DeAndre Deshawn George v. Martin Biter
Petitioner: DeAndre Deshawn George
Respondent: Martin Biter
Case Number: 2:2018cv05634
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew J Guilford
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order by Judge Andrew J. Guilford denying Certificate of Appealability. (mat)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING SUCCESSIVE HABEAS ACTION by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. Because the Court does not have jurisdiction to consider Petitioner's claim, the action is DISMISSED without prejudice as successive. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See Order for further details) Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (vm)
July 13, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Respondent Martin Biter, re Notice of Appearance #5 served on July 13, 2018. (Karlin, Louis)
July 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Louis W Karlin on behalf of Respondent Martin Biter (Attorney Louis W Karlin added to party Martin Biter(pty:res))(Karlin, Louis)
July 12, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM filed by DeAndre D. George, petitioner. (vm)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: REVIEW OF HABEAS PETITION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. It is ORDERED that Petitioner will file a memorandum by or before July 27, 2018, not to exceed 5 pages showing good cause why the case should not be dismissed. (See Minute Order for further details) Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (vm)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (lh)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Andrew J. Guilford and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Filing Fee $5 Due), filed by Petitioner DeAndre Deshawn George. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeAndre Deshawn George v. Martin Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DeAndre Deshawn George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martin Biter
Represented By: Louis W Karlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?