow Tree LLC served on 02/18/2019. (Bornstein, William)
February 18, 2019 Filing 200 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue #188 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ahmad, Mohamad)
February 18, 2019 Filing 199 Notice of Withdrawal of Leave to File Document Under Seal,,,, #195 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
February 18, 2019 Filing 198 EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document - Plaintiffs' Opposed Ex Parte Application to Compel Compliance with the Court's January 9, 2019 Order and for Sactions Against Taaj Jenkins and Willow Tree LLC under seal filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Gleason, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
February 18, 2019 Filing 197 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document - Plaintiffs' Application to file Opposed Ex Parte Application to Compel Compliance with the Court's January 9, 2019 Order and for Sanctions Against Taaj Jenkins and Willow Tree LLC under seal #196 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 UNREDACTED - Plaintiffs' Opposed Ex Parte Application to Compel Compliance with the Court's January 9, 2019 Order and for Sanctions Against Taaj Jenkins and Willow Tree LLC, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit G - Part 1 of 2, #5 Exhibit G - Part 2 of 2, #6 Exhibit H - Part 1 of 3, #7 Exhibit H - Part 2 of 3, #8 Exhibit H - Part 3 of 3)(Martinez, David)
February 18, 2019 Filing 196 APPLICATION to file document - Plaintiffs' Application to file Opposed Ex Parte Application to Compel Compliance with the Court's January 9, 2019 Order and for Sanctions Against Taaj Jenkins and Willow Tree LLC under seal filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Application to file Opposed Ex Parte Application to Compel Compliance with the Court's January 9, 2019 Order and for Sanctions Against Taaj Jenkins and Willow Tree LLC, #2 REDACTED - Plaintiffs' Application to file Opposed Ex Parte Application to Compel Compliance with the Court's January 9, 2019 Order and for Sanctions Against Taaj Jenkins and Willow Tree LLC)(Martinez, David)
February 18, 2019 Filing 195 EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document - Plaintiffs' Opposed Ex Parte Application to Compel Compliance with the Court's January 9, 2019 Order and for Sactions Against Taaj Jenkins and Willow Tree LLC under seal filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Gleason, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David) Modified on 2/20/2019 (lc). (SEE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL BY FILER DOCKET NO. 199 AND FILED AS DOCKET NO. 198)
February 18, 2019 Filing 194 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dmitry Shifrin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23229713) filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
February 18, 2019 Filing 193 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David Di Pietro to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23229536) filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
February 17, 2019 Filing 192 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John S. Wisiackas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23229362) filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
February 17, 2019 Filing 191 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Chad C. Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23229359) filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
February 15, 2019 Filing 190 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #159 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, Aaron Durall. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ahmad, Mohamad)
February 15, 2019 Filing 189 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #158 filed by Defendants DL Investment Holdings LLC, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Ahmad, Mohamad)
February 15, 2019 Filing 188 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke A. Hasskamp in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery and Motion Deadlines, #2 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 187 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #39 , Sealed Document,,, #185 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #184 served on February 14, 2019. (Martinez, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 186 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Sealed Document (Exhibit 8 to Zabo declaration by plaintiff)[ docket no. 185]. The following error(s) was/were found: Title page is missing. Other error(s) with document(s): MISSING LR-11-3/8 required filer, attorney, court and case information required on all efiled documents.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 185 SEALED DOCUMENT EXHIBIT 8 TO THE DECLARATION OF ZACHARY ZABO re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #39 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #184 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc..(Martinez, David)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' APPLICATION TO FILE EXHIBIT TO DECLARATION OF ZACHARY ZABO UNDER SEAL #40 by Judge S. James Otero (lc) Modified on 2/13/2019 (lc).
February 11, 2019 Filing 183 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., re Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,,,, #179 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,,,,, #181 served on February 11, 2019. (Martinez, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 182 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Relief from to Deny Defendants' Summary Judgment Motions re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #159 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #158 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Gleason, #2 Proposed Order) (Bornstein, William)
February 11, 2019 Filing 181 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Materials under seal #180 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Disputed Facts, #3 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit R, #6 Exhibit S, #7 Exhibit T - PART 1 OF 4, #8 Exhibit T - PART 2 OF 4, #9 Exhibit T - PART 3 OF 4, #10 Exhibit T - PART 4 OF 4, #11 Exhibit U, #12 Exhibit V, #13 Exhibit W, #14 Exhibit X, #15 Exhibit Y, #16 Exhibit Z, #17 Exhibit AA, #18 Exhibit BB, #19 Exhibit CC, #20 Exhibit DD, #21 Exhibit EE, #22 Exhibit FF, #23 Exhibit GG, #24 Exhibit HH, #25 Exhibit II, #26 Exhibit RR, #27 Exhibit SS, #28 Exhibit TT, #29 Exhibit UU, #30 Declaration of Steven Cohen, #31 Exhibit JJ, #32 Exhibit MM, #33 Exhibit QQ)(Martinez, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 180 APPLICATION to file document Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Materials under seal filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Disputed Facts (Redacted), #3 Statement of Undisputed Facts (Redacted), #4 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 179 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Materials under seal #178 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Disputed Facts, #3 Statement of Undisputed Facts, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit R, #6 Exhibit S, #7 Exhibit T - PART 1 OF 4, #8 Exhibit T - PART 2 OF 4, #9 Exhibit T - PART 3 OF 4, #10 Exhibit T - PART 4 OF 4, #11 Exhibit U, #12 Exhibit V, #13 Exhibit W, #14 Exhibit X, #15 Exhibit Y, #16 Exhibit Z, #17 Exhibit AA, #18 Exhibit BB, #19 Exhibit CC, #20 Exhibit DD, #21 Exhibit EE, #22 Exhibit FF, #23 Exhibit GG, #24 Exhibit HH, #25 Exhibit II, #26 Exhibit RR, #27 Exhibit SS, #28 Exhibit TT, #29 Exhibit UU, #30 Declaration of Steven Cohen, #31 Exhibit JJ, #32 Exhibit MM, #33 Exhibit QQ)(Martinez, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 178 APPLICATION to file document Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Materials under seal filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Entity Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Redacted), #2 Statement of Disputed Facts (Redacted), #3 Statement of Undisputed Facts (Redacted), #4 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 176 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #159 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Disputed Facts (Redacted), #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts (Redacted), #3 Declaration of William Bornstein, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V, #26 Exhibit W, #27 Exhibit X, #28 Exhibit Y, #29 Exhibit Z, #30 Exhibit VV, #31 Declaration of Zachary Zabo, #32 Exhibit AA, #33 Exhibit BB, #34 Exhibit CC, #35 Exhibit DD, #36 Exhibit EE, #37 Exhibit FF, #38 Exhibit GG, #39 Exhibit HH, #40 Exhibit II, #41 Exhibit JJ, #42 Exhibit KK - Part 1 of 2, #43 Exhibit KK - Part 2 of 2, #44 Exhibit LL, #45 Exhibit MM, #46 Exhibit NN, #47 Exhibit OO, #48 Exhibit PP, #49 Exhibit QQ, #50 Exhibit RR, #51 Exhibit SS, #52 Exhibit TT, #53 Exhibit UU)(Martinez, David)
February 11, 2019 Filing 175 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #158 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Disputed Facts (Redacted), #2 Statement of Undisputed Facts (Redacted), #3 Declaration of William Bornstein, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V, #26 Exhibit W, #27 Exhibit X, #28 Exhibit Y, #29 Exhibit Z, #30 Exhibit VV, #31 Declaration of Zachary Zabo, #32 Exhibit AA, #33 Exhibit BB, #34 Exhibit CC, #35 Exhibit DD, #36 Exhibit EE, #37 Exhibit FF, #38 Exhibit GG, #39 Exhibit HH, #40 Exhibit II, #41 Exhibit JJ, #42 Exhibit KK - Part 1 of 2, #43 Exhibit KK - Part 2 of 2, #44 Exhibit LL, #45 Exhibit MM, #46 Exhibit NN, #47 Exhibit OO, #48 Exhibit PP, #49 Exhibit QQ, #50 Exhibit RR, #51 Exhibit SS, #52 Exhibit TT, #53 Exhibit UU)(Martinez, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 177 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: granting #128 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and denying Defendants' Motion to Compel. By no later than Thursday, February 21, 2019, Defendants shall produce documents related to the above categories that are in your custody, possession or control. Defendants are also ordered to provide declarations of both counsel and a company representative, no later than February 21, 2019, detailing the efforts taken to find responsive documents and to explain, under penalty of perjury, why documents falling into these categories either do not exist or are not in Defendants' custody and control, if Defendants contend that they cannot produce them. (ec)
February 8, 2019 Filing 174 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 2/6/2019; 2:04 p.m. re Transcript #173 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (at) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 8, 2019 Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 2/6/2019; 2:04 p.m. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/1/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2019. (at)
February 8, 2019 Filing 172 SUPPLEMENT to MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY #128 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
February 7, 2019 Filing 171 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS #110 ; ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RULE 11 SANCTIONS #114 ; ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY CASE PENDING BANKRUPTCY #122 ; ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY CASE PENDING BANKRUPTCY #123 . Defendants have 10 DAYS to file amended Counterclaims. (lc)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero:The Court directs the Clerks office to place under seal the attachment #3 Unredacted Document inre document ECF No. 165, APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (lc)
February 7, 2019 Filing 169 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Silvia Green at SGreen@RobinsKaplan.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Martinez, David)
February 6, 2019 Filing 168 MINUTES OF Discovery Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: denying #154 Defendants' Motion to Compel. The Court hears argument regarding Plaintiffs' Motion #128 . As set forth further on the record, Plaintiff is ordered to file a brief supplement in support of its motion listing, without argument, the specific categories of documents discussed at the hearing. The supplement is due to be filed, with a Word version e-mailed to the Court's chambers e-mail account, by no later than 12:00 p.m. on Friday, February 8, 2019. The Court will issue its written order, consistent with the findings and rulings made on the record today, shortly after the filing. (ec)
February 6, 2019 Filing 167 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mohamad Saleh Ahmad counsel for Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. Adding Uriah Tagle as counsel of record for DL Investment Holdings LLC f/k/a Durall Capital Holdings, LLC; Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.; Medivance Billing Services, Inc.; Aaron Durall; and Neisha Carter Zaffuto for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants DL Investment Holdings LLC f/k/a Durall Capital Holdings, LLC; Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.; Medivance Billing Service, Inc.; Aaron Durall; and Neisha Carter Zaffuto. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
February 6, 2019 Filing 166 Text Only Entry re APPLICATION to file document under seal #165 . The Application is denied as untimely as nothing was provided to the Court prior to today and the filing is not in compliance with the briefing schedule set by the Court. Therefore, the Court will not consider the filing in it's decision on Defendants' Motion. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ec) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 6, 2019 Filing 165 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document Redacted Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3SEALED DOCUMENT- Unredacted Document Declaration with Unredacted Exhibits)(Ahmad, Mohamad) Modified on 2/7/2019 (lc).
February 4, 2019 Filing 164 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. The Court finds the following motion suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing on the MOTION to Stay Case pending Bankruptcy filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. [ECF No. 122], set for hearing on February 11, 2019. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 31, 2019 Filing 163 REPLY in support of MOTION to Compel Discovery #154 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
January 29, 2019 Filing 162 OBJECTION in opposition to re: MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY #128 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
January 29, 2019 Filing 161 OBJECTION support of re: MOTION to Compel Discovery #154 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
January 28, 2019 Filing 160 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Compel Discovery #154 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Hasskamp in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery)(Martinez, David)
January 28, 2019 Filing 159 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, Aaron Durall. Motion set for hearing on 3/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration Declaration of Aaron Durall, #3 Declaration Declaration of Neisha Carter Zaffuto, #4 Declaration Declaration of Mohamad Ahmad, #5 Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
January 28, 2019 Filing 158 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants DL Investment Holdings LLC, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 3/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts, #2 Declaration Declaration of Aaron Durall, #3 Declaration Declaration of Neisha Carter Zaffuto, #4 Declaration Declaration of Mohamad Ahmad, #5 Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Judgment) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
January 25, 2019 Filing 157 Notice of Withdrawal of Ex Parte Application to Compel,,, #156 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
January 24, 2019 Filing 156 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Compliance with Third-Party Subpoena Directed to Teruel Enterprises, LLC filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Bornstein, #2 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
January 23, 2019 Filing 155 REPLY In Support of MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY #128 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Hasskamp in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Luke Hasskamp, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Luke Hasskamp, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Luke Hasskamp)(Martinez, David)
January 21, 2019 Filing 154 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/6/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Ahmad, Mohamad)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Denise S. Rahne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Blue Cross of California d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross, et al., designating David Martinez as local counselby Judge S. James Otero #144 #143 (2 refiled identical applications to docket no. 136). (lc)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANDING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William Bornstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., and designating David Martinez as local counsel #142 by Judge S. James Otero. (lc)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Denise S. Rahne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.and designating David Martinez as local counsel #136 by Judge S. James Otero. (lc)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Chelsea A. Walcker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc and designating David Martinez as local counsel #125 by Judge S. James Otero (lc)
January 18, 2019 Filing 149 OPPOSITION to MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY #128 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Ahmad, Mohamad)
January 18, 2019 Filing 148 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Bankruptcy #122 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Hasskamp in Opposition to Motion to Stay)(Martinez, David)
January 17, 2019 Filing 147 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Denise S. Rahne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, #144 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lom)
January 16, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. correcting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Denise S. Rahne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, #143 (Martinez, David)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish regarding parties' January 7, 2019 email. The Court is in receipt of the parties' email of January 7, 2019. The Court will dispense with the requirement for a pre-discovery motion telephone conference and sets the following briefing schedule: Defendant's opening brief is due by January 21, 2019 Plaintiff's the opposition is due by January 28, 2019 Defendant's reply, if any, is due by January 31, 2019 The Court sets an in person hearing for this motion to compel, as well as the motion to compel filed on January 10, 2019 [Dkt. 128], for hearing at 2:00 p.m. on Wednesday, February 6, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ec)
January 16, 2019 Filing 144 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Denise S. Rahne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 1/14/2019, Receipt No. 26ENT64S) filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
January 16, 2019 Filing 143 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Denise S. Rahne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 1/14/2019, Receipt No. 26ENT64S) filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
January 16, 2019 Filing 142 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William Bornstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23052755) filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
January 16, 2019 Filing 141 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. The Court finds the following motion suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing on MOTION for Sanctions for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. [ECF #114], set for hearing on January 28, 2019. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 16, 2019 Filing 140 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. The Court denies the MOTION to Stay Case pending Bankruptcy filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. and the EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Stay filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. as MOOT. Defendant has filed a notice of withdrawl as to both said motions [ECF No.s 119 and 120] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 16, 2019 Filing 139 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero. The Court finds the following motion suitable for disposition without oral argument and vacates the hearing on MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Servic [ECF #110], set for January 21, 2019. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). No appearance is required. The briefing schedule remains as set by Local Rule. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 15, 2019 Filing 138 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Denise S. Rahne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, #136 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt)
January 14, 2019 Filing 137 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions for Attorney's Fees and Costs #114 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
January 14, 2019 Filing 136 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Denise S. Rahne to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23038653) filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
January 11, 2019 Filing 135 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: denying #130 Application to File Document under seal #130 . (ec)
January 11, 2019 Filing 134 REPLY in support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Bankruptcy #123 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
January 11, 2019 Filing 133 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFFS Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., re APPLICATION to file document under seal #130 served on January 10, 2019. (Martinez, David)
January 10, 2019 Filing 132 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Leave,,, #129 filed by PLAINTIFFS Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
January 10, 2019 Filing 131 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document under seal #130 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL, #2 Unredacted Document DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF NEISHA CARTER ZAFFUTO)(Martinez, David)
January 10, 2019 Filing 130 APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
January 10, 2019 Filing 129 APPLICATION to FILE MOTION TO COMPEL AND DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT UNDER SEAL filed by PLAINTIFFS Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Document, #2 Redacted Document, #3 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
January 10, 2019 Filing 128 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY filed by PLAINTIFFS Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF JEFFREY GLEASON, #2 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
January 9, 2019 Filing 127 OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Bankruptcy #123 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Hasskamp)(Martinez, David)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: granting #121 Ex Parte Application to Compel Compliance with Third-Party Subpoenas Directed to Taaj Jenkins and Willow Tree, LLC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application is GRANTED. 2. Third parties Taaj Jenkins and Willow Tree, LLC must comply with the document subpoenas served upon them, respectively, within five (5) days of this Order. All objections to the document subpoenas are deemed waived. 3.Third party Taaj Jenkins must appear for a deposition at the offices of Plaintiffs' counsel at 2049 Century Park East, Suite 3400, Los Angeles, California 90067-3208, or another mutually agreeable location, no later than January 28, 2019. 4. Third parties Taaj Jenkins and Willow Tree, LLC are warned that further failure to comply with the subpoenas served upon them may constitute contempt of this Courts Order.5. Plaintiffs' counsel is hereby directed to serve a copy of this Order upon third parties Taaj Jenkins and Willow Tree, LLC. (ec)
January 8, 2019 Filing 125 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Chelsea A. Walcker to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 1/8/2019, Receipt No. 0973-23008273) filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish regarding the parties' email of January 2, 2019. The Court therefore sets the following expedited briefing schedule for Plaintiff's discovery motion, which may address only issues that were raised in the parties' January 2, 2019, email: Plaintiff's opening brief: Thursday, January 10, 2019 Defendants' opposition, if any: Friday, January 18, 2019 Plaintiff's reply, which may not repeat arguments from Plaintiff's opening, and which may only respond to issues raised in Defendants' opposition: Wednesday, January 23, 2018. (See order for full details) (ec)
January 7, 2019 Filing 123 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Stay Case pending Bankruptcy filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
January 7, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Bankruptcy filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 2/11/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
January 7, 2019 Filing 121 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENAS DIRECTED TO TAAJ JENKINS AND WILLOW TREE, LLC filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Hasskamp, #2 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
January 7, 2019 Filing 120 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Expedite, #112 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
January 7, 2019 Filing 119 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Stay Case, #111 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
January 7, 2019 Filing 118 Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions for Attorney's Fees and Costs #114 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke A. Hasskamp in Opposition to Rule 11 Motion)(Martinez, David)
January 7, 2019 Filing 117 OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Bankruptcy #111 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF LUKE A. HASSKAMP IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY)(Martinez, David)
January 7, 2019 Filing 116 REPLY In support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims #110 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
January 2, 2019 Filing 115 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Stay #112 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Hasskamp)(Martinez, David)
December 31, 2018 Filing 114 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Sanctions for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
December 31, 2018 Filing 113 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims #110 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
December 28, 2018 Filing 112 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Hearing on Motion to Stay filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
December 28, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Bankruptcy filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
December 10, 2018 Filing 110 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 1/21/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Hasskamp, #2 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER ON STIPULATION EXTENDING PAGE LIMIT FOR PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMS #108 by Judge S. James Otero: Plaintiffs shall have five (5) additional pages for their memorandum oflaw in support of their motion to dismiss, thereby increasing the page limit to a total of 25 pages. (lc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 108 Joint STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims by Five Pages filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Hasskamp in Support of Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending the Page Limit, #2 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
November 19, 2018 Filing 107 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #54 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc..(Ahmad, Mohamad)
November 13, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 11/5/18 10:27 a.m. re Transcript #105 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Zurborg, Carol) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 13, 2018 Filing 105 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 11/5/18 10:27 a.m. Court Reporter: Carol Jean Zurborg, phone number (213) 894-3539. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 12/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2019. (Zurborg, Carol)
November 7, 2018 Filing 104 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: denying #92 Ex Parte Application to Compel. Given the District Judge's denial, without prejudice, of Plaintiffs' request for injunctive relief, there are no exigent circumstances that warrant ex parte relief. The parties are reminded that ex parte applications are generally disfavored, and require the existence of truly exigent circumstances in order for a requesting party to obtain relief. (ec)
November 7, 2018 Filing 103 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Compliance with the Court's October 17, 2018 Order #92 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration)(Ahmad, Mohamad)
November 6, 2018 Filing 101 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Yussuf Aleem to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Paid #52 by Clerk of Court. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 11/13/18. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed (lc)
November 6, 2018 Filing 100 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Ina Fairclough at IFairclough@RobinsKaplan.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Martinez, David)
November 5, 2018 Filing 102 MINUTES OF Continuation of MOTION for Preliminary Injunction before Judge S. James Otero: Hearing held. The Court denies the motion for preliminary injunction without prejudice. The Court DENIES the motion to dismiss without prejudice [ECF Nos. #68 and #70 ]. Defendant is ordered to file its answer/counterclaims within 14 days of today's date. Court Reporter: Carol Zurborg. (jp)
November 5, 2018 Filing 99 REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 1 filed. Parties request Filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc..(Martinez, David)
November 5, 2018 Filing 98 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc... (Martinez, David)
November 4, 2018 Filing 97 DECLARATION of John Peleuses filed by Defendants DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
November 2, 2018 Filing 96 DECLARATION of Portia Diaz filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
November 1, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Ahmad, Mohamad)
October 29, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings MONDAY, OCTOBER 22, 2018 2:01 P.M re Transcript #93 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Nirenberg, C) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 29, 2018 Filing 93 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on MONDAY, OCTOBER 22, 2018 2:01 P.M. Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Court Reporter: C. Nirenberg, OFFICIAL REPORTER, CONTACT www.msfedreporter.com, or PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/19/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2019. (Nirenberg, C)
October 29, 2018 Filing 92 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Compel Compliance with the Court's October 17, 2018 Order filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke A. Hasskamp In Support of Ex Parte Application to Compel Compliance with the Court's October 17, 2018 Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
October 22, 2018 Filing 91 MINUTES OF MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #39 and Scheduling conference held before Judge S. James Otero: The Court takes a recess to allow defendants counsel to find out when the defendant can provide a declaration, signed under penalty of perjury, from the director of the lab at Sonoma West Medical Center, Inc., attesting to the fact that all of the 16,000 tests conducted after Mr.Durall's company took over the testing at the hospital, were conducted at the hospital.Defendants counsel advises the court that Ms. Portia Diaz will lodge declaration.Court and counsel confer.The Court advances the Scheduling Conference set for 11/05/18 to today.The Court sets the following schedule:Jury Trial: Tuesday, May 21, 2019 9:00 a.m.Pretrial Conference: Tuesday, May 13, 2019 9:00 a.m.Motion Cutoff: Monday, March 4, 2019 10:00 a.m.Discovery Cutoff: Thursday, February 21, 2019.Last Date to Amend: Thursday, November 22, 2018.Reference of the above case to the Alternative Dispute Resolution Program is vacated. Settlement is referred to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish for all further proceedings.All discovery disputes are to be brought before the Magistrate Judge assigned to the case. Parties reminded of requirements of FRCP 26-1(a); counsel are advised all pretrial documents (as listed) must be filed in compliance with Courts Initial Standing order. relevant documents, tangible items and evidence and the remainder of the motion for a preliminary injunction is continued November 5, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. The Court Orders defendants counsel to provide a declaration from Ms. Porsche Diaz, under penalty of perjury, by November 5, 2018. The Court Orders Plaintiff to provide an ERISA amount by 10/29/18. The Court Orders that a transcript of todays proceeding shall be prepared. Costs to be shared by counsel. Court Reporter: Cindy Nirenberg. (lc) Modified on 10/25/2018 (lc).
October 22, 2018 Filing 88 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #68 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
October 21, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 10/17/18 re Transcript #89 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ha) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 21, 2018 Filing 89 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 10/17/18 1:43 p.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPTION, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 11/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2019. (ha)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish re Stipulation for Protective Order #86 . (ec)
October 19, 2018 Filing 86 STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Protective Order)(Martinez, David)
October 19, 2018 Filing 85 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Lilia Castiglioni at lcastiglioni@robinskaplan.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Martinez, David)
October 17, 2018 Filing 84 MINUTES OF DISCOVERY HEARING held before Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish: granting in part #73 Ex Parte Application to Compel and granting #75 Ex Parte Application for Order to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas. (See order for full details) (ec)
October 16, 2018 Filing 83 NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish scheduling a telephonic hearing re Ex Parte Application to Compel Compliance with Court Order #73 and Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas #75 for 10/17/2018 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. Counsel shall meet and confer to set up a bridge line and provide the call in information to the Court. Additionally, counsel shall notify the Court Clerk via email at GJS_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov of the name of each counsel appearing on the call. NOTE: During the telephone hearing, counsel must identify themselves before they speak for the benefit of the Court and the Court Recorder.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ec) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 16, 2018 Filing 82 OBJECTIONS to Notice (Other), #80 of Intent to Serve Subpoena filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
October 15, 2018 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Correct NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #68 #70 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
October 12, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Ahmad, Mohamad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 79 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Set For Hearing on October 22, 2018 #75 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
October 11, 2018 Filing 78 OPPOSITION to EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Compel Compliance with the Court's September 13, 2018 Order #73 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration)(Ahmad, Mohamad)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: Granting #71 Non-Resident Attorney Yussuf S Aleem APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants, DL Investment Holdings LLC f/k/a Durall Capital Holdings, LLC; Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.; Medivance Billing Service, Inc.; Aaron Durall; and Neisha Carter Zaffuto, designating Mohamad Ahmad as local counsel. (shb)
October 5, 2018 Filing 75 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Set For Hearing on October 22, 2018 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Hasskamp in Support of Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve Third-Party Subpoenas, #2 Proposed Subpoena on Exchange Bank, #3 Proposed Subpoena on Regions Bank, #4 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
October 4, 2018 Filing 76 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge S. James Otero: This matter is before the Court on Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. MOTION to Dismiss Case ("Motion"), filed August 17, 2018 [ECF No. 38]. Plaintiffs ("Plaintiffs") have filed a First Amended Complaint ("FAC") within the time allotted under Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 15(a) [ECF No. 54]. Accordingly, the Motion is DENIED as moot. (yl)
October 4, 2018 Filing 74 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . [ECF #39]. The Court changes the time of the hearing for the Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for hearing on 10/22/2018 from 10:00 AM to 02:00 PM before Judge S. James Otero. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 3, 2018 Filing 73 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order to Compel Compliance with the Court's September 13, 2018 Order filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Hasskamp in Support of Ex Parte Application to Compel Compliance with the Court's September 13, 2018 Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge S. James Otero: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Yussuf Aleem to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - #52 , for the following reasons: Local Rule 832.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (yl)
October 2, 2018 Filing 71 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Yussuf S. Abdel-aleem to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 9/7/2018, Receipt No. 26C3O0LV) filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
September 28, 2018 Filing 70 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Correct NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #68 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/5/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
September 28, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. correcting NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #68 (Ahmad, Mohamad)
September 28, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 11/5/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
September 28, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #66 by Blue Cross re Sonoma West Medical Center, Inc. The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice: Filing Bankruptcy (non-bankruptcy appeal). Other error(s) with document(s): Note: To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
September 28, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Stipulation for Protective Order #63 by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. The document is stricken. Counsel shall review Judge Standish's procedures for submission of protective orders, strictly comply therewith, (including submitting a redlined version for the Court's review), and refile the protective order. Counsel shall further comply with L.R. 52-4.1 and attach a proposed Order to the Stipulation. Please note that counsel is required to use the court's model protective order; only limited additions to the Court's model protective order will be considered. (ec)
September 25, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation for Protective Order #63 . The following error(s) was/were found: The Stipulation for Protective Order does not comply with Judge Standish's procedures. The stipulation does not comply with: L.R. 52-4.1 Separate Order. A separate proposed order shall be submitted with any stipulation, application, motion, or request of the parties requiring an order of the Court. If the proposed order is the result of a stipulation, the pertinent elements requested in the stipulation shall be set forth in the order. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ec)
September 25, 2018 Filing 63 (STRICKEN) Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] HIPAA Qualified and General Protective Order)(Martinez, David) Modified on 9/25/2018 (ec).
September 24, 2018 Filing 62 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #39 . In light of Defendants' jurisdictional challenge, the Court continues said motion from 9/26/18 to Monday, 10/22/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 21, 2018 Filing 61 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Medivance Billing Service, Inc. answer now due 9/28/2018; DL Investment Holdings LLC answer now due 9/28/2018; Aaron Durall answer now due 9/28/2018; Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. answer now due 9/28/2018; Neisha Carter Zaffuto answer now due 9/28/2018, re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #54 filed by Defendants Medivance Billing Service, Inc.; DL Investment Holdings LLC; Aaron Durall; Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.; Neisha Carter Zaffuto.(Ahmad, Mohamad)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for Expedited Discovery #42 by Judge S. James Otero: Within three (3) days of this Order, Plaintiffs may serve on each Defendant limited interrogatories and requests for production relating to: (1) the funds obtained by Defendants from Plaintiffs as alleged in the Complaint, including the amounts that remain in Defendants possession and whether the funds have been used to purchase real or personal property; and (2) Defendants efforts to preserve evidence relevant to this matter. Defendants shall serve their responses and produce all responsive documents within seven (7) days of receiving the requests. (lc)
September 13, 2018 Filing 59 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge S. James Otero re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #39 . The Court continues the hearing on said Motion set for hearing on 9/17/18 to Wednesday, 9/26/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 10, 2018 Filing 58 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #54 as to defendant Sonoma West Medical Center, Inc. (lc)
September 7, 2018 Filing 57 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (Exhibits C, D and E to the First Amended Complaint) under seal #56 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document Exhibit C to FAC, #2 Unredacted Document Exhibit D to FAC, #3 Unredacted Document Exhibit E to FAC)(Martinez, David)
September 7, 2018 Filing 56 APPLICATION to file document (Exhibits C, D and E to the First Amended Complaint) under seal filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
September 7, 2018 Filing 55 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,,, #54 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
September 7, 2018 Filing 54 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc., Sonoma West Medical Center, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans Inc, Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.(Martinez, David)
September 7, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Yussuf Aleem to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - #52 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (lom)
September 7, 2018 Filing 52 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Yussuf Aleem to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22382438) filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad) Modified on 11/6/2018 (lc).(STRICKEN PER 11/6/18 COURT G112B RESPONSE)
August 31, 2018 Filing 51 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #39 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Objection to the Declarations of Nathaniel J. Moore, John Iacovelli, and Zachary Zabo filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
August 31, 2018 Filing 50 REPLY in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Discovery #42 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
August 31, 2018 Filing 49 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #39 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 48 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Discovery #42 , APPLICATION to file document (Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Zachary Zabo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Ex Parte Application for Expedited Discovery) under seal #40 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #39 , Sealed Declaration in SupportDeclaration,,, #41 served on August 18, 2018 and August 20, 2018. (Martinez, David)
August 27, 2018 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Discovery #42 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Ahmad, Mohamad)
August 27, 2018 Filing 46 OBJECTION Declarations re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #39 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
August 27, 2018 Filing 45 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion #39 filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Ahmad, Mohamad)
August 20, 2018 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
August 20, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc., (Ahmad, Mohamad)
August 17, 2018 Filing 42 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Expedite Discovery filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke Hasskamp in Support of Ex Parte Application for Expedited Discovery, #2 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
August 17, 2018 Filing 41 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document (Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Zachary Zabo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Ex Parte Application for Expedited Discovery) under seal #40 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Document)(Martinez, David)
August 17, 2018 Filing 40 APPLICATION to file document (Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Zachary Zabo in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Ex Parte Application for Expedited Discovery) under seal filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martinez, David)
August 17, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/17/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathaniel Moore ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Zachary Zabo ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Ex Parte Application for Expedited Discovery, #3 Declaration of John Iacovelli ISO Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Ex Parte Application for Expedited Discovery, #4 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
August 17, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/15/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
August 9, 2018 Filing 37 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Sonoma West Medical Center, Inc. (lom)
August 6, 2018 Filing 36 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Sonoma West Medical Center, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans Inc, Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Luke A. Hasskamp) (Martinez, David)
August 3, 2018 Filing 35 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Document,,, #33 filed by Defendants DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc., Sonoma West Medical Center, Inc.. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
August 3, 2018 Filing 34 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Medivance Billing Service, Inc. answer now due 8/17/2018; DL Investment Holdings LLC answer now due 8/17/2018; Aaron Durall answer now due 8/17/2018; Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. answer now due 8/17/2018; Neisha Carter Zaffuto answer now due 8/17/2018, filed by Defendants Medivance Billing Service, Inc.; DL Investment Holdings LLC; Aaron Durall; Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.; Neisha Carter Zaffuto. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Notice of Lodging of Proposed Order)(Ahmad, Mohamad)
August 2, 2018 Filing 33 First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Enlargement of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support, #2 Proposed Order Notice of Lodging Proposed Order) (Attorney Mohamad Saleh Ahmad added to party Neisha Carter Zaffuto(pty:dft), Attorney Mohamad Saleh Ahmad added to party DL Investment Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mohamad Saleh Ahmad added to party Aaron Durall(pty:dft), Attorney Mohamad Saleh Ahmad added to party Medivance Billing Service, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Mohamad Saleh Ahmad added to party Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Ahmad, Mohamad)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/5/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
July 30, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge S. James Otero for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Gail J. Stansdish. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:18-cv-04912 SJO(GJSx). (rn)
July 30, 2018 Filing 29 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c. (Ahmad, Mohamad)
July 16, 2018 Filing 28 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
July 6, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Waiver of Service Executed #23 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Attached document is a duplicate of the document attached to Docket Entry No. 24. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (hr)
July 3, 2018 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans Inc, Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. upon Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. Waiver of Service signed by Aaron Durall. (Martinez, David) Modified on 7/6/2018 (hr).
July 3, 2018 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans Inc, Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. upon Neisha Carter Zaffuto waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/4/2018, answer due 8/3/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Neisha Carter Zaffuto. (Martinez, David)
July 3, 2018 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans Inc, Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. upon Medivance Billing Service, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/4/2018, answer due 8/3/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Neisha Zaffuto. (Martinez, David)
July 3, 2018 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans Inc, Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. upon Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/4/2018, answer due 8/3/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Aaron Durall. (Martinez, David)
July 3, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans Inc, Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. upon Aaron Durall waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/4/2018, answer due 8/3/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Aaron Durall. (Martinez, David)
July 3, 2018 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans Inc, Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. upon DL Investment Holdings LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/4/2018, answer due 8/3/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Aaron Durall. (Martinez, David)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. GRANTING Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S. Gleason Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Blue Cross of California d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross, et al., designating David Martinez as local counsel. #18 (vm)
June 11, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans Inc, Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. upon Sonoma West Medical Center, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 6/4/2018, answer due 8/3/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Dan Smith. (Martinez, David)
June 11, 2018 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S. Gleason to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21903915) filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, In c., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Jamie R. Kurtz APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Blue Cross of California d/b/a Anthem Blue Cross, et al., designating David Martinez as local counsel. (hr)
June 6, 2018 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jamie R. Kurtz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 6/6/2018, Receipt No. 0973-21878131) filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Martinez, David)
June 6, 2018 Filing 15 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
June 5, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jamie R. Kurtz. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
June 5, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S. Gleason. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
June 5, 2018 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Neisha Carter Zaffuto, DL Investment Holdings LLC, Aaron Durall, Medivance Billing Service, Inc., Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc., and Sonoma West Medical Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 DL Investments, #2 Sonoma West, #3 Reliance Technology, #4 Medivance, #5 ADurall) (jtil)
June 5, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (jtil)
June 1, 2018 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. (Martinez, David)
June 1, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., (Martinez, David)
June 1, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
June 1, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
June 1, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
June 1, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
June 1, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
June 1, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
June 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans Inc, Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc., BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.. (Martinez, David)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21858065 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc., Blue Cross of California, Community Insurance Company, Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin, Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc., Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc., HMO HealthKeepers, Inc., HMO Missouri, Inc., RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc., Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company, BCBSM, Inc., Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc., Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc., Anthem Health Plans Inc, Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company, Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. (Attorney David Martinez added to party Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party Anthem Health Plans Inc(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party BCBSM, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party Blue Cross of California(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party Community Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party HMO HealthKeepers, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party HMO Missouri, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney David Martinez added to party Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.(pty:pla))(Martinez, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue Cross of California et al v. Sonoma West Medical Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DL Investment Holdings LLC
Represented By: Dmitry Shifrin
Represented By: Uriah Tagle
Represented By: David Di Pietro
Represented By: Mohamad Saleh Ahmad
Represented By: Alex I Bartko
Represented By: Yussuf S Abdel-Aleem
Represented By: Chad C Marcus
Represented By: Brian F McEvoy
Represented By: John S Wisiackas
Represented By: Levi G Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Laboratory Testing, Inc.
Represented By: Dmitry Shifrin
Represented By: Uriah Tagle
Represented By: David Di Pietro
Represented By: Mohamad Saleh Ahmad
Represented By: Alex I Bartko
Represented By: Yussuf S Abdel-Aleem
Represented By: Chad C Marcus
Represented By: Brian F McEvoy
Represented By: John S Wisiackas
Represented By: Levi G Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medivance Billing Service, Inc.
Represented By: Dmitry Shifrin
Represented By: Uriah Tagle
Represented By: David Di Pietro
Represented By: Mohamad Saleh Ahmad
Represented By: Alex I Bartko
Represented By: Yussuf S Abdel-Aleem
Represented By: Chad C Marcus
Represented By: Brian F McEvoy
Represented By: John S Wisiackas
Represented By: Levi G Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma West Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neisha Carter Zaffuto
Represented By: Dmitry Shifrin
Represented By: Uriah Tagle
Represented By: Mohamad Saleh Ahmad
Represented By: Yussuf S Abdel-Aleem
Represented By: Chad C Marcus
Represented By: John S Wisiackas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Durall
Represented By: Dmitry Shifrin
Represented By: Uriah Tagle
Represented By: David Di Pietro
Represented By: Mohamad Saleh Ahmad
Represented By: Alex I Bartko
Represented By: Yussuf S Abdel-Aleem
Represented By: Chad C Marcus
Represented By: Brian F McEvoy
Represented By: John S Wisiackas
Represented By: Levi G Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durall Capital Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Dmitry Shifrin
Represented By: Uriah Tagle
Represented By: David Di Pietro
Represented By: Mohamad Saleh Ahmad
Represented By: Alex I Bartko
Represented By: Yussuf S Abdel-Aleem
Represented By: Chad C Marcus
Represented By: Brian F McEvoy
Represented By: John S Wisiackas
Represented By: Levi G Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Blue Cross Life and Health Insurance Company
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc.
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMO HealthKeepers, Inc.
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc.
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BCBSM, Inc.
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Insurance Company
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMO Missouri, Inc.
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross Blue Shield Healthcare Plan of Georgia, Inc.
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Health Plans Inc
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross of California
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc.
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc.
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RightCHOICE Managed Care, Inc.
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BCBSM, Inc. doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Insurance Company doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Health Plans Inc doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empire HealthChoice Assurance, Inc. doing business as Empire Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Mountain Hospital and Medical Service, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Colorado
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMO HealthKeepers, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Cross of California doing business as Anthem Blue Cross
Represented By: David Martinez
Represented By: Jeffrey S Gleason
Represented By: William Bornstein
Represented By: Roman M Silberfeld
Represented By: Denise S Rahne
Represented By: Jamie R Kurtz
Represented By: Luke A Hasskamp
Represented By: Chelsea A Walcker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Anthem Health Plans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Blue Cross of California, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: John Doe(s) 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Anthem Health Plans of Maine, Inc doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Blue Cross of California, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Anthem Health Plans, Inc. doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Healthy Alliance Life Insurance Company doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Material witness: Taaj Jenkins
Represented By: Joseph Carpello
Represented By: Bruce D Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Material witness: Willow Tree, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Carpello
Represented By: Bruce D Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Neisha Carter Zuffuto
Represented By: Dmitry Shifrin
Represented By: David Di Pietro
Represented By: Mohamad Saleh Ahmad
Represented By: Alex I Bartko
Represented By: Brian F McEvoy
Represented By: Levi G Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?