American Latex Corp. v. Doc Johnson Enterprises et al
Plaintiff: American Latex Corp.
Defendant: 'Doc' Johnson Enterprises, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive and Doc Johnson Enterprises
Case Number: 2:2018cv05656
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: R Gary Klausner
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Filing 15 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Doc Johnson Enterprises, a California corporation (bp)
August 19, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Doc Johnson Enterprises filed by Plaintiff American Latex Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas H. Morseburg, #2 Exhibit A) (Morseburg, Douglas)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 8/22/2018. (sw)
July 31, 2018 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff American Latex Corp., upon Defendant Doc Johnson Enterprises served on 7/21/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ronald Braverman, agent for service of process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Morseburg, Douglas)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (pso)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-05656 RGK(AFMx). (rn)
June 27, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Doc Johnson Enterprises. (jtil)
June 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
June 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
June 26, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by American Latex Corp.. (Morseburg, Douglas)
June 26, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff American Latex Corp. (Morseburg, Douglas)
June 26, 2018 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff American Latex Corp., (Morseburg, Douglas)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff American Latex Corp.. (Morseburg, Douglas)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff American Latex Corp.. (Morseburg, Douglas)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21997302 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff American Latex Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Douglas H Morseburg added to party American Latex Corp.(pty:pla))(Morseburg, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Latex Corp. v. Doc Johnson Enterprises et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 'Doc' Johnson Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Johnson Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Latex Corp.
Represented By: Douglas H Morseburg
Represented By: Robert Alan Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?