Yanira Morales, et al v. David M. Lanier, et al
Plaintiff: Lina Corpus, Juanita Buenrostro and Yanira Morales
Defendant: David M. Lanier, Does 1-10, inclusive, Julie Su and Andre Schoorl
Case Number: 2:2018cv05657
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Filing 32 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Yanira Morales, Juanita Buenrostro, Lina Corpus(Robison, Clint)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED REQUEST TO: (1) AMEND THE COMPLAINT, (2) CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Amend/Correct, Stipulation to Continue, #30 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The Stipulated Request permitting Plaintiffs to file a First Amended Complaint is hereby GRANTED. The Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before August 15, 2018; 2. The Stipulated Request to continue the Status Conference hearing date to coincide with a hearing on any dispositive motion filed by Defendants is hereby GRANTED. The currently scheduled conference is vacated, and will be re-set at a later date. (mrgo)
July 26, 2018 Filing 30 STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , STIPULATION to Continue Status Conference from August 8, 2018 filed by Plaintiffs Juanita Buenrostro, Lina Corpus, Yanira Morales. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robison, Clint)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge George H. Wu re: #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. The deadline to respond to the Complaint is July 27, 2018. (mrgo)
July 19, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): Notice of Motion is missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo)
July 18, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Defendants David M. Lanier, Andre Schoorl, Julie Su. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jose A. Zelidon-Zepeda Supporting Defendants' Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint, #2 Proposed Order) (Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' STIPULATED REQUEST TO TAKE OSC RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION OFF CALENDAR by Judge George H. Wu, re Motion Related Document, #24 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs' Stipulated Request that the Court take off calendar the Order to Show Cause Hearing re Preliminary Injunction set for Monday, July 30, 2018, at 8:30 a.m. is hereby GRANTED; and 2. Plaintiffs' withdrawal of their request for an Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction is hereby GRANTED. 3. The Court sets a status conference for August 6, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. (mrgo)
July 13, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Proposed Order re Motion Related Document, #24 (Robison, Clint)
July 11, 2018 Filing 24 PLAINTIFFS STIPULATED REQUEST TO TAKE OSC RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION OFF CALENDAR re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoining Enforcement of Law #6 filed by Plaintiffs Juanita Buenrostro, Lina Corpus, Yanira Morales. (Robison, Clint)
July 6, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda on behalf of Defendants David M. Lanier, Andre Schoorl, Julie Su (Attorney Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda added to party David M. Lanier(pty:dft), Attorney Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda added to party Andre Schoorl(pty:dft), Attorney Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda added to party Julie Su(pty:dft))(Zelidon-Zepeda, Jose)
July 6, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Samantha Leigh Barron on behalf of Plaintiffs Juanita Buenrostro, Lina Corpus, Yanira Morales (Attorney Samantha Leigh Barron added to party Juanita Buenrostro(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha Leigh Barron added to party Lina Corpus(pty:pla), Attorney Samantha Leigh Barron added to party Yanira Morales(pty:pla))(Barron, Samantha)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
July 3, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Ruling, re: Order on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #13 , filed by Plaintiffs Juanita Buenrostro, Lina Corpus, Yanira Morales. (Robison, Clint)
July 2, 2018 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant David M. Lanier, re Miscellaneous Document #15 , Notice (Other) #18 , Objection/Opposition (Motion related), #14 , Declaration (Motion related) #16 , Declaration (Motion related) #17 served on 7/2/18. (Card, Kim)
July 2, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE Proposed Order filed by Defendant David M. Lanier. (Card, Kim)
July 2, 2018 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Marilyn Bacon Opposition EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoining Enforcement of Law #6 filed by Defendant David M. Lanier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Card, Kim)
July 2, 2018 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Laura Moskowitz Opposition EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoining Enforcement of Law #6 filed by Defendant David M. Lanier. (Card, Kim)
July 2, 2018 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendant David M. Lanier (Card, Kim)
July 2, 2018 Filing 14 OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE TO TRO OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoining Enforcement of Law #6 filed by Defendant David M. Lanier. (Attorney Kim E Card added to party David M. Lanier(pty:dft))(Card, Kim)
July 2, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge George H. Wu: ORDER DENYING EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #6 . The Court orders that Defendants submit briefing of no more than 25 pages in opposition to that request by July 12, 2018. Plaintiffs may reply by July 19, 2018 in no more than 15 pages. The Court will hear oral argument on July 30, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9D. (lc)
June 29, 2018 Filing 12 [PROPOSED] ORDER ON EX PARTE APPLICATION re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoining Enforcement of Law #6 filed by Plaintiffs Juanita Buenrostro, Lina Corpus, Yanira Morales. (Robison, Clint)
June 29, 2018 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Juanita Buenrostro In Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoining Enforcement of Law #6 filed by Plaintiffs Juanita Buenrostro, Lina Corpus, Yanira Morales. (Robison, Clint)
June 29, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Yanira Morales In Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoining Enforcement of Law #6 filed by Plaintiffs Juanita Buenrostro, Lina Corpus, Yanira Morales. (Robison, Clint)
June 29, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Angeli C. Aragon In Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoining Enforcement of Law #6 filed by Plaintiffs Juanita Buenrostro, Lina Corpus, Yanira Morales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Robison, Clint)
June 29, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Kathryn Rooke In Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoining Enforcement of Law #6 filed by Plaintiffs Juanita Buenrostro, Lina Corpus, Yanira Morales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Robison, Clint)
June 29, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support of EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoining Enforcement of Law #6 filed by Plaintiffs Juanita Buenrostro, Lina Corpus, Yanira Morales. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Robison, Clint)
June 29, 2018 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to Enjoining Enforcement of Law filed by Plaintiffs Juanita Buenrostro, Lina Corpus, Yanira Morales. Ex Parte Application set for hearing on 7/2/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Robison, Clint)
June 27, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Juanita Buenrostro, Lina Corpus, Yanira Morales. (Robison, Clint)
June 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
June 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (esa)
June 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21997379 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Yanira Morales, Juanita Buenrostro, Lina Corpus. (Attorney Clint D Robison added to party Juanita Buenrostro(pty:pla), Attorney Clint D Robison added to party Lina Corpus(pty:pla), Attorney Clint D Robison added to party Yanira Morales(pty:pla))(Robison, Clint)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yanira Morales, et al v. David M. Lanier, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Lanier
Represented By: Kim E Card
Represented By: Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Su
Represented By: Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Schoorl
Represented By: Jose A Zelidon-Zepeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Corpus
Represented By: Clint D Robison
Represented By: Angeli C Aragon
Represented By: Samantha Leigh Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Buenrostro
Represented By: Clint D Robison
Represented By: Angeli C Aragon
Represented By: Samantha Leigh Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanira Morales
Represented By: Clint D Robison
Represented By: Angeli C Aragon
Represented By: Samantha Leigh Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?