Carmen John Perri v. Burger King No. 9945 et al
Plaintiff: Carmen John Perri
Defendant: NRH GLOBAL HOLDINGS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, DOES 1-10 Inclusive, BURGER KING #9945, a business of unknown form, JRMD 1, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, TEGAR, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, TEGAR, Burger King No. 9945, NRH Global Holdings, Does 1-10, inclusive and JRMD 1
Case Number: 2:2018cv05674
Filed: June 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. Dismissal is With Prejudice. (Manning, Joseph)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson. On July 31, 2018, the Court ordered plaintiff Carmen John Perri ("Plaintiff") to show cause why defendants NRH Global Holdings, JRMD 1, and TEGAR ("OSC Defendants") should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution, after the OSC Defendants failed to file an Answer within the deadline to do so, as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(1). (Docket No. 21.) Plaintiff was warned that failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause on or before August 10, 2018 could result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to dismissal of the Complaint. (Id.) Thus, the Court finds that the Henderson factors weigh in favor of dismissing the OSC Defendants. Accordingly, the Court dismisses Plaintiff's claims against the OSC Defendants without prejudice for lack of prosecution and for failure to comply with the Court's Order to Show Cause. TEGAR (a Delaware Limited Liablity Company), JRMD 1 (a Delaware Limited Liablity Company) and NRH Global Holdings (a Delaware Limited Liablity Company) terminated. (See document for full details) (mrgo)
August 8, 2018 Filing 24 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri, upon Defendant Burger King No. 9945 served on 8/2/2018, answer due 8/23/2018. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson re: Notice of Settlement #22 . The Court has been advised by counsel that this matter has settled. The parties have ten (10) days from the date of this order or until the next scheduled court appearance, whichever is shorter, to file with the court a dismissal of the action or to appear, in-person or telephonically with their clients, to place the settlement on the record. (mrgo)
August 1, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. (Manning, Joseph)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 8/10/2018.) (mrgo)
July 19, 2018 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri, upon Defendant NRH Global Holdings served on 7/5/2018, answer due 7/26/2018. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
July 19, 2018 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri, upon Defendant TEGAR served on 7/5/2018, answer due 7/26/2018. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
July 19, 2018 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri, upon Defendant JRMD 1 served on 7/5/2018, answer due 7/26/2018. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Manning, Joseph)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (jp)
June 28, 2018 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant TEGAR. (et)
June 28, 2018 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant JRMD 1. (et)
June 28, 2018 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant NRH Global Holdings. (et)
June 28, 2018 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Burger King No. 9945. (et)
June 28, 2018 Filing 12 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kss)
June 28, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
June 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
June 27, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. (Manning, Joseph)
June 27, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. (Manning, Joseph)
June 27, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. (Manning, Joseph)
June 27, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. (Manning, Joseph)
June 27, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri, (Manning, Joseph)
June 27, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. (Manning, Joseph)
June 27, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri, (Manning, Joseph)
June 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. (Manning, Joseph)
June 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22000338 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Carmen John Perri. (Attorney Joseph Richard Manning, Jr added to party Carmen John Perri(pty:pla))(Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carmen John Perri v. Burger King No. 9945 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRH GLOBAL HOLDINGS, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURGER KING #9945, a business of unknown form
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JRMD 1, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEGAR, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEGAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burger King No. 9945
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRH Global Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JRMD 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen John Perri
Represented By: Joseph Richard Manning, Jr
Represented By: Michael John Manning
Represented By: Craig G Cote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?